This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2019 at 05:47:55 (UTC).

3390 Fairburn Road, SW et al v. Davis

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 a Property - Other Eviction case was filed by 3390 Fairburn Road, SW against Davis in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04990

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

Referral Judge

J. Clay Fuller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

3390 Fairburn Road, SW

Atlanta, GA 31145

Atlanta LLC

P. O. Box 451027

Atlanta, GA 31145

The Life Properties LLC

P. O. Box 451027

Atlanta, GA 31145

Defendant

Lyonal Davis

Atlanta, GA 30331

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Lyonal Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#3

(#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal. Because Defendants have not shown that the original complaint contains a federal claim or otherwise presents a federal question, they have not established that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action, so removal is improper. The undersigned therefore RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/12/2019. (jed) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation. The Court REMANDS this action to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/10/19. (jpa) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) Receipt of Electronic filing of the #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation with the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (jpa) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/12/2019. (jed) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Receipt of Electronic filing of the #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation with the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (jpa) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (jpa) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to 3390 Fairburn Road, SW, Atlanta LLC, Lyonal Davis, The Life Properties LLC re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jpa) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation. The Court REMANDS this action to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/10/19. (jpa) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to 3390 Fairburn Road, SW; Atlanta LLC; Lyonal Davis; The Life Properties LLC re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (jed) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/12/2019. (jed) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/12/2019 within #3 R&R. (jed) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal. Because Defendants have not shown that the original complaint contains a federal claim or otherwise presents a federal question, they have not established that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action, so removal is improper. The undersigned therefore RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/12/2019. (jed) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Lyonal Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (eop) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Lyonal Davis. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.