This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:11:44 (UTC).

151 FOODS, LLC v. TROMP GROUP AMERICAS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 151 FOODS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TROMP GROUP AMERICAS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann Marie Donio and Joseph H. Rodriguez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-17093

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

151 FOODS, LLC

Defendants

TROMP BAKERY EQUIPMENT BV

AMF BAKERY SYSTEMS

AMF TROMP BV

TROMP GROUP AMERICAS, LLC

LILLNORD A/S

BITZER US INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TAYLOR PAIGE FESTA

Attorney at DILWORTH PAXSON LLP

1500 Market Street, Suite 3500E

Philadelphia, PA 19102

PATRICK MICHAEL HARRINGTON

Attorney at DILWORTH PAXSON LLP

1500 Market Street, Suite 3500

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO

Attorney at Robinson Miller LLC

110 Edison Place, Suite 302

Newark, NJ 07102

JENNIFER LYNN BLOOM

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE TERMINATION. The Court shall conduct a telephone status conference on March 30, 2020 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/11/2019. (tf, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER that this matter is stayed until the resolution of the mediation between plaintiff 151 Foods,LLC and defendant AMF Bakery Systems, or until the Court removes the stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/11/2019. (tf, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Stay Litigation by 151 FOODS, LLC. (HARRINGTON, PATRICK) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 151 FOODS, LLC identifying Quattro Foods Group, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (FESTA, TAYLOR) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by TAYLOR PAIGE FESTA on behalf of 151 FOODS, LLC (FESTA, TAYLOR) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#5

(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant AMF Bakery Systems.. (BLOOM, JENNIFER) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMF BAKERY SYSTEMS identifying Markel Food Group, Markel Ventures, Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (BLOOM, JENNIFER) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER LYNN BLOOM on behalf of AMF BAKERY SYSTEMS (BLOOM, JENNIFER) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Order Initial Conference set for 9/25/2019 11:30 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/23/2019. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B (Part 2)

1 #2

Exhibit B (Part 1)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMF BAKERY SYSTEMS from Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County, case number CAM-L-2849-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9913731), filed by AMF BAKERY SYSTEMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Part 1), #3 Exhibit B (Part 2), #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(GESUALDO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE TERMINATION. The Court shall conduct a telephone status conference on March 30, 2020 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/11/2019. (tf, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER that this matter is stayed until the resolution of the mediation between plaintiff 151 Foods,LLC and defendant AMF Bakery Systems, or until the Court removes the stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/11/2019. (tf, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Stay Litigation by 151 FOODS, LLC. (HARRINGTON, PATRICK) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 151 FOODS, LLC identifying Quattro Foods Group, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (FESTA, TAYLOR) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by TAYLOR PAIGE FESTA on behalf of 151 FOODS, LLC (FESTA, TAYLOR) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMF BAKERY SYSTEMS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/12/2019. (tf, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant AMF Bakery Systems.. (BLOOM, JENNIFER) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMF BAKERY SYSTEMS identifying Markel Food Group, Markel Ventures, Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (BLOOM, JENNIFER) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER LYNN BLOOM on behalf of AMF BAKERY SYSTEMS (BLOOM, JENNIFER) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The State Court Complaint submitted by Patrick M. Harrington appears to have address and contact information that does not match the court's records. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order Initial Conference set for 9/25/2019 11:30 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/23/2019. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMF BAKERY SYSTEMS from Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County, case number CAM-L-2849-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9913731), filed by AMF BAKERY SYSTEMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Part 1), #3 Exhibit B (Part 2), #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(GESUALDO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.