Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2020 at 06:42:39 (UTC).

1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated v. Skrewball Spirits LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Skrewball Spirits LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Neil V Wake. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05809

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Neil V Wake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated

Defendants

Le Vecke Incorporated

Infinium Spirits Incorporated

Unknown Parties

Janson Capsules Incorporated

Skrewball Spirits LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory James Larson

Attorney at Larson & Simpson PLC

90 S Kyrene Rd., Ste. 5

Chandler, AZ 85226

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony Tom King

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Joseph Nathaniel Roth

Attorney at Osborn Maledon PA

P.O. Box 36379

Phoenix, AZ 85067-6379

Travis Charles Hunt

Attorney at Osborn Maledon PA

P.O. Box 36379

Phoenix, AZ 85067-6379

T Kevin Roosevelt

Attorney at Finlayson Toffer Roosevelt & Lilly LLP

15615 Alton Pkwy., Ste. 250

Irvine, CA 92618

Kevin E O'Malley

Attorney at Gallagher & Kennedy PA

2575 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9225

Kenneth Neal Ralston

Attorney at Gallagher & Kennedy PA

2575 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9225

Jason Nolan Black

Attorney at Black & Deen LLC

1620 5Th Ave., Ste. 875

San Diego, CA 92101

Mark Andrew Fuller

Attorney at Gallagher & Kennedy PA

2575 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9225

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) ORDER: Granting the parties' #37 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 2/26/20. (GMP) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Errata re: #35 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Stipulated) by Plaintiff 1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated.. (Larson, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

37 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#37

(#37) MOTION to Dismiss Case (Stipulated) by 1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Larson, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Party Dismissal by 1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated. Party Janson Capsules Incorporated (a California corporation) terminated. (Larson, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

35 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#35

(#35) MOTION to Dismiss Case (Stipulated) by 1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Larson, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#17

(#34) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Order to Show Cause #9 and the Defendant's Response #17 , Unknown Parties (named as Jane Does I-V, John Does I-V, XYZ Partnerships I-V, and ABC Corporations I-V) are terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#9

(#34) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Order to Show Cause #9 and the Defendant's Response #17 , Unknown Parties (named as Jane Does I-V, John Does I-V, XYZ Partnerships I-V, and ABC Corporations I-V) are terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

1 #17

Exhibit N

1 #15

Exhibit L

1 #14

Exhibit K

1 #13

Exhibit J

1 #12

Exhibit I

1 #11

Exhibit H

1 #10

Exhibit G

1 #9

Exhibit F

#1

(#7) SUPPLEMENT SECOND Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Skrewball Spirits LLC. (O'Malley, Kevin) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER: Granting the parties' #37 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 2/26/20. (GMP) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Errata re: #35 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Stipulated) by Plaintiff 1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated.. (Larson, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION to Dismiss Case (Stipulated) by 1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Larson, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Party Dismissal by 1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated. Party Janson Capsules Incorporated (a California corporation) terminated. (Larson, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION to Dismiss Case (Stipulated) by 1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Larson, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketRemark: Out of state attorney Lindsay Aragon removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Order to Show Cause #9 and the Defendant's Response #17 , Unknown Parties (named as Jane Does I-V, John Does I-V, XYZ Partnerships I-V, and ABC Corporations I-V) are terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Parties' Stipulation (Doc. #31 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff 1 Source Signature Glassware, Inc., may respond to Defendant Infinium's Motion to Dismiss on or before Friday, February 28, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 2/3/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Parties' Stipulation (Doc. #30 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff 1 Source Signature Glassware, Inc., may respond to Defendant LeVecke's Motion to Dismiss on or before Thursday, February 27, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 2/3/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) *STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by 1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Larson, Gregory) *Modified to correct event on 1/27/2020 (DXD). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Defendant Skrewball Spirits LLC shall show cause by 12/23/2019 why this action should not be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of Arizona for Maricopa County for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and why the Second Amended Complaint should not be dismissed as against the fictitious defendants for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 12/18/19. (DXD) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - Motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file notice of service. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 12/16/19. (DXD) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT SECOND Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Skrewball Spirits LLC. (O'Malley, Kevin) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Skrewball Spirits LLC. (O'Malley, Kevin) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to 1Source Signature Glassware Incorporated. (ARC) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Skrewball Spirits LLC. (ARC) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17732901. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5809-PHX-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Infinium Spirits Incorporated on 9/17/2019.(Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 9/17/2019); upon Le Vecke Incorporated on 9/19/2019. (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-096838. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17732901 filed by Skrewball Spirits LLC. (O'Malley, Kevin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N)(ARC) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer T Kevin Roosevelt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Nolan Black