This case was last updated from PACER on 08/07/2020 at 10:55:11 (UTC).

1911 Chestnut Partners LP v. Banana Republic LLC

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 1911 Chestnut Partners LP filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Banana Republic LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN R. PADOVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02680

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN R. PADOVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

1911 Chestnut Partners LP

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Banana Republic LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

DAVID SAMUEL JAFFE

Attorney at FREUNDLICH & LITTMAN, LLC

1425 Walnut Street, Suite 200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JONATHAN D. ROSENAU

Attorney at FREUNDLICH & LITTMAN, LLC

1425 Walnut Street, Suite 200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

SCOTT ERIC DIAMOND

Attorney at Tucker Law Group, LLC

1801 Market Street, Suite 2500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOE H. TUCKER, JR.

Attorney at TUCKER LAW GROUP

Ten Penn Center, 1801 Market Street, Suite 2500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) Plaintiffs ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Banana Republic by 1911 Chestnut Partners LP.(JAFFE, DAVID) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

11 #2

Schedule Information Report

11 #1

Notice to Counsel

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Hearing:A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/3/20 AT 2:00 PM (BY TELEPHONE) BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Counsel, #2 Schedule Information Report)(fdc) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#10

(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint together with TO THE COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES WITH COUNTERCLAIMS , COUNTERCLAIM against 1911 Chestnut Partners LP by Banana Republic LLC.(TUCKER, JOE) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT BANANA REPUBLIC, LLCS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED BY JULY 17, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/2/20. 7/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION Defendant Banana Republic, LLCs response to Plaintiffs Complaint shall be filed by July 17, 2020 by Banana Republic LLC. (DIAMOND, SCOTT) Modified on 7/1/2020 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Banana Republic LLC. Banana Republic LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (DIAMOND, SCOTT) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Edatil P. Carmona re: served Summons, Complaint, Case Management Track Designation Form Civil Cover Sheet upon Terence Doe by Substituted on June 16, 2020 (JAFFE, DAVID) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Banana Republic LLC Designation Form (TUCKER, JOE) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOE H. TUCKER, JR on behalf of Banana Republic LLC with Certificate of Service(TUCKER, JOE) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT ERIC DIAMOND on behalf of Banana Republic LLC with Certificate of Service(DIAMOND, SCOTT) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN D. ROSENAU on behalf of 1911 Chestnut Partners LP (ROSENAU, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Case Management Track Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14339014.), filed by 1911 Chestnut Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit)(JAFFE, DAVID) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. A Preliminary Pretrial Telephone Conference was held on 8/3/20. (fdc) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Plaintiffs ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Banana Republic by 1911 Chestnut Partners LP.(JAFFE, DAVID) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Hearing:A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/3/20 AT 2:00 PM (BY TELEPHONE) BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Counsel, #2 Schedule Information Report)(fdc) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint together with TO THE COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES WITH COUNTERCLAIMS , COUNTERCLAIM against 1911 Chestnut Partners LP by Banana Republic LLC.(TUCKER, JOE) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT BANANA REPUBLIC, LLCS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED BY JULY 17, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/2/20. 7/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION Defendant Banana Republic, LLCs response to Plaintiffs Complaint shall be filed by July 17, 2020 by Banana Republic LLC. (DIAMOND, SCOTT) Modified on 7/1/2020 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Banana Republic LLC. Banana Republic LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (DIAMOND, SCOTT) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Edatil P. Carmona re: served Summons, Complaint, Case Management Track Designation Form Civil Cover Sheet upon Terence Doe by Substituted on June 16, 2020 (JAFFE, DAVID) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Banana Republic LLC Designation Form (TUCKER, JOE) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOE H. TUCKER, JR on behalf of Banana Republic LLC with Certificate of Service(TUCKER, JOE) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT ERIC DIAMOND on behalf of Banana Republic LLC with Certificate of Service(DIAMOND, SCOTT) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Banana Republic LLC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/9/20 (JL ) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN D. ROSENAU on behalf of 1911 Chestnut Partners LP (ROSENAU, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14339014.), filed by 1911 Chestnut Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit)(JAFFE, DAVID) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less