This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2022 at 08:42:26 (UTC).

3 Boys Investments, LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 3 Boys Investments, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Janis van Meerveld. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00837

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

3 Boys Investments, LLC

Defendant

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian J. Houghtaling

Attorney at Houghtaling Law Firm, LLC

3500 North Hullen St.

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant Attorneys

Theresa Anderson Sutherland

Attorney at Musgrave, McLachlan & Penn, LLC

1555 Poydras Street, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Richard Todd Musgrave

Attorney at Musgrave, McLachlan & Penn, LLC

1555 Poydras Street, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Brent Joseph Carbo

Attorney at Musgrave, McLachlan & Penn, LLC

1515 Poydras St., Suite 2380

New Orleans, LA 70112

Ethan N. Penn

Attorney at Musgrave McLachlan & Penn

1555 Poydras Street, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Lindsey Marie Devereux

Attorney at Musgrave McLachlan & Penn

1555 Poydras Street, Suite 2100

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by 3 Boys Investments, LLC (Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London. (ajn) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London served on 4/13/2022, answer due 5/4/2022. (Houghtaling, Brian) Modified text on 4/18/2022 (cg). (Entered: 04/17/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London.Attorney Ethan N. Penn added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London(pty:dft).(Penn, Ethan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#7

(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London identifying Corporate Parent AXIS Managing Agency Limited for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London (Penn, Ethan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London identifying Corporate Parent AXIS Managing Agency Limited for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London (Penn, Ethan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London.Attorney Ethan N. Penn added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London(pty:dft).(Penn, Ethan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London served on 4/13/2022, answer due 5/4/2022. (Houghtaling, Brian) Modified text on 4/18/2022 (cg). (Entered: 04/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London. (ajn) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by 3 Boys Investments, LLC (Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's - Lloyd's of London (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9296113) filed by 3 Boys Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Brian J. Houghtaling added to party 3 Boys Investments, LLC(pty:pla).(Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lindsey Marie Devereux

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Todd Musgrave