This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:18:25 (UTC).

1st Quality Produce, Inc. et al v. Jarz, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 1st Quality Produce, Inc filed an Other - Agriculture Subsidy lawsuit against Jarz, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steve Kim and Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07314

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Agriculture Subsidy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Direct Produce, Inc.

JHP Produce, Inc.

Excell Prod, Inc.

1st Quality Produce, Inc.

Go-Fresh Produce, Inc.

Defendant

Jarz, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

June T Monroe

Attorney at Rynn and Janowsky LLP

2603 Main Street Suite 1250

Irvine, CA 92614

Elise Charlotte O'Brien

Attorney at Rynn and Janowsky LLP

2603 Main Street Suite 1250

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CONSENT INJUNCTION AND AGREED ORDER ESTABLISHING PACA CLAIMS PROCEDURE #13 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. See document for details. (lom) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

13 #1

Exhibit A - (Proposed) Consent Injunction & PACA Claims Procedure

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF LODGING filed of (Proposed) Consent Injunction and Agreed Order Establishing PACA Claims Procedure re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - (Proposed) Consent Injunction & PACA Claims Procedure)(Monroe, June) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice (Other), #8 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document..Curing the Deficiencies as identified in Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents [9}. (lc) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs 1st Quality Produce, Inc., Direct Produce, Inc., Excell Prod, Inc., Go-Fresh Produce, Inc., JHP Produce, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 served on 9/9/2019. (Monroe, June) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#10

(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (smo) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) by plaintiffs #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): 1) No Notice, to which the "proposed consent injunction" should have been submitted as an attachment. Also: The pdf document is a proposed consent injunction and agreed order without a proposed signature line for the Judge 2) No pending formal request on file but instead found within combined and combined within the proposed consent injunction. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

8 #2

Exhibit 2 - PACA Proof of Claim Form

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Notice of PACA Claims Procedure

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Consent Injunction and Agreed Order Establishing PACA Claims Procedure filed by Plaintiffs 1st Quality Produce, Inc., Direct Produce, Inc., Excell Prod, Inc., Go-Fresh Produce, Inc., JHP Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of PACA Claims Procedure, #2 Exhibit 2 - PACA Proof of Claim Form)(Monroe, June) Modified on 9/11/2019 (lc). (STRICKEN PER COURT'S G112B RESPONSE) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Jarz, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff 1st Quality Produce, Inc., Direct Produce, Inc., Excell Prod, Inc., Go-Fresh Produce, Inc., JHP Produce, Inc., (Monroe, June) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs 1st Quality Produce, Inc., Direct Produce, Inc., Excell Prod, Inc., Go-Fresh Produce, Inc., JHP Produce, Inc.. (Monroe, June) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs 1st Quality Produce, Inc., Direct Produce, Inc., Excell Prod, Inc., Go-Fresh Produce, Inc., JHP Produce, Inc.. (Monroe, June) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONSENT INJUNCTION AND AGREED ORDER ESTABLISHING PACA CLAIMS PROCEDURE #13 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. See document for details. (lom) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF LODGING filed of (Proposed) Consent Injunction and Agreed Order Establishing PACA Claims Procedure re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - (Proposed) Consent Injunction & PACA Claims Procedure)(Monroe, June) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice (Other), #8 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document..Curing the Deficiencies as identified in Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents [9}. (lc) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs 1st Quality Produce, Inc., Direct Produce, Inc., Excell Prod, Inc., Go-Fresh Produce, Inc., JHP Produce, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 served on 9/9/2019. (Monroe, June) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (smo) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) by plaintiffs #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): 1) No Notice, to which the "proposed consent injunction" should have been submitted as an attachment. Also: The pdf document is a proposed consent injunction and agreed order without a proposed signature line for the Judge 2) No pending formal request on file but instead found within combined and combined within the proposed consent injunction. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Consent Injunction and Agreed Order Establishing PACA Claims Procedure filed by Plaintiffs 1st Quality Produce, Inc., Direct Produce, Inc., Excell Prod, Inc., Go-Fresh Produce, Inc., JHP Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of PACA Claims Procedure, #2 Exhibit 2 - PACA Proof of Claim Form)(Monroe, June) Modified on 9/11/2019 (lc). (STRICKEN PER COURT'S G112B RESPONSE) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Jarz, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff 1st Quality Produce, Inc., Direct Produce, Inc., Excell Prod, Inc., Go-Fresh Produce, Inc., JHP Produce, Inc., (Monroe, June) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs 1st Quality Produce, Inc., Direct Produce, Inc., Excell Prod, Inc., Go-Fresh Produce, Inc., JHP Produce, Inc.. (Monroe, June) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs 1st Quality Produce, Inc., Direct Produce, Inc., Excell Prod, Inc., Go-Fresh Produce, Inc., JHP Produce, Inc.. (Monroe, June) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24311634 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Excell Prod, Inc., Direct Produce, Inc., 1st Quality Produce, Inc., JHP Produce, Inc., Go-Fresh Produce, Inc.. (Attorney June T Monroe added to party 1st Quality Produce, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney June T Monroe added to party Direct Produce, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney June T Monroe added to party Excell Prod, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney June T Monroe added to party Go-Fresh Produce, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney June T Monroe added to party JHP Produce, Inc.(pty:pla))(Monroe, June) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.