This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2021 at 08:16:08 (UTC).

3M Company v. Feltner

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 3M Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Feltner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen R. Clark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00728

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen R. Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

3M Company

Defendant

Quinton Feltner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey L. Schultz

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendant Attorney

Timm W. Schowalter

Attorney at SANDBERG PHOENIX PC - St Louis

600 Washington Ave., 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101-1313

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Plaintiff 3M Company. (Schultz, Jeffrey) (Response to Court due by 8/26/2021.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 8/17/2021. (LNJ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Plaintiff 3M Company. (Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Plaintiff 3M Company. (Schultz, Jeffrey) ; ORDERED GRANTED ( Response to Court due by 8/16/2021.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 8/6/21. (JAB) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Plaintiff 3M Company. (Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Plaintiff 3M Company. (Schultz, Jeffrey) (Response to Court due by 8/5/2021.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/28/2021. (LNJ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Plaintiff 3M Company. (Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Quinton Feltner.(Schowalter, Timm) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Quinton Feltner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schowalter, Timm) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Quinton Feltner. (Schowalter, Timm) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Timm W. Schowalter for Defendant Quinton Feltner. (Schowalter, Timm) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exhibit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Stipulation and Permanent Consent Injunction, #4 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Feltner, #6 Exhibit 6 - Email, #7 Exhibit 7 - Email, #8 Exhibit 8 - Email, #9 Exhibit 9 - Email)(Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff 3M Company. (Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by 3M Company. Quinton Feltner served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to defendant Quinton Feltner. The summons was emailed to Jeffrey L. Schultz. (JAB) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff 3M Company Process Server: ASAP Serve (Attachments: #1 Attachment Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Summons AZ Summons)(Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketJudge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Attorney Jeffrey L. Schultz. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (JKL) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff 3M Company. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff 3M Company Process Server: Greg Kellerman (Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Enforcement of Parties Settlement Agreement against defendant Quinton Feltner with receipt number AMOEDC-8711953, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 3 - Feltner Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Summons)(Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timm Schowalter