This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2019 at 07:29:22 (UTC).

36MEDIA LLC v. AT YOUR GATE LLC

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 36MEDIA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AT YOUR GATE LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leda D. Wettre and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-16697

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

36media LLC

Defendant

AT YOUR GATE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY MATTHEW BEYER

Attorney at RIKER DANZIG SCHERER HYLAND & PERRETTI LLP

1 Speedwell Avenue, Headquarters Plaza

Morristown, NJ 07962-1981

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL WILLIAM KIERNAN

Attorney at KIERNAN AND ASSOCIATES LLC

One Greentree Ctr Ste 201, 10000 Lincoln Drive East

Marlton, NJ 08053

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by 36MEDIA LLC as to AT YOUR GATE LLC. (BEYER, JEFFREY). (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #6 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by AT YOUR GATE LLC. (KIERNAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AT YOUR GATE LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; that the time for Defendant AT YOU GATE, LLC to respond to the Complaint, which would otherwise be due on September 30, 2019, is hereby extended until October 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/1/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 36MEDIA LLC. AT YOUR GATE LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (BEYER, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AT YOUR GATE LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9894532), filed by 36MEDIA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BEYER, JEFFREY). (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL WILLIAM KIERNAN on behalf of AT YOUR GATE LLC (KIERNAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; that the time is hereby extended until September 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/13/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by AT YOUR GATE LLC. (KIERNAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; that the time for Defendant AT YOU GATE, LLC to respond to the Complaint, which would otherwise be due on September 30, 2019, is hereby extended until October 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/1/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #6 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by AT YOUR GATE LLC. (KIERNAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; that the time is hereby extended until September 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/13/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by AT YOUR GATE LLC. (KIERNAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL WILLIAM KIERNAN on behalf of AT YOUR GATE LLC (KIERNAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 36MEDIA LLC. AT YOUR GATE LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (BEYER, JEFFREY) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AT YOUR GATE LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, Parties must be entered in upper case. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by 36MEDIA LLC as to AT YOUR GATE LLC. (BEYER, JEFFREY). (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AT YOUR GATE LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9894532), filed by 36MEDIA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BEYER, JEFFREY). (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.