This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 09:46:26 (UTC).

2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC v. Martin et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Martin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09182

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC

Defendants

LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC

Kia Martin

Laplace, LA 70068

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carey L. Menasco

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Melanie Nicole Derefinko

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Philip Kirkpatrick Jones, Jr.

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Dena Lynn Olivier

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Defendant Attorney

Leo David Congeni

Attorney at Congeni Law Firm, LLC

424 Gravier St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Quitclaim Deed

#8

(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC (Congeni, Leo) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Mortgage and UCC filings

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Assignment

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Demand Letters

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Merger Agreement

#6

(#6) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2019 10:20 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC, Kia Martin (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7557613) filed by 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note & Allonge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage and UCC filings, #3 Exhibit 3 - Merger Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Loan Modification and Forbearance Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Demand Letters, #6 Exhibit 6 - Quitclaim Deed, #7 Exhibit 7 - Assignment, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Carey L. Menasco added to party 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC(pty:pla).(Menasco, Carey) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC, Kia Martin.Attorney Leo David Congeni added to party LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC(pty:dft).(Congeni, Leo) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Menasco, Carey) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Kia Martin on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Menasco, Carey) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#7

(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pacific Western Bank, Corporate Parent PacWest Bancorp for 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC (Menasco, Carey) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Note & Allonge

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Loan Modification and Forbearance Agreement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC (Congeni, Leo) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pacific Western Bank, Corporate Parent PacWest Bancorp for 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC (Menasco, Carey) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2019 10:20 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC, Kia Martin.Attorney Leo David Congeni added to party LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC(pty:dft).(Congeni, Leo) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Menasco, Carey) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Kia Martin on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Menasco, Carey) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC, Kia Martin (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7557613) filed by 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note & Allonge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage and UCC filings, #3 Exhibit 3 - Merger Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Loan Modification and Forbearance Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Demand Letters, #6 Exhibit 6 - Quitclaim Deed, #7 Exhibit 7 - Assignment, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Carey L. Menasco added to party 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC(pty:pla).(Menasco, Carey) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.