This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2021 at 01:47:11 (UTC).

Tucson Airport Authority v. Goforth et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2012 Tucson Airport Authority filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Goforth. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Cindy K Jorgenson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:12-MC-00014

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cindy K Jorgenson

 

Party Details

Respondents

Arizona, State of

Tucson Foundry & Manufacturing Incorporated

Arizona Board of Regents

Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company

Texas Instruments Incorporated

Boeing Company

Fersha Corporation

Richard Peterson

Archie Eugene Goforth

United States of America

Freescale Semiconductor Incorporated

Rollings Corporation

R.E. Darling Incorporated

Tomkins Industries Incorporated

ABB Incorporated

Tucson Dodge Incorporated

General Electric Company

Paul's Aircraft Incorporated

Evergreen Helicopters Incorporated

Pima County Community College District

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Jeffrey Dirk Cantrell

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1275 W Washington

Phoenix, AZ 85007

Anthony Edward Young

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1275 W Washington

Phoenix, AZ 85007

Erin Elizabeth Richardson

Attorney at Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC

2901 N Central Ave., Ste. 800

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Christopher David Thomas

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 2700

Phoenix, AZ 85004

John Charles Emerson Barrett

Attorney at DeConcini McDonald Yetwin & Lacy PC - Tucson

2525 E Broadway Blvd., Ste. 200

Tucson, AZ 85716-5300

John M Barkett

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

201 S Biscayne Blvd., Ste. 2400

Miami, FL 33131

John C Richardson

Attorney at DeConcini McDonald Yetwin & Lacy PC

2525 E Broadway Blvd, Ste 200

Tucson, AZ 85716-5300

Other Attorneys

Alan N Bick

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP - Irvine, CA

4 Park Plz., Ste. 1400

Irvine, CA 92614-8557

Matthew Joy

Attorney at Jorden Bischoff & Hiser PLC

7272 E Indian School Rd., Ste. 360

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Jon David Weiss

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP - Phoenix Office

201 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Carla A Consoli

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP - Phoenix Office

201 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Justin T Goodwin

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP - Irvine, CA

3161 Michelson Dr., 12Th Fl.

Irvine, CA 92612-4412

Eric Lynn Hiser

Attorney at Jorden Bischoff & Hiser PLC

7272 E Indian School Rd., Ste. 360

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Joel Louis Herz

Attorney at Law Offices of Joel L Herz

3573 E Sunrise Dr., Ste. 215

Tucson, AZ 85718-3206

Harlan C Agnew

Attorney at Pima County Attorneys Office

32 N Stone Ave., Ste. 2100

Tucson, AZ 85701

Charles A Bischoff

Attorney at Jorden Bischoff & Hiser PLC

7272 E Indian School Rd, Ste 360

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Jeffrey Garth Baxter

Attorney at Rusing Lopez & Lizardi PLLC

6363 N Swan Rd., Ste. 151

Tucson, AZ 85718

Patrick Joseph Paul

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

1 Arizona Ctr, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-0001

James F Murphy

Attorney at Adler Murphy & McQuillen LLP

20 S Clark St., Ste. 2500

Chicago, IL 60603

Oscar Steven Lizardi

Attorney at Rusing Lopez & Lizardi PLLC

6363 N Swan Rd., Ste. 151

Tucson, AZ 85718

23 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#136

#135

134 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Counsel

#134

#133

#132

#131

#130

#129

#7

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

135 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #136 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketPRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX144092 as to Kimberly L Bick. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kimberly L Bick on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation. (BAS) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) ORDER, Michael F. McNulty be substituted for and in place of Harlan C. Agnew as representing counsel in the above-captioned matter and from the Court Approved Mailing List. It is further ORDERED that Harlan C. Agnew is removed from all future pleadings, notices and correspondence; and all future pleadings, notices and correspondence be forwarded directly to Michael F. McNulty at his current mailing address as stated on the Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 3/14/14. (KAH) (Entered: 03/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Michael F McNulty. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Counsel)(McNulty, Michael) (Entered: 03/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#133) ORDER ; TAA requests this matter be closed. No objections to this request have been filed. The Clerk of Court shall close its file in this matter. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 12/17/13. (SMBE) (Entered: 12/17/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) NOTICE re Tucson Airport Authority's Notice of Conclusion of Video Taped Deposition by Tucson Airport Authority . (Kuhn, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Matthew Joy. (Joy, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) STATUS REPORT for October 2013 by Tucson Airport Authority. (Kuhn, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) STATUS REPORT Status Report for August 1, 2013 by Tucson Airport Authority. (Kuhn, Cynthia) (Entered: 08/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2012
  • DocketPRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX123598 as to Robert M Jackson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 06/29/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert M. Jackson by Raytheon Company. (Jackson, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher David Thomas on behalf of Texas Instruments Incorporated. (Thomas, Christopher) (Entered: 05/29/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • DocketPRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX122403 as to James F Murphy. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 05/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James F. Murphy by Tucson Airport Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Murphy, James) (Entered: 05/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Additional Attachments to Main Document by Petitioner Tucson Airport Authority. (Kuhn, Cynthia) (Entered: 04/30/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 PETITION/MOTION to Perpetuate Testimony of Archie Eugene Goforth, Dolly Forren, Richard Peterson. by Petitioner Tucson Airport Authority. (Kuhn, Cynthia) (Entered: 04/30/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-6695866. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Raner C Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:12-MC-14-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (PAA) (Entered: 04/30/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION/MOTION to Perpetuate Testimony of Archie Eugene Goforth, Dolly Forren, Richard Peterson. filed by Tucson Airport Authority. (Kuhn, Cynthia) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(PAA) (Entered: 04/30/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROLLINGS is a litigant

Latest cases where Evergreen Helicopters, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Arizona Board of Regents is a litigant

Latest cases where NXP USA, Inc. is a litigant