This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 12:18:17 (UTC).

512-Bourbon v. Clipbandits, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 512-Bourbon filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Clipbandits, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02466

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

512-BOURBON

Edmund D. Samora

Defendants

TEQUILA 512

CLIPBANDITS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah R Frankfort

Attorney at Cabello Hall Zinda, PLLC

801 Travis St., Suite 1610

Houston, TX 77002

Jesus David Cabello

Attorney at Cabello Hall Zinda, PLLC

801 Travis Street, Suite 1610

Houston, TX 77002

Stephen Douglas Zinda

Attorney at Cabello Hall Zinda, PLLC

801 Travis Street, Suite 1610

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to All Defendants by Edmound D Samora, filed. (mmapps, 4) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#28

(#28) RESPONSE to #27 Document Plaintiff 512-Bourbon's Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Clipbandits, LLC, Tequila 512. (Cabello, Jesus) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#27

(#27) Request for Judicial Notice by Edmound D Samora, filed.(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#26

(#26) Notice Regarding Defendants #21 Reply in Support of Motion, #11 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), filed by Edmound D Samora. (mmapps, 4) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

11 #6

Proposed Order

11 #4

Exhibit 3

11 #3

Exhibit 2

11 #2

Exhibit 1

11 #1

Declaration of J. David Cabello

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Zinda on behalf of CLIPBANDITS, LLC, TEQUILA 512, filed. (Zinda, Stephen) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by J. David Cabello on behalf of CLIPBANDITS, LLC, TEQUILA 512, filed. (Cabello, Jesus) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by J. David Cabello on behalf of CLIPBANDITS, LLC, TEQUILA 512, filed. (Cabello, Jesus) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#4

(#4) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to CLIPBANDITS, LLC served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020, filed.(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to CLIPBANDITS, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by email, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JenniferOlson, 4) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#21) REPLY in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), filed by Clipbandits, LLC, Tequila 512. (Cabello, Jesus) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase terminated on 08/31/2020. Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to All Defendants by Edmound D Samora, filed. (mmapps, 4) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE to #27 Document Plaintiff 512-Bourbon's Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Clipbandits, LLC, Tequila 512. (Cabello, Jesus) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Request for Judicial Notice by Edmound D Samora, filed.(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Notice Regarding Defendants #21 Reply in Support of Motion, #11 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), filed by Edmound D Samora. (mmapps, 4) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM in Support re: #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Edmound D Samora, filed. (Attachments: #1 A-N Exhibit)(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE in Opposition to #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #16 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Declaratory Judgment and preliminary Injunctive Relief to Clarify Parties and Request a Preliminary Injunction, filed by Clipbandits, LLC, Tequila 512. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. David Cabello, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Cabello, Jesus) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER denying #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The request for a temporary restraining order is denied. A ruling on the request for preliminary injunction is deferred. Further order to follow. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE re: #19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Clipbandits, LLC, Tequila 512, filed. (Cabello, Jesus) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), filed by Clipbandits, LLC, Tequila 512. (Cabello, Jesus) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Frankfort on behalf of CLIPBANDITS, LLC, TEQUILA 512, filed. (Frankfort, Sarah) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Zinda on behalf of CLIPBANDITS, LLC, TEQUILA 512, filed. (Zinda, Stephen) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by J. David Cabello on behalf of CLIPBANDITS, LLC, TEQUILA 512, filed. (Cabello, Jesus) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docketfiling Filing fee: $400.00 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU096622, filed. (jdav, 4) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by J. David Cabello on behalf of CLIPBANDITS, LLC, TEQUILA 512, filed. (Cabello, Jesus) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to CLIPBANDITS, LLC served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020, filed.(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to CLIPBANDITS, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by email, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JenniferOlson, 4) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by 512-BOURBON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less