This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2020 at 10:11:04 (UTC).

10TALES, INC. v. TIKTOK, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 10TALES, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against TIKTOK, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00810

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

10TALES, INC.

Defendant

TIKTOK, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William E. Davis, III

Attorney at The Davis Firm, PC

213 N. Fredonia Street, Suite 230

Longview, TX 75601

Thomas J. Fisher

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1200 19Th Street, Nw, Third Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Barry P. Golob

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1200 19Th Street N.W., Third Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Jason E. Mueller

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, 24Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

Martin R. Bader

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

12275 El Camino Real, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

David M. Hoffman

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 810

Austin, TX 78701

Ericka J. Schulz

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

12275 El Camino Real, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

Stephen S. Korniczky

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

12275 El Camino Real, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Correction to Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Fisher by 10TALES, INC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#18

(#18) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason E. Mueller on behalf of Martin R. Bader ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14089854) by on behalf of TIKTOK, INC.. (Mueller, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

(#17) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TIKTOK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason E. Mueller on behalf of Ericka J. Schulz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14046227) by on behalf of TIKTOK, INC.. (Mueller, Jason) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason E. Mueller on behalf of Stephen S. Korniczky ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14046208) by on behalf of TIKTOK, INC.. (Mueller, Jason) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason E. Mueller on behalf of TIKTOK, INC.. Attorney Jason E. Mueller added to party TIKTOK, INC.(pty:dft) (Mueller, Jason) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

3 #1

AO-120

#3

(#3) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (lad) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by 10TALES, INC.. (Davis, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - TikTok Privacy Policy

1 #5

Exhibit E - Newsroom post

1 #4

Exhibit D - Assignment

1 #3

Exhibit C - TikTok Careers

1 #2

Exhibit B - LinkedIn Page

1 #1

Exhibit A - US Patent 8,856,030

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13925897), filed by 10TALES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent 8,856,030, #2 Exhibit B - LinkedIn Page, #3 Exhibit C - TikTok Careers, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment, #5 Exhibit E - Newsroom post, #6 Exhibit F - TikTok Privacy Policy, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Martin R. Bader for TIKTOK, INC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Correction to Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Fisher by 10TALES, INC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason E. Mueller on behalf of Martin R. Bader ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14089854) by on behalf of TIKTOK, INC.. (Mueller, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ericka J. Schulz for TIKTOK, INC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen S. Korniczky for TIKTOK, INC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court, having considered David Hoffman and Fish & Richardson P.C.s unopposed motion to withdraw as counsel of record has merit and thus hereby GRANTS the motion to withdraw.Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that David Hoffman and Fish & Richardson P.C. are withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant, TikTok, Inc. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TIKTOK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason E. Mueller on behalf of Ericka J. Schulz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14046227) by on behalf of TIKTOK, INC.. (Mueller, Jason) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason E. Mueller on behalf of Stephen S. Korniczky ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14046208) by on behalf of TIKTOK, INC.. (Mueller, Jason) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason E. Mueller on behalf of TIKTOK, INC.. Attorney Jason E. Mueller added to party TIKTOK, INC.(pty:dft) (Mueller, Jason) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Hoffman on behalf of TIKTOK, INC.. Attorney David M. Hoffman added to party TIKTOK, INC.(pty:dft) (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 10TALES, INC.. TIKTOK, INC. served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Davis, William) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 10TALES, INC.. (Davis, William) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to TIKTOK, INC.. (lad) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (lad) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by 10TALES, INC.. (Davis, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13925897), filed by 10TALES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent 8,856,030, #2 Exhibit B - LinkedIn Page, #3 Exhibit C - TikTok Careers, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment, #5 Exhibit E - Newsroom post, #6 Exhibit F - TikTok Privacy Policy, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TikTok, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J Fisher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Ellsworth Davis, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barry P. Golob