This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2019 at 07:45:54 (UTC).

2020 Annual Attorney Fee

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 2020 Annual Attorney Fee was filed as a Contract - Insurance lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Clerk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-AF-09999

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Clerk

 

Party Details

In Re

2020 Annual Attorney Fee

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • (#63) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2983497. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Jerry L. Schnurr, III. (ksy) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#62) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2978549. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Blake Parker. (ksy) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • (#61) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2974759. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Peter J. Leehey. (ksy) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • (#60) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2972274. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Kevin Christian Rigdon. (ksy) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • (#59) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2969516. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Brett (Michael) Ryan. (ksy) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • (#58) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2969369. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Matthew James Reilly. (ksy) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • (#57) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2968613. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Dustin M. Mueller. (ksy) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • (#56) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2967536. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Glen Stephen Downey. (ksy) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#55) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2967041. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Jenna Lee Green. (ksy) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#54) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2966797. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Kenneth r. Munro. (ksy) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2019
  • (#10) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2869271. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Glenn A. Metcalf. (ksy) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • (#9) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2868378. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for John Mandel Sandy. (ksy) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • (#8) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2867902. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Douglas L. Roehrich. (ksy) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • (#7) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2857817. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Brian J. Kane. (ksy) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • (#6) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2865040. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Susan M Hess. (ksy) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • (#5) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2863607. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Sarah J. Millsap. (ksy) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • (#4) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2859759. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for David Alan Morse. (ksy) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • (#3) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-9684. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Vincent Steven Geis. (ksy) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • (#2) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2850959. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Desiree A Kilburg. (ksy) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • (#1) Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2842113. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Brandy Ranee Lundy. (ksy) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less