This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2022 at 07:19:08 (UTC).

1800 Fee Owner LLC et al v. Metropolitan Transportation Authority et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 1800 Fee Owner LLC filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Metropolitan Transportation Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alison J. Nathan and Sarah Netburn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09354

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alison J. Nathan

Referral Judge

Sarah Netburn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

1800 FEE OWNER LLC

1801 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC

1815 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC

Defendants

METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

MTA CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Casey J. Rahn

Attorney at Rosenberg & Estis, P.C.

733 Third Avenue, 15Th Floor, 10Th Fl.

New York, NY 10019

Cynthia Lovinger Siderman

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP (NYC)

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Michael Castellon

Attorney at Rosenberg & Estis PC

733 Third Avenue, Ste 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Gary M. Rosenberg

Attorney at Rosenberg & Estis, P.C.

733 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

James G. Greilsheimer

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorney

Gregory Frederick Laufer

Attorney at Paul Weiss (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Gregory F. Laufer dated November 29, 2021. Document filed by MTA Construction and Development Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, New York City Transit Authority..(Laufer, Gregory) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cynthia Lovinger Siderman on behalf of 1800 Fee Owner LLC, 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC, 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Siderman, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#18

(#18) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Margaret Jackson. Document filed by 1800 Fee Owner LLC, 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC, 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#17

(#17) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Laverne Sterling. Document filed by 1800 Fee Owner LLC, 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC, 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#16

(#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. New York City Transit Authority served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service was accepted by Laverne Sterling. Document filed by 1800 Fee Owner LLC; 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC; 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/17/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#14

(#14) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Metropolitan Transportation Authority served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Document filed by 1800 Fee Owner LLC; 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC; 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. MTA Construction and Development Company served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Document filed by 1800 Fee Owner LLC; 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC; 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary M. Rosenberg on behalf of 1800 Fee Owner LLC, 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC, 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Rosenberg, Gary) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James G. Greilsheimer on behalf of 1800 FEE OWNER LLC, 1801 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC, 1815 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC..(Greilsheimer, James) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Transit Authority, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 1800 FEE OWNER LLC, 1801 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC, 1815 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MTA Construction and Development Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 1800 FEE OWNER LLC, 1801 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC, 1815 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To AND PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metropolitan Transit Authority, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 1800 FEE OWNER LLC, 1801 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC, 1815 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC..(Castellon, Michael) Modified on 11/15/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' response to the complaint is due no later than January 28, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah) Modified on 12/2/2021 (ras). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Gregory F. Laufer dated November 29, 2021. Document filed by MTA Construction and Development Company, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, New York City Transit Authority..(Laufer, Gregory) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cynthia Lovinger Siderman on behalf of 1800 Fee Owner LLC, 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC, 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Siderman, Cynthia) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Margaret Jackson. Document filed by 1800 Fee Owner LLC, 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC, 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Laverne Sterling. Document filed by 1800 Fee Owner LLC, 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC, 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. New York City Transit Authority served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service was accepted by Laverne Sterling. Document filed by 1800 Fee Owner LLC; 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC; 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/17/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Metropolitan Transportation Authority served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Document filed by 1800 Fee Owner LLC; 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC; 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. MTA Construction and Development Company served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Document filed by 1800 Fee Owner LLC; 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC; 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary M. Rosenberg on behalf of 1800 Fee Owner LLC, 1801 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC, 1815 Park Avenue Acquisition LLC..(Rosenberg, Gary) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Castellon. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 1800 FEE OWNER LLC; 1801 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC; 1815 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC; METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY; MTA CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT COMPANY; NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James G. Greilsheimer on behalf of 1800 FEE OWNER LLC, 1801 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC, 1815 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC..(Greilsheimer, James) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Transit Authority, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 1800 FEE OWNER LLC, 1801 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC, 1815 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MTA Construction and Development Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 1800 FEE OWNER LLC, 1801 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC, 1815 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To AND PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metropolitan Transit Authority, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 1800 FEE OWNER LLC, 1801 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC, 1815 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC..(Castellon, Michael) Modified on 11/15/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, MTA CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25322876)Document filed by 1800 FEE OWNER LLC, 1815 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC, 1801 PARK AVENUE ACQUISITION LLC..(Castellon, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New York City Transit Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where Metropolitan Transportation Authority is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Frederick Laufer