This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/17/2022 at 21:26:50 (UTC).

SPENCER et al v. 84 LUMBER et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2011 SPENCER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 84 LUMBER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:11-CV-01184

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORA SPENCER

Defendants

TRANE US INC.

ERICSSON, INC.

84 LUMBER

WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY

WEIL MCLAIN

VELLUMOID INC.

USX CORPORATION

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

STANDARD MOTOR PARTS

SQUARE D COMPANY

SOS PRODUCTS COMPANY

SEARS ROEBUCK

ROCKBESTOS COMPANY

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

RHEEM MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS

RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION

QUINT-T CORPORATION

PRATT & WHITNEY

64 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT E. PAUL

Defendant Attorney

PAUL F. LANTIERI

Other Attorneys

JOHN A. TURLIK

CHRISTINE O. BOYD

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #4

COS

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF TAG-ALONG ACTION by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (tj, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION.(tj, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of BW/IP INC., (TURLIK, JOHN) (Entered: 02/23/2011)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CORA SPENCER As To RFCP 41(a)(PAUL, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/25/2011)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL F. LANTIERI on behalf of USX CORPORATION with Jury Demand(LANTIERI, PAUL) (Entered: 03/10/2011)

#8

(#8) ORDER THAT IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, APRIL 5, 2011, AT 2:00 PM IN COURTROOM 11A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/15/11. 3/16/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf) (Entered: 03/16/2011)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT THE WITHIN ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL PARTIES ARE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CASE BE MARKED CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/17/11. 3/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 03/21/2011)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT THE WITHIN ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL PARTIES ARE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CASE BE MARKED CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/17/11. 3/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 03/21/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER THAT IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, APRIL 5, 2011, AT 2:00 PM IN COURTROOM 11A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/15/11. 3/16/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf) (Entered: 03/16/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • Docket(#7) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ti, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL F. LANTIERI on behalf of USX CORPORATION with Jury Demand(LANTIERI, PAUL) (Entered: 03/10/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CORA SPENCER As To RFCP 41(a)(PAUL, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/25/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of BW/IP INC., (TURLIK, JOHN) (Entered: 02/23/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION.(tj, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF TAG-ALONG ACTION by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (tj, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION from Philadelphia CCP, case number 101201416. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 038034), Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form)(tj, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2011: #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 COS) (tj, ). (Entered: 02/23/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less