This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2022 at 14:56:28 (UTC).

Robert L. Templeton et al v. American Housing Foundation et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2009 Robert L Templeton filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against American Housing Foundation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:09-CV-00231

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

Robert L Templeton

Paul King

Frances Maddox Estate

Heron Land Company

Don Storseth

Clay Storseth

Storseth Family Trust

David Miller

Susan S Miller

Dennis Dougherty

Attebury Family Partnership LP

William Scott

Herring Bank

Debtors, Consolidated Plaintiffs, Defendants and Respondents

American Housing Foundation

Sterquell Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust

Housing For Texans Foundation

1800 S. Washington Street, Suite 311

Amarillo, TX 79102

Housing for Texans Charitable Trust doing business as Housing For Texas Foundation

Marshallette S Sterquell

Robert L Templeton

Paul King

Frances Maddox Estate

Heron Land Company

Don Storseth

Clay Storseth

Storseth Family Trust

David Miller

Susan S Miller

Dennis Dougherty

Attebury Family Partnership LP

William Scott

Herring Bank

Defendant and Petitioner

Marshallette S Sterquell

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

David R Langston

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown

Po Box 2585, 1500 Broadway Suite 700

Lubbock, TX 79408-2585

Anthony Ward Kirkwood

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC

2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

David Mullin

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown

Po Box 31656

Amarillo, TX 79120-1656

Joe L Lovell

Attorney at Lovell Lovell Isern & Farabough

Eagle Centre Building, 112 W 8Th Ave Suite 1000

Amarillo, TX 79101

John M Brown

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown

Po Box 31656

Amarillo, TX 79120-1656

John Hunt Lovell

Attorney at Lovell Lovell Isern & Farabough, LLP

Eagle Centre Bldg, 112 S.W. 8Th Ave Suite 1000

Amarillo, TX 79101-2314

Lawrence M Doss

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown

Po Box 2585, 1500 Broadway Suite 700

Lubbock, TX 79408-2585

Steven L Hoard

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown

Po Box 31656

Amarillo, TX 79120-1656

John C Sims

Attorney at Sims Hubbert & Wilson

1205 Broadway, Po Box 10236

Lubbock, TX 79408-236

Debtor, Consolidated Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Charles G White

Attorney at Law Office of Charles G White

500 S Taylor St, Suite 505 Lb 201

Amarillo, TX 79101

John Thomas Boyd, Jr

Attorney at White Hanna & Boyd PLLC

600 South Tyler, Suite 1810

Amarillo, TX 79101

R Byrn Bass, Jr

Attorney at Law Office of R Byrn Bass Jr

State National Bank Building, 4716 4Th St Suite 100

Lubbock, TX 79416

Robert Yaquinto, Jr

Attorney at Sherman & Yaquinto LLP

509 N Montclair Avenue

Dallas, TX 75208-5498

David R Langston

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown

Po Box 2585, 1500 Broadway Suite 700

Lubbock, TX 79408-2585

Defendant and Petitioner Attorneys

Michael V Powell

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Matthew M Hurt

Attorney at Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Debtor and Defendant Attorneys

Robert Yaquinto, Jr

Attorney at Sherman & Yaquinto LLP

509 N Montclair Avenue

Dallas, TX 75208-5498

Michael V Powell

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Matthew M Hurt

Attorney at Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

Joe L Lovell

Attorney at Lovell Lovell Isern & Farabough

Eagle Centre Building, 112 W 8Th Ave Suite 1000

Amarillo, TX 79101

Other Attorneys

Michael D Napoli

Attorney at Akerman, LLP

2001 Ross Ave, Suite 3600

Dallas, TX 75201

Christina Marie Putman

Attorney at DNV GL USA Inc

1400 Ravello Drive

Katy, TX 77449

James David Brown

Attorney at Winstead PC

500 Winstead Building, 2728 N. Harwood St.

Dallas, TX 75201

J Brian Vanderwoude

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

200 Crescent Court, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#73

(#73) Agreed ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice and Final JUDGMENT as to the Sterquell Family Defendants, ORDER of Payment of Settlement Funds, and ORDER Referring Texas Capital Bank, N.A.'s Intervention Back to Bankruptcy Court - (See Order for Specifics). #72 Motion for Judgment terminated. (Ordered by Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/25/2010) (djs) (Entered: 08/25/2010)

#72

(#72) Agreed MOTION for Judgment AGREED MOTION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO THE STERQUELL FAMILY DEFENDANTS, AND MOTION TO ORDER PAYMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS, AND REFERRING TEXAS CAPITAL BANK, N.A.'S INTERVENTION BACK TO BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Elizabeth Ann Bunn, Marshallette S Sterquell(Trustee of Sterquell Family Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust), Steve Wright Sterquell, II (Hurt, Matthew). Added MOTION on 8/25/2010 (plh). (Entered: 08/24/2010)

#71

(#71) ORDER: Came on for consideration the #70 Notice to Withdraw Creditors' Motion for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim, filed April 28, 2010. The Court finds that the Motion for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claims should be, and the same is hereby WITHDRAWN. Motions terminated: #68 MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4). (Ordered by Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/29/2010) (djs) Modified on 4/30/2010 (awc). (Entered: 04/29/2010)

#70

(#70) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim re: #69 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #68 MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) filed by C. C. Burgess, Campbell Burgess, Carson Herring Burgess, Burgess Trust No. 4, Carson Burgess Inc., Chain-C, Inc., Keevin Clark, Cornelia J. Slemp Trust, Dennis Dougherty, Frances Maddox Estate, Charlotte Burgess Griffiths, Heron Land Company, Herring Bank, Herring Financial Services, Terrill J Horton, Jessie Herring Johnson Estate Trust No. 1, Jessie Herring Johnson Estate Trust No. 2, Paul King, Louise Johnson Thomas Trust, David Miller, Susan S Miller, William Scott, Clay Storseth, Don Storseth, Storseth Family Trust, Robert L Templeton, Vaudrey Capital, L.P. a/k/a Vaudry Capital, LP (Lovell, Joe) (Entered: 04/28/2010)

68 #7

Exhibit(s)

68 #6

Exhibit(s)

68 #4

Exhibit(s)

68 #3

Exhibit(s)

68 #68

Main Document

2 #8

Report and Recommendation

2 #7

Order Modifying Court's Prior Order Staying

2 #6

Order Staying Proceedings

2 #5

Dft's Reply to Response to Motion to Withdraw

2 #4

Dfts' Reply to Response to Motion to Withdraw

2 #3

Intervenor's Response to Motion to Withdraw

2 #2

Creditor's Response to Motion to Withdraw

2 #2

Main Document

#1

(#1) Transmittal and certification regarding Withdrawal of Reference from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. 1 volumes of Bankruptcy records transmitted. (plh) (Entered: 09/15/2009)

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Agreed ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice and Final JUDGMENT as to the Sterquell Family Defendants, ORDER of Payment of Settlement Funds, and ORDER Referring Texas Capital Bank, N.A.'s Intervention Back to Bankruptcy Court - (See Order for Specifics). #72 Motion for Judgment terminated. (Ordered by Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/25/2010) (djs) (Entered: 08/25/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Agreed MOTION for Judgment AGREED MOTION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO THE STERQUELL FAMILY DEFENDANTS, AND MOTION TO ORDER PAYMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS, AND REFERRING TEXAS CAPITAL BANK, N.A.'S INTERVENTION BACK TO BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Elizabeth Ann Bunn, Marshallette S Sterquell(Trustee of Sterquell Family Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust), Steve Wright Sterquell, II (Hurt, Matthew). Added MOTION on 8/25/2010 (plh). (Entered: 08/24/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) ORDER: Came on for consideration the #70 Notice to Withdraw Creditors' Motion for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim, filed April 28, 2010. The Court finds that the Motion for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claims should be, and the same is hereby WITHDRAWN. Motions terminated: #68 MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4). (Ordered by Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/29/2010) (djs) Modified on 4/30/2010 (awc). (Entered: 04/29/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim re: #69 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #68 MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) filed by C. C. Burgess, Campbell Burgess, Carson Herring Burgess, Burgess Trust No. 4, Carson Burgess Inc., Chain-C, Inc., Keevin Clark, Cornelia J. Slemp Trust, Dennis Dougherty, Frances Maddox Estate, Charlotte Burgess Griffiths, Heron Land Company, Herring Bank, Herring Financial Services, Terrill J Horton, Jessie Herring Johnson Estate Trust No. 1, Jessie Herring Johnson Estate Trust No. 2, Paul King, Louise Johnson Thomas Trust, David Miller, Susan S Miller, William Scott, Clay Storseth, Don Storseth, Storseth Family Trust, Robert L Templeton, Vaudrey Capital, L.P. a/k/a Vaudry Capital, LP (Lovell, Joe) (Entered: 04/28/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC 503(b)(3) and (4) re: #68 MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) filed by C. C. Burgess, Campbell Burgess, Carson Herring Burgess, Burgess Trust No. 4, Carson Burgess Inc., Chain-C, Inc., Keevin Clark, Cornelia J. Slemp Trust, Dennis Dougherty, Frances Maddox Estate, Charlotte Burgess Griffiths, Heron Land Company, Herring Bank, Herring Financial Services, Terrill J Horton, Jessie Herring Johnson Estate Trust No. 1, Jessie Herring Johnson Estate Trust No. 2, Paul King, Louise Johnson Thomas Trust, David Miller, Susan S Miller, William Scott, Clay Storseth, Don Storseth, Storseth Family Trust, Robert L Templeton, Vaudrey Capital, L.P. a/k/a Vaudry Capital, LP (Lovell, Joe) (Entered: 04/20/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Text/Document Modification by Deputy Clerk regarding Doc #69 -- deleted by clerk because of incorrect certificate of service, will be redocketed by attorney. (awc) (Entered: 04/20/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) WITHDRAWN (per Order dated 4/29/10 Doc #71) MOTION for Attorney Fees for Allowance of Administrative Priority Claim Under 11 USC Sec. 503(b)(3) and (4) filed by C. C. Burgess, Campbell Burgess, Carson Herring Burgess, Burgess Trust No. 4, Carson Burgess Inc., Chain-C, Inc., Keevin Clark, Cornelia J. Slemp Trust, Dennis Dougherty, Frances Maddox Estate, Charlotte Burgess Griffiths, Heron Land Company, Herring Financial Services, Herring Bank, Terrill J Horton, Jessie Herring Johnson Estate Trust No. 1, Jessie Herring Johnson Estate Trust No. 2, Paul King, Louise Johnson Thomas Trust, David Miller, Susan S Miller, William Scott, Clay Storseth, Don Storseth, Storseth Family Trust, Robert L Templeton, Vaudrey Capital, L.P. a/k/a Vaudry Capital, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Additional Page(s)) (Lovell, Joe) Modified on 4/29/2010 (djs). (Entered: 04/19/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Designation of Experts by Texas Capital Bank NA. (Vanderwoude, J) (Entered: 03/15/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon motion of all the parties for a Protective Order pursuant to Rule 26(c) of the FRCP, the Court enters this Protective Order to facilitate discovery in this matter. This Protective Order applies only in this cause and does not apply to any discovery sought or obtained in any related bankruptcy proceeding. Motions terminated: #65 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Ordered by Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/2/2010) (djs) (Entered: 03/02/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Attebury Family Partnership LP, William Scott, Herring Bank, Marshallette S Sterquell, American Housing Foundation, Sterquell Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust, Housing For Texans Foundation, Housing for Texans Charitable Trust, Steve Wright Sterquell, II, Elizabeth Ann Bunn, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, New England Life Insurance Company, Unknown Life Insurance Company, Alvin Johnson, Lincoln Benefit Life Company, Elizabeth Ann Bunn(Trustee of Housing for Texans Charitable Trust), Steve Wright Sterquell, II(Trustee of Housing for Texans Charitable Trust), Marshallette S Sterquell(Trustee of Sterquell Family Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust), Sterquell Family Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust, Steve Wright Sterquell, II(as Trustee of Housing for Texans Charitable Trust), Dennis Dougherty, Frances Maddox Estate, Heron Land Company, Paul King, David Miller, Susan S Miller, Elizabeth Ann Bunn(as Trustee of Housing for Texans Charitable Trust), Clay Storseth, Don Storseth, Storseth Family Trust, Robert L Templeton, Texas Capital Bank NA, American Housing Foundation,(Vanderwoude, J) Modified on 3/3/2010 (djs). (Entered: 03/02/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Attebury Family Partnership LP to Intervenor's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Sims, John) (Entered: 09/29/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Steve Wright Sterquell, II, Marshallette S Sterquell, Elizabeth Ann Bunn, Sterquell Family Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust, Housing for Texans Charitable Trust Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Intervenor Texas Capital Bank (Hurt, Matthew) Modified on 9/29/2009 (djs). (Entered: 09/29/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: All motions to join other parties and amend the pleadings must be filed by 3:00 pm on 12/15/2009. Unless otherwise identified pursuant to written discovery, experts must be disclosed pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2) by 3:00 pm on 3/15/2010. All other pretrial motions, including motions for summary judgment, must be filed, and all discovery must be completed, by 3:00 pm on 7/15/2010. (Ordered by Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/25/09) (djs) (Entered: 09/25/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER - The Court is of the opinion that the Report and Recommendation should be ADOPTED; the Motions to Withdraw the Reference should be GRANTED; the Motions to Strike should be DENIED without prejudice to reconsideration; the pending stay should be LIFTED; Adversary Proceedings Nos. 09-2005 and 09-2007 should be CONSOLIDATED into Civil Action no. 2:09cv231-C; and Civil Action No. 2:09cv233-C is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. The United States Bankruptcy Clerk and the United States District Clerk shall coordinate the transfer of all filings in Adversary Proceedings Nos. 09-2005 and 09-2007 and in Civil Action No. 2:09cv233-C for docketing in Civil Action No. 2:09cv231-C. CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 2:09-cv-233-C consolidated with lead case 2:09-cv-231-C. American Housing Foundation (Consolidated Plaintiff) rep by R Byrn Bass, Jr, Charles G White, and American Housing Foundation (Consolidated Respondent) rep by Lloyd Lim, Charles G White added to case pursuant to consolidation. (Ordered by Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/25/09) (djs) (Entered: 09/25/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Court Request for Recusal: Judge Mary Lou Robinson recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Sam R Cummings for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 2:09-cv-231-C. (djs) (Entered: 09/16/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2009
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Housing for Texans Charitable Trust, Steve Wright Sterquell, II, Marshallette S Sterquell, Elizabeth Ann Bunn, Sterquell Family Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust. (plh) (Entered: 09/15/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter transmitting bankruptcy record on appeal to presiding judge. CC to counsel, bankruptcy clerk and bankruptcy judge. (plh) Modified on 9/16/2009 (plh). (Entered: 09/15/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) "BANKRUPTCY DOCKET SHEET" (plh) (Entered: 09/16/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Withdraw Reference For Two Overlapping Adversary Proceedings and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Housing for Texans Charitable Trust, Steve Wright Sterquell, II, Marshallette S Sterquell, Elizabeth Ann Bunn, Sterquell Family Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust. (Attachments: #1 Creditor's Response to Motion to Withdraw, #2 Intervenor's Response to Motion to Withdraw, #3 Dfts' Reply to Response to Motion to Withdraw, #4 Dft's Reply to Response to Motion to Withdraw, #5 Order Staying Proceedings, #6 Order Modifying Court's Prior Order Staying, #7 Report and Recommendation) (plh) Modified on 9/16/2009 (plh). (Entered: 09/16/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Transmittal and certification regarding Withdrawal of Reference from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. 1 volumes of Bankruptcy records transmitted. (plh) (Entered: 09/15/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Attebury Family Partnership LP is a litigant