This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 09:35:26 (UTC).

1010 East Avenue J LLC v. Union Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 1010 East Avenue J LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Union Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00958

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1010 East Avenue J LLC

Defendants

Berkley Southeast Insurance Group

Union Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lindsey Marsh Brown

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

2300 Ross Avenue, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Jay K Wieser

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

777 Main Street, Suite 2100

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Allison Allman

Attorney at Jackson Walker

777 Main Street, Suite 2100

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Gossom Martin

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman& Dicker LLP

4800 Bank Of America Plaza, 901 Main Street

Dallas, TX 75202-3758

Timothy P Delabar

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 4800

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #12 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion by Defendant Union Insurance Company. (Delabar, Timothy) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#12

(#12) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Union Insurance Company re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Second Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#11

(#11) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Union Insurance Company (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 11/23/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/23/2020. Motions due by 3/29/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/27/2021. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Pretrial Order due by 7/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 7/26/2021 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/23/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit(s)

#9

(#9) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by 1010 East Avenue J LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Wieser, Jay) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by 1010 East Avenue J LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Brown, Lindsey) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#6

(#6) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Union Insurance Company re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Union Insurance Company (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER... The Joint Report, which shall be filed on or before September 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/25/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate W.R. Berkley Corporation for Union Insurance Company. (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

1 #4

Additional Page(s) Attachment 4

1 #3

Additional Page(s) Attachment 3

1 #2

Additional Page(s) Attachment 2

1 #1

Additional Page(s) Attachment 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Union Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11108981) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Attachment 1, #2 Additional Page(s) Attachment 2, #3 Additional Page(s) Attachment 3, #4 Additional Page(s) Attachment 4, #5 Additional Page(s) Attachment 5, #6 Additional Page(s) Attachment 6, #7 Additional Page(s) Attachment 7, #8 Additional Page(s) 8, #9 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #12 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion by Defendant Union Insurance Company. (Delabar, Timothy) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Union Insurance Company re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Second Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Union Insurance Company (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 11/23/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/23/2020. Motions due by 3/29/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/27/2021. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Pretrial Order due by 7/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 7/26/2021 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/23/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by 1010 East Avenue J LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Wieser, Jay) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/22/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by 1010 East Avenue J LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Brown, Lindsey) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Union Insurance Company re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Union Insurance Company (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER... The Joint Report, which shall be filed on or before September 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/25/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate W.R. Berkley Corporation for Union Insurance Company. (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Union Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11108981) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Attachment 1, #2 Additional Page(s) Attachment 2, #3 Additional Page(s) Attachment 3, #4 Additional Page(s) Attachment 4, #5 Additional Page(s) Attachment 5, #6 Additional Page(s) Attachment 6, #7 Additional Page(s) Attachment 7, #8 Additional Page(s) 8, #9 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less