This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2021 at 09:53:23 (UTC).

211 Productions, Inc. et al v. WideOpenWest Finance, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 211 Productions, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against WideOpenWest Finance, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel D. Domenico and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01901

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

211 Productions, Inc.

After II Movie, LLC

AMBI Distribution Corp.

Badhouse Studios, LLC

Bodyguard Productions, Inc

Dallas Buyers Club, LLC

Day of Dead Productions, Inc.

Eve Nevada, LLC

Hannibal Classics, Inc.

HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.

I am Wrath Production, Inc.

Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC

Killing Link Distribution, LLC

LF2 Productions, Inc.

LHF Productions, Inc.

Millennium Funding, Inc.

Millennium IP, Inc.

Millennium Media, Inc.

MON, LLC

Nikola Productions, Inc.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

F. Christopher Austin

Attorney at Weide & Miller, Ltd.

10655 Park Run Drive, Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Kerry Steven Culpepper

Attorney at Culpepper IP, LLLC

75-170 Hualalai Road, Suite B204

Kailua Kona, HI 96740

Joshua J. Lee

Attorney at Culpepper IP, LLLC

75-170 Hualalai Road, Suite B204

Kailua Kona, HI 96740

Other Attorneys

Margaret R. Szewczyk

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP-St. Louis

7700 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105-1807

Richard L. Brophy

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP-St. Louis

7700 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105-1807

Zachary Charles Howenstine

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP-St. Louis

7700 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105-1807

 

Court Documents

#22

20 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

20 #20

Main Document

18 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

18 #18

Main Document

#17

#16

#15

#14

#2

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Affidavit Declaration of SWC

1 #4

Affidavit Declaration of KS

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 September 2021. For good cause shown, the parties' Joint Stipulated Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference #20 is granted. The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for September 30, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for October 28, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #20 Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by WideOpenWest Finance, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/2/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Defendant WideOpenWest Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Szewczyk, Margaret) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GRANTING #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant WideOpenWest Finance, LLC must answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint on or before 9/20/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/1/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,, by Defendant WideOpenWest Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Szewczyk, Margaret) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 30 August 2021. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for September 16, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for September 30, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Zachary Charles Howenstine on behalf of WideOpenWest Finance, LLCAttorney Zachary Charles Howenstine added to party WideOpenWest Finance, LLC(pty:dft) (Howenstine, Zachary) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard L. Brophy on behalf of WideOpenWest Finance, LLCAttorney Richard L. Brophy added to party WideOpenWest Finance, LLC(pty:dft) (Brophy, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Margaret R. Szewczyk on behalf of WideOpenWest Finance, LLC (Szewczyk, Margaret) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint on or before 9/6/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/2/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by I am Wrath Production, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Day of Dead Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC., Millennium IP, Inc., After II Movie, LLC, Paradox Studios, LLC, 211 Productions, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Wonder One, LLC, AMBI Distribution Corp., Hannibal Classics, Inc., Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC, Nikola Productions, Inc., LF2 Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Eve Nevada, LLC, Badhouse Studios, LLC, Rupture CAL, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc. WideOpenWest Finance, LLC served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by F. Christopher Austin on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party 211 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party AMBI Distribution Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party After II Movie, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Badhouse Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Bodyguard Productions, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Day of Dead Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Eve Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Hannibal Classics, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party I am Wrath Production, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Killing Link Distribution, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party LF2 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party LHF Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party MON, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Millennium Funding, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Millennium IP, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Millennium Media, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Nikola Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Outpost Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Paradox Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Rambo V Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Rupture CAL, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Screen Media Ventures, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Venice PI, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Voltage Holdings, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Wonder One, LLC(pty:pla) (Austin, F.) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/15/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kerry Steven Culpepper on behalf of 211 Productions, Inc., AMBI Distribution Corp., After II Movie, LLC, Badhouse Studios, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Day of Dead Productions, Inc., Eve Nevada, LLC, Hannibal Classics, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., I am Wrath Production, Inc., Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, LF2 Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium IP, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Nikola Productions, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Paradox Studios, LLC, Rambo V Productions, Inc., Rupture CAL, Inc., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Venice PI, LLC., Voltage Holdings, LLC., Wonder One, LLCAttorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party 211 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party AMBI Distribution Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party After II Movie, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Badhouse Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Bodyguard Productions, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Day of Dead Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Eve Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Hannibal Classics, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party I am Wrath Production, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Killing Link Distribution, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party LF2 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party LHF Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party MON, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Millennium Funding, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Millennium IP, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Millennium Media, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Nikola Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Outpost Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Paradox Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Rambo V Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Rupture CAL, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Screen Media Ventures, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Venice PI, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Voltage Holdings, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Wonder One, LLC(pty:pla) (Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01901-DDD-MEH. (sphil, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc. for 211 Productions, Inc., LF2 Productions, Inc., RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC.; Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc. for Bodyguard Productions, Inc, HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC., LHF Productions, Inc.; Corporate Parent Millennium Media, Inc. for Day of Dead Productions, Inc., Nikola Productions, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc.; Corporate Parent Voltage Pictures, LLC for After II Movie, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Eve Nevada, LLC, MON, LLC, Venice PI, LLC., Wonder One, LLC; Corporate Parent AMBI Distribution Corp. for Paradox Studios, LLC, Rupture CAL, Inc.; Corporate Parent Hannibal Classics, Inc. for I am Wrath Production, Inc., Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC; Corporate Parent Hannibal Media, Inc. for Badhouse Studios, LLC; Corporate Parent Cinetel Films, Inc. for Killing Link Distribution, LLC. (Lee, Joshua) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for contributory infringement and vicarious infringement against WIDEOPENWEST Finance, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7957593)Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party 211 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party AMBI Distribution Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party After II Movie, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Badhouse Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Bodyguard Productions, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Day of Dead Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Eve Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Hannibal Classics, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party I am Wrath Production, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Killing Link Distribution, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party LF2 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party LHF Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party MON, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Millennium Funding, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Millennium IP, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Millennium Media, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Nikola Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Outpost Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Paradox Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Rupture CAL, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Screen Media Ventures, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Venice PI, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Voltage Holdings, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Wonder One, LLC(pty:pla), filed by I am Wrath Production, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Day of Dead Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC., Millennium IP, Inc., After II Movie, LLC, Paradox Studios, LLC, 211 Productions, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC., Millennium Funding, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Wonder One, LLC, AMBI Distribution Corp., Hannibal Classics, Inc., Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC, Nikola Productions, Inc., LF2 Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Eve Nevada, LLC, Badhouse Studios, LLC, Rupture CAL, Inc., HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC., MON, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Affidavit Declaration of KS, #5 Affidavit Declaration of SWC, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Joshua) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MON, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Nikola Productions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC is a litigant