This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2019 at 07:28:18 (UTC).

3R Info LLC et al v. Cissna

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 3R Info LLC filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Cissna. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie Dawkins Davis and Bernard A. Friedman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10341

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

Presiding Judge

Bernard A. Friedman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Venkat Narayana Rao Chenna

3R Info LLC

Defendant

Director Lee Francis Cissna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dehai Tao

Attorney at Law Firm of Dehao Tao

24 Frank Lloyd Wright Drive, P. O. Box 345

Ann Arbor, MI 48106

Defendant Attorney

James J. Carty

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - EDMI

211 W. Fort Street, Suite 2001

Detroit, MI 48226

 

Court Documents

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) ORDER REMANDING CASE to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REMANDING CASE to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James J. Carty appearing on behalf of Lee Francis Cissna (Carty, James) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of All Defendants. (Tao, Dehai) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DWor) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Lee Francis Cissna* (DWor) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7092633 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: wayne - County Where Action Arose: wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Tao, Dehai) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.