Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2020 at 08:18:29 (UTC).

327 Kona LLC v. County of Hawaii, State of Hawaii

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 327 Kona LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Hawaii, State of Hawaii. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are DERRICK K. WATSON and ROM TRADER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00023

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DERRICK K. WATSON

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

327 Kona LLC

Defendant

County of Hawaii

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joanna C. Zeigler

Attorney at Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert

1003 Bishop Street, Suite 1600

Honolulu, HI 96813

Mark M. Murakami

Attorney at Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert

1003 Bishop Street, Suite 1600, 531-8031, Fax: 533-2242

Honolulu, HI 96813

Robert H. Thomas

Attorney at Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert

1003 Bishop Street, Suite 1600, 531-8031

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT COUNTY OF HAWAIIS RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Salas-Ferguson, Sinclair) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#10

(#10) Plaintiff 327 Kona LLC's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Zeigler, Joanna) Modified on 3/10/2020 (emt, ). (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Zeigler, Joanna) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sinclair Salas-Ferguson on behalf of County of Hawaii on behalf of County of Hawaii. (Salas-Ferguson, Sinclair) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

7 #1

Certificate of Service

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 327 Kona LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zeigler, Joanna) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Laureen L. Martin on behalf of County of Hawaii on behalf of County of Hawaii. (Martin, Laureen) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

5 #2

AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons

5 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

#5

(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements

#4

(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/16/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to County of Hawaii. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

1 #9

Jury Demand

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT COUNTY OF HAWAIIS RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Salas-Ferguson, Sinclair) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiff 327 Kona LLC's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Zeigler, Joanna) Modified on 3/10/2020 (emt, ). (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Zeigler, Joanna) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sinclair Salas-Ferguson on behalf of County of Hawaii on behalf of County of Hawaii. (Salas-Ferguson, Sinclair) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 327 Kona LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zeigler, Joanna) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Laureen L. Martin on behalf of County of Hawaii on behalf of County of Hawaii. (Martin, Laureen) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/16/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to County of Hawaii. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00023 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400. 0975-2319772 ), filed by 327 Kona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Jury Demand, #10 Summons, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomas, Robert) Modified on 1/17/2020 to add receipt number (emt, ). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joanna C. Zeigler