This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2020 at 09:33:35 (UTC).

5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC v. Bibb et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Bibb. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09671

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

5445 Lankershim Boulevard Apartment Investors, LLC

Defendants

DOES 1 to 10 inclusive

Dustin Bibb

North Hollywood, CA 91601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda Tracey Hollenbeck

Attorney at Hollenbeck and Cardoso LLP

444 West Ocean Boulevard Suite 705

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

CV71

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 19PDUD03792, acknowledged on 11/2/2020. (iv) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge John F. Walter. The Court sua sponte REMANDS this action to the California Superior Court for the County of Los Angeles for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #3 by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (iv) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for December 7, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before November 23, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Dustin Bibb. (jtil) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dustin Bibb. (jtil) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, filed by Plaintiff Dustin Bibb. Case number 19PDUD03792 with copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 CV71) (jtil) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5445 LANKERSHIM BOULEVARD APARTMENT INVESTORS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda Tracey Hollenbeck