This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2021 at 02:25:13 (UTC).

WordCheck Tech, LLC v. Alt-N Technologies, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2010 WordCheck Tech, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alt-N Technologies, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard Davis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:10-CV-00457

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard Davis

 

Party Details

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Red Earth Software, Inc.

Check Point Software, LLC

Esoft, Inc.

Liveoffice Holdings, LLC

Unify Corporation

Permessa Corporation

Palisade Systems, Inc.

RSA Security, LLC

Entrust, Inc. d/b/a Entrust Technologies, Inc.

ZL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Computer Associates International, Inc.

The Electric Mail Company

Mimosa Systems, Inc.

Safenet, Inc.

RSA Security, Inc.

Appriver LLC

GTB Technologies, Inc.

Itech, Inc.

1391 Main Road

Washington Island, WI 54246

ROCKLIFFE SYSTEMS D/B/A ROCKLIFFE SYSTEMS, INC. D/B/A ROCKLIFFE, INC. D/B/A MAILSITE, INC.

SHERPA SOFTWARE GROUP, L.P. A/K/A SHERPA SOFTWARE PARTNERS, L.P. D/B/A SHERPA SOFTWARE

88 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Keith Shandalow

2299 Pearl Street, Suite 106

Boulder, CO 80302

Roger Brian Craft

102 N College Avenue, Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Kevin P. Perkins

Attorney at Vanacour Schuler Zarin PLLC

14675 Midway Road, Ste. 100

Addison, TX 75001

Kenneth Wayne Biermacher

1601 Elm St, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Marvin Craig Tyler

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

500 W. 2Nd Street, Suite 1900

Austin, TX 78701

Christopher R Ottenweller

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Indra Neel Chatterjee

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP - Menlo Park

135 Commonweath Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

William Joseph Cornelius, Jr

Attorney at Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

One American Center, 909 Ese Loop 323, Suite 400, P.O. Box 7339

Tyler, TX 75711-7339

Michael K Ng

Attorney at Kobre & Kim LLP - San Francisco

150 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111

Douglas Mark Kubehl

Attorney at Baker Botts - Dallas

2001 Ross Ave., Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201-2980

Other Attorneys

Brian R. Nester

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP - Washington

1501 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Joseph K Liu

One Llp - Newport Beach, 4000 Macarthur Blvd, East Tower, Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

John Frederick Bufe

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 North College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Andrew W. Spangler

Attorney at Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

208 N. Green Street, Ste 300

Longview, TX 75601

Michael Thomas McLemore

Attorney at Law Office of Michael T. McLemore

107 Neville Wood Ct

Lakeway, TX 78738

Theodore Herhold

Attorney at Singularity LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 610

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Henry Mark Pogorzelski

Attorney at Edmonds & Schlather PLLC - Houston

1616 South Voss Road, Suite 125

Houston, TX 77057

Brian E Moran

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP - Stamford

1055 Washington Blvd

Stamford, CT 06901-2249

Robert W Faulkner

Attorney at JAMS Inc

8401 N. Central Expressway, Suite 610

Dallas, TX 75225

Andrew Patrick Tower

Attorney at Edmonds & Schlather PLLC - Houston

1616 South Voss Road, Suite 125

Houston, TX 77057

104 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#821

(#821) FINAL JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Orders granting parties' Joint Motions to Dismiss all 64 defendants. All pending motions are denied as moot. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Further ordered that all claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims are dismissed in their entirety. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/12/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/13/2012)

#820

(#820) ORDER granting #813 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by WordCheck Tech, LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, and defendant Rockliffe Systems, Inc. d/b/a Rockliffe, Inc. d/b/a Mailsite are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All costs, expenses and attorneys fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/12. cc:attys 11-30-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/30/2012)

#819

(#819) ORDER that deft Rockliffe Systems file a notice with the Court by noon, 11-30-2012 stating whether it has paid fees to Michael McLemore for his services as technical advisor to the Court. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/12. cc:attys 11-28-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/28/2012)

#818

(#818) NOTICE by ROCKLIFFE SYSTEMS D/B/A ROCKLIFFE SYSTEMS, INC. D/B/A ROCKLIFFE, INC. D/B/A MAILSITE, INC. re #815 Order, Set Hearings,,,,,, NOTICE OF PAYMENT TO TECHNICAL ADVISOR (Price, Adam) (Entered: 11/28/2012)

816 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#816

(#816) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Stipulated) by Bitdefender LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wu, Daniel) (Entered: 11/27/2012)

#815

(#815) ORDER that Rockliffe defts immediately pay Michael McLemore the $4,456.25 balance of fees regarding services as this court's technical advisor. In addition, before the Court is a Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of all claims and counterclaims asserted between WordCheck Tech LLC and Rockliffe #813 . This Court will not enter an Order granting this Stipulated Motion for Dismissal until Rockliffe pays Mr. McLemore. Further, the Court sets a SHOW CAUSE hearing for 12-04-2012 at 3:00 p.m; Show Cause Hearing set for 12/4/2012 03:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. If Rockcliffe has not paid Mr. McLemore before this date, Rockcliffe is ORDERED to appear and show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, and judgment entered against it, for failure to comply with a court order. Rockcliffe is further ORDERED to file a notice with the Court when it pays Mr. McLemore. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/16/12. cc:attys 11-19-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/19/2012)

813 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order

#813

(#813) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Rockliffe Systems, Inc. d/b/a Rockliffe, Inc. d/b/a Mailsite by WordCheck Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Edmonds, John) (Entered: 11/15/2012)

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WordCheck Tech, LLC (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 09/10/2010)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Spangler on behalf of WordCheck Tech, LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2010)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erick Scott Robinson on behalf of WordCheck Tech, LLC (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 09/08/2010)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AXS-One, Inc., Alt-N Technologies, Ltd., Appriver LLC, Athena Archiver, Inc., Awareness Technologies, Inc., BLUE COAT SYSTEMS, INC., Bitdefender LLC, CA, Inc. d/b/a CA Technologies, Check Point Software Technologies, Inc., Check Point Software, LLC, Code Green Networks International, Inc., Code Green Networks, Inc., Computer Associates International, Inc., Computer Mail Services, Inc., EMC Corporation, Electric Mail (International) L.P., Entrust, Inc. d/b/a Entrust Technologies, Inc., Esoft, Inc., Facetime Communications, Inc., Fidelis Security Systems, Inc., Fortinet, Inc., GFI Software Development, Ltd., GFI USA, Inc., GTB Technologies, Inc., Global Relay Communications, Inc., Global Relay USA, Inc., Intego, Inc., Iron Mountain Inc. d/b/a Iron Mountain Company, Itech, Inc., Liveoffice Holdings, LLC, Liveoffice, LLC, MicroWorld Technologies, Inc., Mimecast North America, Inc., Mimecast Services, Ltd., Mimecast, Ltd., Mimosa Systems, Inc., Palisade Systems, Inc., Permessa Corporation, Quest Software, Inc., ROCKLIFFE SYSTEMS D/B/A ROCKLIFFE SYSTEMS, INC. D/B/A ROCKLIFFE, INC. D/B/A MAILSITE, INC., RSA Security, Inc., RSA Security, LLC, Red Earth Software (UK) Ltd., Red Earth Software, Inc., SHERPA SOFTWARE GROUP, INC. D/B/A SHERPA SOFTWARE, SHERPA SOFTWARE GROUP, L.P. A/K/A SHERPA SOFTWARE PARTNERS, L.P. D/B/A SHERPA SOFTWARE, Safenet, Inc., Smarsh, Inc., Solinus, Inc. d/b/a Mailfoundry, St. Bernard Software, Inc., The Electric Mail Company, Trustwave Corporation, Trustwave Holdings, Inc., Unify Corporation, Verdasys Inc., Vericept Corporation, Virtualconnect Technologies, Inc., WATERFORD TECHNOLOGIES GROUP, LTD. D/B/A WATERFORD TECHNOLOGIES GROUP, WATERFORD TECHNOLOGIES, INC. D/B/A SEATTLELAB, INC. D/B/A SEATTLELAB, WORKSHARE TECHNOLOGY, INC. D/B/A WORKSHARE, INC., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc., ZL TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ZSCALER, INC., j2 Global Communications, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2658064.), filed by WordCheck Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Edmonds, John) (Entered: 09/07/2010)

1,183 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#821) FINAL JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Orders granting parties' Joint Motions to Dismiss all 64 defendants. All pending motions are denied as moot. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Further ordered that all claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims are dismissed in their entirety. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/12/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/13/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#820) ORDER granting #813 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by WordCheck Tech, LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, and defendant Rockliffe Systems, Inc. d/b/a Rockliffe, Inc. d/b/a Mailsite are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All costs, expenses and attorneys fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/12. cc:attys 11-30-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/30/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#819) ORDER that deft Rockliffe Systems file a notice with the Court by noon, 11-30-2012 stating whether it has paid fees to Michael McLemore for his services as technical advisor to the Court. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/12. cc:attys 11-28-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#818) NOTICE by ROCKLIFFE SYSTEMS D/B/A ROCKLIFFE SYSTEMS, INC. D/B/A ROCKLIFFE, INC. D/B/A MAILSITE, INC. re #815 Order, Set Hearings,,,,,, NOTICE OF PAYMENT TO TECHNICAL ADVISOR (Price, Adam) (Entered: 11/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#817) ORDER granting #816 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, and defendant BitDefender, LLC, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All costs, expenses and attorneys fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/12. cc:attys 11-28-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#816) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Stipulated) by Bitdefender LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wu, Daniel) (Entered: 11/27/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#815) ORDER that Rockliffe defts immediately pay Michael McLemore the $4,456.25 balance of fees regarding services as this court's technical advisor. In addition, before the Court is a Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of all claims and counterclaims asserted between WordCheck Tech LLC and Rockliffe #813 . This Court will not enter an Order granting this Stipulated Motion for Dismissal until Rockliffe pays Mr. McLemore. Further, the Court sets a SHOW CAUSE hearing for 12-04-2012 at 3:00 p.m; Show Cause Hearing set for 12/4/2012 03:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. If Rockcliffe has not paid Mr. McLemore before this date, Rockcliffe is ORDERED to appear and show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, and judgment entered against it, for failure to comply with a court order. Rockcliffe is further ORDERED to file a notice with the Court when it pays Mr. McLemore. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/16/12. cc:attys 11-19-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/19/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#814) NOTICE by WordCheck Tech, LLC Notice of Narrowing of Patent Claims (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 11/16/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#813) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Rockliffe Systems, Inc. d/b/a Rockliffe, Inc. d/b/a Mailsite by WordCheck Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Edmonds, John) (Entered: 11/15/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#812) ORDER granting #810 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by WordCheck Tech, LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, and defendants, EMC Corporation and RSA Security LLC, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All costs, expenses and attorney's fees are to be borne by theparty that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/13/12. cc:attys 11-13-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/13/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
923 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AXS-One, Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Awareness Technologies, Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Appriver LLC. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Alt-N Technologies, Ltd.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Check Point Software, LLC. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WordCheck Tech, LLC (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 09/10/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Spangler on behalf of WordCheck Tech, LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erick Scott Robinson on behalf of WordCheck Tech, LLC (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 09/08/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • DocketJudge Leonard Davis added. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/08/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AXS-One, Inc., Alt-N Technologies, Ltd., Appriver LLC, Athena Archiver, Inc., Awareness Technologies, Inc., BLUE COAT SYSTEMS, INC., Bitdefender LLC, CA, Inc. d/b/a CA Technologies, Check Point Software Technologies, Inc., Check Point Software, LLC, Code Green Networks International, Inc., Code Green Networks, Inc., Computer Associates International, Inc., Computer Mail Services, Inc., EMC Corporation, Electric Mail (International) L.P., Entrust, Inc. d/b/a Entrust Technologies, Inc., Esoft, Inc., Facetime Communications, Inc., Fidelis Security Systems, Inc., Fortinet, Inc., GFI Software Development, Ltd., GFI USA, Inc., GTB Technologies, Inc., Global Relay Communications, Inc., Global Relay USA, Inc., Intego, Inc., Iron Mountain Inc. d/b/a Iron Mountain Company, Itech, Inc., Liveoffice Holdings, LLC, Liveoffice, LLC, MicroWorld Technologies, Inc., Mimecast North America, Inc., Mimecast Services, Ltd., Mimecast, Ltd., Mimosa Systems, Inc., Palisade Systems, Inc., Permessa Corporation, Quest Software, Inc., ROCKLIFFE SYSTEMS D/B/A ROCKLIFFE SYSTEMS, INC. D/B/A ROCKLIFFE, INC. D/B/A MAILSITE, INC., RSA Security, Inc., RSA Security, LLC, Red Earth Software (UK) Ltd., Red Earth Software, Inc., SHERPA SOFTWARE GROUP, INC. D/B/A SHERPA SOFTWARE, SHERPA SOFTWARE GROUP, L.P. A/K/A SHERPA SOFTWARE PARTNERS, L.P. D/B/A SHERPA SOFTWARE, Safenet, Inc., Smarsh, Inc., Solinus, Inc. d/b/a Mailfoundry, St. Bernard Software, Inc., The Electric Mail Company, Trustwave Corporation, Trustwave Holdings, Inc., Unify Corporation, Verdasys Inc., Vericept Corporation, Virtualconnect Technologies, Inc., WATERFORD TECHNOLOGIES GROUP, LTD. D/B/A WATERFORD TECHNOLOGIES GROUP, WATERFORD TECHNOLOGIES, INC. D/B/A SEATTLELAB, INC. D/B/A SEATTLELAB, WORKSHARE TECHNOLOGY, INC. D/B/A WORKSHARE, INC., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc., ZL TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ZSCALER, INC., j2 Global Communications, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2658064.), filed by WordCheck Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Edmonds, John) (Entered: 09/07/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Entrust, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RSA Data Security Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Unify Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Safenet, Inc. is a litigant