This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 17:18:59 (UTC).

1250 West LLC v. Hampton

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 1250 West LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Hampton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Justin S. Anand and Mark H. Cohen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03850

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

1250 West LLC

1250 West LLC doing business as 1250 West Apts

Defendant

Shannon Hampton

Marietta, GA 30064

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Richard Passino

Attorney at David Passino, Attorney at Law

Suite 301, 11180 State Bridge Road

Alpharetta, GA 30022

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Remand Letter to Cobb County Magistrate Court (adg) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER APPROVING and ADOPTING the #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court. The action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/17/2019. (adg) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/29/2019. (adg) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#3

(#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this action be REMANDED to the MagistrateCourt of Cobb County re #2 Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/29/2019. (adg) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Shannon Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation and #6 Remand Letter to Shannon Hampton (Certified copies of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation mailed to Cobb Magistrate Court). (adg) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Remand Letter to Cobb County Magistrate Court (adg) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (adg) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER APPROVING and ADOPTING the #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court. The action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/17/2019. (adg) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Shannon Hampton re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Shannon Hampton, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (adg) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/29/2019. (adg) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this action be REMANDED to the MagistrateCourt of Cobb County re #2 Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/29/2019. (adg) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Shannon Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/29/2019. (adg) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (tcc) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shannon Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less