This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:40:57 (UTC).

5G Corporation et al v. Sprint Communications Company L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 5G Corporation filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Sprint Communications Company L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Mark S. Norris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02350

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

5G Corporation

Amelia Vaughn

Defendants

Microsoft Corporation

Apple Inc.

Sprint Communications Company L.P.

Facebook Payments, Inc.

Google, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Clerk W. Aaron Hall

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ted I. Jones

Attorney at JONES & GARRETT LAW FIRM

2670 Union Avenue Extended, Suite 1200

Memphis, TN 38112

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Elizabeth Stuart

Attorney at BURCH, PORTER & JOHNSON

130 North Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Tannera George Gibson

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Michael Anthony Malone

Attorney at POLSINELLI PC

401 Commerce Street, Suite 900

Nashville, TN 37219

John Wellington Peterson

Attorney at POLSINELLI, PC - Nashville

401 Commerce St., Suite 900

Nashville, TN 37219

Christopher C. Kearney

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kirk A. Caraway

Attorney at ALLEN SUMMERS SIMPSON LILLIE & GRESHAM, PLLC

80 Monroe Ave., Ste. 650

Memphis, TN 38103-2466

Robb S. Harvey

Attorney at WALLER LANSDEN DORTCH & DAVIS LLP

511 Union Street, Suite 2700

Nashville, TN 37219

Quynh-Anh D. Kibler

Attorney at WALLER LANSDEN DORTCH & DAVIS

511 Union Street, Ste 2700

Nashville, TN 37219

David H. Kramer

Attorney at WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

22 #1

Memorandum Defendant Google LLC's Memorandum of Law in Support of It's

#22

(#22) MOTION to Dismiss by Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Defendant Google LLC's Memorandum of Law in Support of It's Motion to Dismiss)(Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

21 #1

Memorandum in Support of Defendant Facebook Payments, Inc.'s Motion to Dism

#21

(#21) MOTION to Dismiss by Facebook Payments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Facebook Payments, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Caraway, Kirk) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

20 #1

Memorandum In Support of Sprint and Apple Motion to Dismiss

#20

(#20) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Apple Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Sprint and Apple Motion to Dismiss)(Peterson, John) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#19

(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc.. (Peterson, John) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#18

(#18) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Peterson, John) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

17 #1

Memorandum in Support of Microsoft Motion to Dismiss

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google, LLC identifying Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc. for Google, LLC.. (Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

8 #1

Supplement

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Notice of Consent to Removal and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Gibson, Tannera) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Google, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLCS NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Facebook Payments, Inc. Notice of Consent to Removal (Caraway, Kirk) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#2

(#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (btg) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint & Summons

#1

(#7) NOTICE by Google, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLCS NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Dismiss by Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Defendant Google LLC's Memorandum of Law in Support of It's Motion to Dismiss)(Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Dismiss by Facebook Payments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Facebook Payments, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Caraway, Kirk) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Apple Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Sprint and Apple Motion to Dismiss)(Peterson, John) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc.. (Peterson, John) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Peterson, John) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Microsoft Motion to Dismiss)(Gibson, Tannera) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 061121. (msn) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3629526) by Google, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GRANTING #10 UNOPPOSED MOTION OF GOOGLE LLC FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; ORDER GRANTING #11 DEFENDANT FACEBOOK PAYMENTS, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER GRANTING #12 DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; AND ORDER GRANTING #13 DEFENDANTS APPLE INC. AND SPRINT COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY L.P.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 6/1/2021. (Norris, Mark) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order submitted by Apple Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Malone, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by Google, LLC. (Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google, LLC identifying Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc. for Google, LLC.. (Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Notice of Consent to Removal and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Gibson, Tannera) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Google, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLCS NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Facebook Payments, Inc. Notice of Consent to Removal (Caraway, Kirk) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (btg) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Apple Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P. from Chancery Court Shelby County, TN, case number CH-21-0504 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3618200), filed by Apple Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint & Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson, John) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facebook Payments Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where 5G, LLC, a California limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where Microsoft Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sprint Communications Company, L.P. is a litigant