This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2021 at 09:56:00 (UTC).

622 Third Avenue Company, L.L.C v. National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 622 Third Avenue Company, L L C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06050

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

622 Third Avenue Company, L.L.C

Defendants

National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford

Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America

Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Janet Jakyung Lee

Attorney at The Chartwell Law Offices LLP

One Battery Park Plaza, 35Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Matthew David Kraus

Attorney at Havkins Rosenfeld Ritzert & Varriale, LLP

1065 Avenue Of The Americas, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10018

Defendant Attorneys

Marian Sue Hertz

Attorney at CNA Coverage Litigation Group

125 Broad Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Lisa Marie Szczepanski

Attorney at Reid & Associates

485 Lexington Ave., 6Th Fl.

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) STIPULATION EXTENDING TRAVELERS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel of record for Plaintiff, 622 Third Avenue Company, L.L.C. ("622 Third Avenue"), and Defendant, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America ("Travelers"), that Travelers time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended up to and including September 23, 2021. No prior extension of time to respond to the Complaint has been sought by Travelers in this action. SO ORDERED. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America answer due 9/23/2021. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/17/2021) (jca) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#21

(#21) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/17/2021) (cf) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#20

(#20) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America..(Szczepanski, Lisa) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Marie Szczepanski on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America..(Szczepanski, Lisa) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#18

(#18) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company..(Redd, Joseph) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#16

(#16) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford..(Hertz, Marian) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America..(pc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company..(pc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 622 Third Avenue Company, L.L.C..(Kraus, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 622 Third Avenue Company, L.L.C..(Kraus, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 622 Third Avenue Company, L.L.C..(Kraus, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kraus, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION EXTENDING TRAVELERS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel of record for Plaintiff, 622 Third Avenue Company, L.L.C. ("622 Third Avenue"), and Defendant, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America ("Travelers"), that Travelers time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended up to and including September 23, 2021. No prior extension of time to respond to the Complaint has been sought by Travelers in this action. SO ORDERED. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America answer due 9/23/2021. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/17/2021) (jca) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING HARLEYSVILLE WORCESTER INSURANCE COMPANY's TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATION AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel of record that HARLEYSVILLE WORCESTER INSURANCE COMPANY's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including September 23, 2021. There has been no previous request by this defendant for an extension of time in this matter. SO ORDERED. Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company answer due 9/23/2021. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/17/2021) (jca) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/17/2021) (cf) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America..(Szczepanski, Lisa) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Marie Szczepanski on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America..(Szczepanski, Lisa) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company..(Redd, Joseph) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel of record that National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to September 23, 2021 and including September 23, 2021. There has been no previous request for an extension of time in this matter. SO ORDERED. National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford answer due 9/23/2021. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/13/2021) (va) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford..(Hertz, Marian) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Hertz, Marian to RE-FILE Document #15 Proposed Order. Use the event type Proposed Stipulation and Order found under the event list Proposed Orders. (dt) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. Related Document Number: [Stipulation of Time to File Answer to Complaint]..(Hertz, Marian) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 8/12/2021 (dt). (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America..(pc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company..(pc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 622 Third Avenue Company, L.L.C..(Kraus, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 622 Third Avenue Company, L.L.C..(Kraus, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 622 Third Avenue Company, L.L.C..(Kraus, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kraus, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24794375)Document filed by 622 Third Avenue Company, L.L.C..(Kraus, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARLEYSVILLE WORCESTER INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marian S. Hertz