Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/30/2021 at 09:14:10 (UTC).

Purdue Pharma LP et al v. Sandoz Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2012 Purdue Pharma LP filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sandoz Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sidney H. Stein. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:12-CV-07582

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sidney H. Stein

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Grunenthal GMBH

Purdue Pharma LP

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Sandoz Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Eric Brian LaMons

Attorney at The Schulman Law Firm LLP

25 Broadway, Ste 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Marianne Simone Terrot

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner LLP (DC)

901 New York Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Sarah Emily Craven

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

901 New York Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Anthony C. Tridico

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner LLP (DC)

901 New York Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Basil James Lewris

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner LLP (DC)

901 New York Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Jennifer Howe Roscetti

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner LLP (DC)

901 New York Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Joann M. Neth

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner LLP (DC)

901 New York Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Stephen D. Hoffman

Attorney at Wilk Auslander LLP

1515 Broadway, 43Rd Floor

New York, NY 10036

Erin Mcgeehan Sommers

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

901 New York Ave., N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Rebecca R. Carrizosa

Attorney at Ropes & Gray, LLP (CA)

1900 University Avenue, 6Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Robert J. Goldman

Attorney at Ropes & Gray, LLP (CA)

1900 University Avenue, 6Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Kelly L. Baxter

Attorney at Ropes & Gray, LLP (CA)

1900 University Avenue, 6Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Thomas A. Wang

Attorney at Ropes & Gray, LLP (CA)

1900 University Avenue, 6Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Emer L Simic

Attorney at Leydig, Voit, & mayer, Ltd.

Two Prudential Plaza, Suite 4900

Chicago, IL 60601-6731

Christopher Thomas Griffith

Attorney at Leydig, Voit & Mayer, Ltd.,

Two Prudential Plaza, 180 North Stetson Avenue, Ste. 4900

Chicago, IL 60601-6780

Grant Joseph Esposito

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP (NYC)

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

Matthew Mark D'Amore

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

Sarah Lenore Prutzman

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP (NYC)

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

Jessica M. Tyrus

Attorney at Leydig, Voit and Mayer, Ltd.

180 N. Stetson Ave., Suite 4900

Chicago, IL 60601-6731

Robert Fritz Green

Two Prudential Plaza-Suite 4900, 180 N. Stetson Avenue

Chicago, IL 60601

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#50

No Description Available

#64

No Description Available

#63

No Description Available

#55

No Description Available

#51

No Description Available

#47

No Description Available

#40

No Description Available

#32

No Description Available

23 #2

Text of Proposed Order

19 #3

District of Columbia Court of Appeals Certificate of Good Standing

#12

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#5

No Description Available

#4

(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.6 re: that this action be filed as related to 11cv4694 (SHS) and others on attached list.. Document filed by Purdue Pharma LP.(Goldman, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2012)

#585

No Description Available

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) CONSENT JUDGMENT: it is Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed as follows:Terms used in this Consent Judgment and not otherwise defined shall have themeanings ascribed thereto in the Settlement Agreement (the "Settlement Agreement") or the Distribution and Supply Agreement, as applicable, each dated as of January 5, 2014, by and among Purdue and Sandoz...This Consent Judgment is entered pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Actions are hereby dismissed without costs or attorney's fees, save thatthis District Court shall retain jurisdiction over the Actions, including without limitation, over implementation of, or disputes arising out of, this Consent Judgment or the settlement of the Actions. A prevailing party shall be entitled to recover attorneys' fees in any such proceeding occurring after the entering of this Consent Judgment in which the case is found to be an exceptional one. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/8/2014) (mt) (Entered: 01/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ORDER. The trial of these actions having been completed on October 15, 2013, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Each side's post trial brief for the issues on which it bears the burden of proof is due on or before November 6, 2013, and shall not exceed 45 pages; 2. Responding briefs are due on or before November 20, 2013, and shall not exceed 45 pages; 3. Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law are due on or before November 27, 2013; and 4. Reply briefs are due on or before November 27, 2013, and shall not exceed 20 pages. (Reply to Response to Brief due by 11/27/2013. Responses to Brief due by 11/20/2013.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/16/2013) (rjm) (Entered: 10/17/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial completed on 10/15/2013. All parties present. Plaintiffs rebuttal case begins. Plaintiffs rest. Trial concluded. Post trial briefing schedule set. See Order dated October 16, 2013. (mro) (Entered: 10/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 10/10/2013. All parties present. All defendants rest on all issues. (mro) (Entered: 10/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 10/9/2013. All parties present. Defendants opening statements regarding the low ABUK patents held. Trial continued. (mro) (Entered: 10/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 10/8/2013. All parties present. Purdue rests with respect to the abuse-proof patents. Defendants move for directed verdict of non-infringement of 963, 314, and 383 patents and of invalidity of the 314 patent for indefiniteness. Plaintiffs oppose the motion. The Court will take the motion under consideration. Plaintiffs opening regarding the low ABUK patents held. Trial continued. (mro) (Entered: 10/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 10/7/2013. All parties present. Trial continued. Defendants rest. Plaintiffs begin their rebuttal case. (mro) (Entered: 10/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 9/30/2013. All parties present. Trial continued. (mro) (Entered: 10/02/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 9/26/2013. All parties present. Trial continued until Monday, September 30, 2013. (mro) (Entered: 10/02/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 9/25/2013. All parties present. Trial continued. (mro) (Entered: 10/02/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2012
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:11-cv-04694-SHS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (pgu) (Entered: 10/18/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.6 re: that this action be filed as related to 11cv4694 (SHS) and others on attached list.. Document filed by Purdue Pharma LP.(Goldman, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Purdue Holdings L.P. for Purdue Pharma LP. Document filed by Purdue Pharma LP.(Hendler, Pablo) (Entered: 10/15/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketCase Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (mro) (Entered: 10/12/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (mro) (Entered: 10/12/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketMailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (mro) (Entered: 10/12/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (mro) (Entered: 10/12/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Sidney H. Stein as possibly related to 1:11-cv-04694-SHS. (mro) (Entered: 10/12/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Sandoz Inc. (mro) (Entered: 10/12/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sandoz Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1050546)Document filed by Purdue Pharma LP, Grunenthal GMBH.(mro) (Entered: 10/12/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Purdue Pharma L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sandoz Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica M. Tyrus

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert F. Green