This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2021 at 01:58:11 (UTC).

The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust v. AU Optronics Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2011 The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against AU Optronics Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Illston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:11-CV-05781

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Illston

 

Party Details

Defendants

CMO Japan Co., Ltd.

Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation

Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.

AU Optronics Corporation America

LG Display Co., Ltd.

NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.

Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.

Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc.

LG Display America, Inc.

Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.

Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.

Sharp Corporation

Toshiba Corporation

NEC Electronics America, Inc.

NEC Corporation

Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.

Sharp Electronics Corporation

HannStar Display Corporation

Epson Imaging Devices Corporation

Special Master

Martin Quinn

San Francisco, CA 94111

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Harrison J. Frahn, IV

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Christopher B. Hockett

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

1600 El Camino Real

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Emmet P. Ong

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

1301 Clay Street, Suite 340-S

Oakland, CA 94612-5217

Bradley R. Hansen

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

701 Pierce Street, Suite 400

Sioux City, IA 51101

Elizabeth Ann Gillen

Attorney at Simpson Thacher and Bartlett - Palo Alto

2475 Hanover St

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Kristen Jentsch McAhren

Attorney at White and Case LLP

701 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Erin Murdock-Park

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1900 E. 9Th Street, Suite 3200, Pnc Center

Cleveland, OH 44114

Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

1900 East Ninth St., Suite 3200

Cleveland, OH 44114-3482

Lindsay A. Lutz

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman

Four Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Allison Ann Davis

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Melissa Derr Schmidt

Attorney at Simpson Thatcher and Bartlett LLP

2475 Hanover St

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Jason Matthew Bussey

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

70 W. Hedding Street, 9Th Floor, East Wing

San Jose, CA 95110

Ramona M. Emerson

Attorney at K&L GATES

925 4Th Avenue, Suite 2900

Seattle, WA 98104

Jason Sheffield Angell

Attorney at Freitas Angell & Weinberg LLP

350 Marine Parkway, Sutie 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Jerry Chen

Attorney at Technowledge Law Group LLP

20660 Stevens Creek Blvd., Suite 381

Cupertino, CA 95014

Robert E. Freitas

Attorney at Freitas Angell & Weinberg LLP

350 Marine Parkway, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Other Attorneys

Scott N. Wagner

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 2500

Miami, FL 33131

William A. Isaacson

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street, N.W

Washington, DC 20006

Philip J. Iovieno

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP

10 North Pearl Street, 4Th Floor

Albany, NY 12207

Robert William Turken

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price and Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131-5340

26 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

240 #1

part 2

#240

(#240) Conditional REMAND ORDER. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi for the MDL Panel on 3/9/15. (Attachments: # 1 Order Suggesting Remand to Transferor Courts ). (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

237 #1

Exhibit A - List of Remaining Defendants

#237

(#237) JOINT STATUS REPORT for Track 2 Cases by The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Remaining Defendants)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 2/20/2015) Modified on 2/23/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/20/2015)

#234

(#234) Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [Master Docket No. 9290] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/5/2014) (Entered: 11/05/2014)

#231

(#231) Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Non-Party Co-Conspirators [Master Docket No. 9214] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 9/10/2014) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

1 #18

Summon(s) NEC Corporation

1 #17

Summon(s) Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc.

1 #16

Summon(s) Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd.

1 #15

Summon(s) LG Display Co., Ltd.

1 #14

Summon(s) LG Display America, Inc.

1 #13

Summon(s) Hitachi, Ltd.

1 #12

Summon(s) Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.

1 #11

Summon(s) Hitachi Displays, Ltd.

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, HannStar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC DISPLAY SOLUTIONS OF AMERICA, INC., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC., Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD.. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-4201240, filed by AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) AU Optronics Corporation, #3 Summon(s) AU Optronics Corporation America, #4 Summon(s) Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, #5 Summon(s) Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., #6 Summon(s) Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd., #7 Summon(s) CMO Japan Co., Ltd., #8 Summon(s) Epson Electronics America, Inc., #9 Summon(s) Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, #10 Summon(s) Hannstar Display Corporation, #11 Summon(s) Hitachi Displays, Ltd., #12 Summon(s) Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., #13 Summon(s) Hitachi, Ltd., #14 Summon(s) LG Display America, Inc., #15 Summon(s) LG Display Co., Ltd., #16 Summon(s) Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd., #17 Summon(s) Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc., #18 Summon(s) NEC Corporation, #19 Summon(s) NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., #20 Summon(s) NEC Electronics America, Inc., #21 Summon(s) NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., #22 Summon(s) Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., #23 Summon(s) Sharp Corporation, #24 Summon(s) Sharp Electronics Corporation, #25 Summon(s) Tatung Company of America, Inc., #26 Summon(s) Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., #27 Summon(s) Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., #28 Summon(s) Toshiba Corporation, #29 Summon(s) Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.)(Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 11/02/2011)

#9405

(#239) ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/24/2015) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

#9404

(#238) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS re #231 , 9214 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/23/2015) Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/23/2015)

#9395

(#236) ORDER RE: REMAINING TRACK 2 AND OREGON CASES. Status statement is due by 2/20/15. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/09/2015)

512 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#240) Conditional REMAND ORDER. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi for the MDL Panel on 3/9/15. (Attachments: # 1 Order Suggesting Remand to Transferor Courts ). (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#239) ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/24/2015) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#238) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS re #231 , 9214 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/23/2015) Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#237) JOINT STATUS REPORT for Track 2 Cases by The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Remaining Defendants)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 2/20/2015) Modified on 2/23/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#236) ORDER RE: REMAINING TRACK 2 AND OREGON CASES. Status statement is due by 2/20/15. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#235) ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #234 , (9290) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI of Dismissal (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#234) Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [Master Docket No. 9290] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/5/2014) (Entered: 11/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#233) Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/17/2014, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number (415) 264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (9267 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2015. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 10/17/2014) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#232) ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF SEPTEMBER 4, 2014 ORDER 9214 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/29/2014) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#231) Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Non-Party Co-Conspirators [Master Docket No. 9214] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 9/10/2014) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
226 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Pretrial ORDER #1. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/7. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust v. AU Optronics Corp., et al from the Southern District of Florida. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:11-cv-23939. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Transmittal Letter requesting case with attached Certified CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 1827 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Susan Yvonne Illston. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (gp) (Entered: 11/29/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Granting 4 EX PARTE MOTION to Seal Portions of Complaint Pending Transfer Pursuant to Protective Order In MDL No. 1827 by The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust. Signed by Judge Donald L. Graham on 11/7/2011. (See Order for full details) (nc) (Entered: 11/09/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • DocketSYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) (Entered: 11/04/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • DocketSYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc) (Entered: 11/04/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ar2) (Entered: 11/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • Docket(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Donald L. Graham (ar2) (Entered: 11/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, HannStar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC DISPLAY SOLUTIONS OF AMERICA, INC., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC., Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD.. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-4201240, filed by AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) AU Optronics Corporation, #3 Summon(s) AU Optronics Corporation America, #4 Summon(s) Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, #5 Summon(s) Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., #6 Summon(s) Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd., #7 Summon(s) CMO Japan Co., Ltd., #8 Summon(s) Epson Electronics America, Inc., #9 Summon(s) Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, #10 Summon(s) Hannstar Display Corporation, #11 Summon(s) Hitachi Displays, Ltd., #12 Summon(s) Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., #13 Summon(s) Hitachi, Ltd., #14 Summon(s) LG Display America, Inc., #15 Summon(s) LG Display Co., Ltd., #16 Summon(s) Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd., #17 Summon(s) Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc., #18 Summon(s) NEC Corporation, #19 Summon(s) NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., #20 Summon(s) NEC Electronics America, Inc., #21 Summon(s) NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., #22 Summon(s) Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., #23 Summon(s) Sharp Corporation, #24 Summon(s) Sharp Electronics Corporation, #25 Summon(s) Tatung Company of America, Inc., #26 Summon(s) Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., #27 Summon(s) Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., #28 Summon(s) Toshiba Corporation, #29 Summon(s) Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.)(Singer, Stuart) (Entered: 11/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. is a litigant