This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2019 at 07:22:37 (UTC).

4th Leaf, LLC v. City of Grayson et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 4th Leaf, LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Grayson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr and David L. Bunning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr

David L. Bunning

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

4th Leaf, LLC

Defendants

Jack Harper

Pam Nash

Terry Stamper

George Steele

City of Grayson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W. Jeffrey Scott

311 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 608

Grayson, KY 41143

Whitley Hill Bailey

Attorney at W. Jeffrey Scott, PSC

311 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 608

Grayson, KY 41143

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra Deaton DeMoss-Campbell

Attorney at Ward, Hocker & Thornton, PLLC - Lexington

333 W. Vine Street, Suite 1100

Lexington, KY 40507

Licha H. Farah, Jr.

Attorney at Ward, Hocker & Thornton - Lexington

333 W. Vine Street, Suite 1100

Lexington, KY 40507

 

Court Documents

19 #6

Exhibit Order Denying Petition for Rehearing. Ky court of Appeals

19 #4

Exhibit State Court Order Declaring Ordinance Invalid Final Order

19 #3

Exhibit State Court Plaintiff First Amended Complaint

#19

(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Grayson, Jack Harper, Jack Harper, Pam Nash, Pam Nash, Terry Stamper, Terry Stamper, George Steele, George Steele filed by 4th Leaf, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit State Court Original Plaint Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Plaintiff First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit State Court Order Declaring Ordinance Invalid Final Order, #5 Exhibit Opinion Kentucky Court of Appeals, #6 Exhibit Order Denying Petition for Rehearing. Ky court of Appeals, #7 Exhibit Order Denying Discretionary Review Kentucky Supreme Court)(Scott, W.) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

17 #4

Proposed Order

17 #3

Exhibit B-Kentucky Court of Appeals Opinion

17 #2

Exhibit A-Carter Circuit Court Complaint

17 #1

Memorandum in Support

#17

(#17) MOTION to Dismiss by City of Grayson, Jack Harper, Jack Harper, Pam Nash, Pam Nash, Terry Stamper, Terry Stamper, George Steele, George Steele (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A-Carter Circuit Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Kentucky Court of Appeals Opinion, #4 Proposed Order)(Farah, Licha) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, W. Jeffrey Scott. #1 Complaint has been filed by 4th Leaf, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KSS) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to City of Grayson, Jack Harper, Pam Nash, Terry Stamper, and George Steele in their Individual & Official Capacity; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service (KSS) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

1 #6

Summons Stamper

1 #5

Summons Nash

1 #4

Summons Harper

1 #3

Summons Steele

1 #2

Summons City of Grayson

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, W. Jeffrey Scott. #1 Complaint has been filed by 4th Leaf, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KSS) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Grayson, Jack Harper, Jack Harper, Pam Nash, Pam Nash, Terry Stamper, Terry Stamper, George Steele, George Steele filed by 4th Leaf, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit State Court Original Plaint Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Plaintiff First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit State Court Order Declaring Ordinance Invalid Final Order, #5 Exhibit Opinion Kentucky Court of Appeals, #6 Exhibit Order Denying Petition for Rehearing. Ky court of Appeals, #7 Exhibit Order Denying Discretionary Review Kentucky Supreme Court)(Scott, W.) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by City of Grayson, Jack Harper, Jack Harper, Pam Nash, Pam Nash, Terry Stamper, Terry Stamper, George Steele, George Steele. (DeMoss-Campbell, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Dismiss by City of Grayson, Jack Harper, Jack Harper, Pam Nash, Pam Nash, Terry Stamper, Terry Stamper, George Steele, George Steele (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A-Carter Circuit Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Kentucky Court of Appeals Opinion, #4 Proposed Order)(Farah, Licha) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 4th Leaf, LLC via personal to (Bailey, Whitley) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 4th Leaf, LLC via personal to (Bailey, Whitley) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 4th Leaf, LLC via personal to (Bailey, Whitley) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Whitley Bailey re #9 Summons Returned Executed, #11 Summons Returned Executed, #10 Summons Returned Executed ; blank summons were attached as the Main Documents. Within 7 calendar days , file the summons issued by the Clerk AND with declaration of service completed and/or with the certified mail receipt attached which states the method of service, as an electronic attachment to the document entitled Notice of Filing. cc: COR (JLS) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by 4th Leaf, LLC. (Bailey, Whitley) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 4th Leaf, LLC via personal to Terry Stamper served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019; Terry Stamper served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Bailey, Whitley) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 4th Leaf, LLC via personal to Pam Nash served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019; Pam Nash served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Bailey, Whitley) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 4th Leaf, LLC via personal to Jack Harper served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019; Jack Harper served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Bailey, Whitley) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 4th Leaf, LLC via Personal to George Steele served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019; George Steele served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Bailey, Whitley) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 4th Leaf, LLC via Personal to City of Grayson served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Bailey, Whitley) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 4th Leaf, LLC. (Scott, W.) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (JLS) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Judge David L. Bunning for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/13/19.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, W. Jeffrey Scott. #1 Complaint has been filed by 4th Leaf, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KSS) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to City of Grayson, Jack Harper, Pam Nash, Terry Stamper, and George Steele in their Individual & Official Capacity; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service (KSS) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (KSS) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4283889), filed by 4th Leaf, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Grayson, #3 Summons Steele, #4 Summons Harper, #5 Summons Nash, #6 Summons Stamper)(KSS) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less