This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2021 at 01:56:50 (UTC).

Schatke v. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/01/2011 Schatke filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia S. Krieger and Kathleen M. Tafoya. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:11-CV-02305

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia S. Krieger

Referral Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura L. Schatke

Defendant

Progressive Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Hathaway Evans, Jr.

Attorney at Hill & Robbins, P.C.

1441 18Th Street, Blake Street Building, #100

Denver, CO 80202

Robert F. Hill

Attorney at Hill & Robbins P.C.

1660 Lincoln Street, Suite 2720

Denver, CO 80264

Jennifer H. Hunt

Attorney at Colorado Attorney General's Office

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

J. Lucas McFarland

Attorney at Evans & McFarland, LLC-Golden

910 13Th Street, #200

Golden, CO 80401

Nathan Patrick Flynn

Attorney at Hill & Robbins P.C.

1660 Lincoln Street, Suite 2720

Denver, CO 80264

Thomas Dalton McFarland

Attorney at McFarland Law Offices

910 13Th Street, #200

Golden, CO 80401

Cyd Hunt

Attorney at McFarland Litigation Partners LLC-Golden

910 13Th Street, Suite 200

Golden, CO 80401

M. Gabriel McFarland

Attorney at McFarland Litigation Partners LLC-Golden

910 13Th Street, Suite 200

Golden, CO 80401

Defendant Attorneys

Casie D. Collignon

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP-Denver

303 East 17Th Avenue, #1100

Denver, CO 80203-1264

Justin T. Winquist

Attorney at BakerHostetler LLP-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Paul Gregory Karlsgodt

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP-Denver

303 East 17Th Avenue, #1100

Denver, CO 80203-1264

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

24 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#24

#23

15 #2

Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order

15 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#15

1 #12

Receipt

1 #11

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Transmittal of Documents to Boulder County District Court on remand. (mskcd) (Entered: 11/23/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Plaintiff's #15 Motion to Remand is GRANTED, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/18/2011.(wjc, ) (Entered: 11/21/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Laura L. Schatke. (McFarland, M.) (Entered: 11/16/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Joint MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Laura L. Schatke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(McFarland, M.) (Entered: 11/16/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order in Young v State Farm matter)(Karlsgodt, Paul) (Entered: 11/14/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Laura L. Schatke. (Hunt, Cyd) (Entered: 11/07/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss. Extension granted up to and including November 14, 2011. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/28/11. Text Only Entry(msksec, ) (Entered: 10/28/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Winquist, Justin) (Entered: 10/28/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) BRIEF in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cicchella Certification)(Karlsgodt, Paul) (Entered: 10/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEF in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Laura L. Schatke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Robbins v. Amica Court of Appeals decision), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Young v. State Farm Ruling and Order))(McFarland, M.) (Entered: 10/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond to the coplaint no later than 9/16/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/13/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(kmtlc1 ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM regarding #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #3 Complaint filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/13/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(msksec, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/13/11. (msksec, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #3 Complaint by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Karlsgodt, Paul) (Entered: 09/07/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger for all further proceedings. Judge Lewis T. Babcock no longer assigned to the case. (sah, ) (Entered: 09/06/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Senior District Judge Babcock. (sah, ) (Entered: 09/06/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Waiver and Acceptance of Service. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company served on 8/12/2011, answer due 9/2/2011. (gmssl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Laura L. Schatke.(gmssl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (gmssl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 11-CV-802. ( Filing fee $ 350 Receipt Number 40943), filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Receipt)(gmssl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin T. Winquist

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Casie Collignon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul G Karlsgodt