This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 08:12:34 (UTC).

10X Genomics, Inc. et al v. NanoString Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 10X Genomics, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against NanoString Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00261

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

10X Genomics, Inc.

President and Fellows of Harvard College

Defendant and Counter Claimant

NanoString Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Karen Jacobs

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Cameron Paul Clark

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward R. Reines and Derek C. Walter - filed by NanoString Technologies, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Farnan on behalf of NanoString Technologies, Inc. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#12

(#12) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by NanoString Technologies, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against 10X Genomics, Inc., President and Fellows of Harvard College by NanoString Technologies, Inc..(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER, re D.I. #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 4/21/2022. Signed by Judge Matthew F Kennelly on 03/21/2022. (smg) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 4/21/2022 - filed by NanoString Technologies, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew Powers, Paul Ehrlich, Stefani Smith, Samantha Jameson and Kiley White - filed by 10X Genomics, Inc., President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Clark, Cameron) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by President and Fellows of Harvard College, 10X Genomics, Inc.. NanoString Technologies, Inc. served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to NanoString Technologies, Inc. on 2/28/2022. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by 10X Genomics, Inc.. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,227,639 B2 ;11,021,737 B2. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 1-4

1 #2

Attachment B

1 #1

Attachment A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against NanoString Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3813351.) - filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College, 10X Genomics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Exhibit 1-4, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward R. Reines and Derek C. Walter - filed by NanoString Technologies, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Farnan on behalf of NanoString Technologies, Inc. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by NanoString Technologies, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against 10X Genomics, Inc., President and Fellows of Harvard College by NanoString Technologies, Inc..(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER, re D.I. #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 4/21/2022. Signed by Judge Matthew F Kennelly on 03/21/2022. (smg) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 4/21/2022 - filed by NanoString Technologies, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Matthew F Kennelly of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, due to related case. Please include the initials of the Judge (MFK) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew Powers, Paul Ehrlich, Stefani Smith, Samantha Jameson and Kiley White - filed by 10X Genomics, Inc., President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Clark, Cameron) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by President and Fellows of Harvard College, 10X Genomics, Inc.. NanoString Technologies, Inc. served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to NanoString Technologies, Inc. on 2/28/2022. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by 10X Genomics, Inc.. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,227,639 B2 ;11,021,737 B2. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against NanoString Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3813351.) - filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College, 10X Genomics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Exhibit 1-4, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 10X GENOMICS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The President And Fellows of Harvard College is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Farnan