This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2021 at 05:05:16 (UTC).

Pamela Mason et al v. McKesson Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2012 Pamela Mason filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against McKesson Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Suzanne H. Segal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:12-CV-05050

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Suzanne H. Segal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pamela Mason

Margree Adams

Kathy Aerakis

David Ainsworth

Rebecca Albright

Sheila Albritton

Constance Alexander

Linda Anderson

Gail Andrews

Rita Ardoin

Barbara Baggett

Mary Barnes

William Barnum

Murry Barrett

Lorie Bason

Steven Beach

Carlene Beasley Shine

Donna Bell

Lovie Benford

Shirley Bennett

207 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Vincent Girardi

Attorney at Girardi Keese

1126 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Vincent James Carter

Attorney at Girardi Keese

1126 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017-1904

Lauren E S Horwitz

Attorney at Girardi Keese

1126 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Other Attorneys

Amy K Fisher

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP

One American Square Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282-0200

Audra J Ferguson-Allen

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP

One American Square Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282

James J Freebery, IV

Attorney at McCarter and English LLP

405 North King Street 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Megan Ritsu Nishikawa

Attorney at King and Spalding

101 Second Street Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Peter A Strotz

Attorney at King and Spalding

633 West 5Th Street Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Farley J Neuman

Attorney at Goodman Neuman Hamilton LLP

417 Montgomery Street 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Pavan L Rosati

Attorney at Goodman Neuman Hamilton LLP

One Post Street Suite 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

William Edward Steimle

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

101 Second Street Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Makenzie Windfelder

Attorney at McCarter and English LLP

405 North King Street 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#77

(#77) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS TO 10 ENUMERATED PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. This matter came before this Court on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 58 Enumerated Plaintiffs Pursuant to Terms of Case Management Order No. 3 for Failure to Prosecute and Comply with Case Management and Discovery Orders ("Motion to Dismiss"). (Master Dkt. 231.) Pursuant to the Court's Order of March 17, 2014 on Motion to Dismiss 58 Enumerated Plaintiffs (Master Dkt. 264), the Parties meet and confer and joint submission of this Order, and the inherent broad, discretionary authority afforded to transferee courts overseeing and administering the just and efficient conduct of complex, multidistrict litigation, this Court now Orders that the Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as to the ten (10) Plaintiffs specifically enumerated in the above-entitled actions ("Enumerated Plaintiffs:). (bp) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

#76

(#76) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS PREJUDICE AS TO 4 ENUMERATED PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. This Court now ORDERS that the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as to the four (4) Plaintiffs specifically enumerated in the above-entitled actions ("Enumerated Plaintiffs"). The claims of the Enumerated Plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (bp) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

#75

(#75) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 67 ENUMERATED PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. This Court now ORDERS that Motion to Reinstate is DENIED as to the sixty-seven (67) Movant Plaintiffs specifically enumerated in the above-entitled actions ("Enumerated Plaintiffs"). The claims of the Enumerated Plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Steven Beach, Sherri Brewton, Mary Brownie, William Cooper, Lillian Dungy, George Kobesto, Joyce Lewis, Regina Lowe, Pamela Mason, Ed Memmer, Marvin Redford, Jackie Stringer, Lucy Tadlock, Constance Alexander and Lorie Bason terminated. (shb) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

#74

(#74) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 253 ENUMERATED PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. This Court now ORDERS that Motion to Reinstate is DENIED as to the two hundred and fifty-three (253) Movant Plaintiffs specifically enumerated in the above-entitled actions ("Enumerated Plaintiffs"). The claims of the Enumerated Plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 05/13/2014)

#72

(#72) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE AS TO 12 ENUMERATED PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. This Court now ORDERS that the Motion to Dismiss isGRANTED as to the twelve (12) Plaintiffs specifically enumerated in the above entitled actions ("Enumerated Plaintiffs"). The claims of the Enumerated Plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Carol Butler, Delores McCoy, Ronald Medford, Carole Ott, and Louise Steegman terminated. (shb) (Entered: 04/28/2014)

#71

(#71) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Carlos Gierbolini,Valerie Pritchett, Roel Reyes, Arnolia Scott, Karen Sens, and Gary haleyterminated. (shb) (Entered: 04/22/2014)

#73

(#73) AGREED ORDER OF REINSTATEMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. this Court now ORDERS that the Motion to Reinstate is GRANTED as to the fifteen (15) Movant Plaintiffsspecifically enumerated in the above-entitled actions ("Enumerated Plaintiffs").The claims of these Enumerated Plaintiffs are hereby REINSTATED. The Court'sprevious order of dismissal is vacated as to these Enumerated Plaintiffs only, and their claims will proceed without regard to any statute of limitations, repose or other time bar which did not otherwise exist as of the date of their dismissal. Reinstated parties Mary Burnett, Douglas Dukes, Yvonne Gilman, Jamie Sims, Gloria Smith, Kathy Venters. (shb) (Entered: 04/30/2014)

#70

(#70) ORDER OF MARCH 17, 2014 ON MOTION TO DISMISS 58 ENUMERATED PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (See order for details) Patricia Blanks, Carol Butler, Lois Grgurich, Mary Humpfrey, Jula Jennings, Delores Jean McCoy, Ronald Medford, Carole Ott, Valerie Pritchett, Rebecca Reid, Roel Reyes, Arnolia Scott, Karen Sens, Louise Steegman, Mary Winn, Mary Barnes and Donna Bell terminated. (shb) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

#69

(#69) ORDER OF JANUARY 27, 2014 ON MOTION TO REINSTATE DISMISSED PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Reinstated parties: Rebecca Albright, Sheila Albritton, Constance Alexander, Linda Anderson, Gail Andrews, Rita Ardoin, Barbara Baggett, William Barnum, Murry Barrett, Lorie Bason, Steven Beach, Lovie Benford, Anthony Blair, Sherri Brewton, Brenda Broshears, Mary Brownie, Mary Burnett, Patsy Burtchett, Johnnie Byers, Linda Byrd, George Canada,Vicky Cardenas, Florence Carpenter, Michaela Carter, William Cooper, Linda Cosina, Julien Crowe, Richard Cupstid, Linda Currington, Mandy Davis, Pheba Davison, Shelly Davison, Manuel Diaz, Geraldine Dorris, Douglas Dukes, Lillian Dungy, Portia Dykes-Wright, Gladys Edwards, Mary Emmanuel, Antonia Estes, Sandra Flores, Barbara Foster, Betty Freeman, JoAnn Freeman, Yvonne Gilman, Catherine Hilliard, Patricia Hollingsworth, Pearline Hubbard, Cedric Keermann, George Kobesto, Mark Koenig, Stella Lanphere, Joyce Ann Lewis, Michael Louis, Regina Lowe, Phyllis Margaret Luna, Cheryl Manning, Boyd Mason, Pamela Mason, Linda McCully, Annie McGee, Patricia McGhar, Ed Memmer, Marie Miller, Debora Moore-Swift, Wendy Nail, Ralph Navarro, Brenda Norris, Cheryl Owens, Barbara Payton, Marvin Redford, Latonya Rhodes, Gwendolyn Richardson, Richard RoseJanie Rucker, Debra Sharp, Carlene Elizabeth Beasley- Shine, Shirley Simmons, Jamie Sims, Gloria Smith, Saundra Steed, Jackie Stringer, Lucy Tadlock, Lynda Tanner, Joyce Teamer-Johnson, John Thompson, Peggy Toombs, Gerald Trosclair, Mark Turley, Myrtle Lee Veasey, Kathy Venters, Cora Veres, Geneva Walker, Alfrieda Warren, Joystine Williams, Beulah Wilson, Theodore Wilson. (shb) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

#7

(#7) DECLARATION of WILLIAM E. STEIMLE in support of Notice of Removal, #1 filed by Defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

#6

(#6) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS OR PROCEEDINGS filed by defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES filed by defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Related Case(s): NONE (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP identifying Other Affiliate Astra USA Inc., Other Affiliate Astra U.S. Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Zeneca Inc., Other Affiliate AstraZeneca AB for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, identifying Other Affiliate Astra USA Inc., Other Affiliate Astra U.S. Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Zeneca Inc., Other Affiliate AstraZeneca AB for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

1 #2

CV-18

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Notice of Removal

155 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS TO 10 ENUMERATED PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. This matter came before this Court on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 58 Enumerated Plaintiffs Pursuant to Terms of Case Management Order No. 3 for Failure to Prosecute and Comply with Case Management and Discovery Orders ("Motion to Dismiss"). (Master Dkt. 231.) Pursuant to the Court's Order of March 17, 2014 on Motion to Dismiss 58 Enumerated Plaintiffs (Master Dkt. 264), the Parties meet and confer and joint submission of this Order, and the inherent broad, discretionary authority afforded to transferee courts overseeing and administering the just and efficient conduct of complex, multidistrict litigation, this Court now Orders that the Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as to the ten (10) Plaintiffs specifically enumerated in the above-entitled actions ("Enumerated Plaintiffs:). (bp) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS PREJUDICE AS TO 4 ENUMERATED PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. This Court now ORDERS that the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as to the four (4) Plaintiffs specifically enumerated in the above-entitled actions ("Enumerated Plaintiffs"). The claims of the Enumerated Plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (bp) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 67 ENUMERATED PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. This Court now ORDERS that Motion to Reinstate is DENIED as to the sixty-seven (67) Movant Plaintiffs specifically enumerated in the above-entitled actions ("Enumerated Plaintiffs"). The claims of the Enumerated Plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Steven Beach, Sherri Brewton, Mary Brownie, William Cooper, Lillian Dungy, George Kobesto, Joyce Lewis, Regina Lowe, Pamela Mason, Ed Memmer, Marvin Redford, Jackie Stringer, Lucy Tadlock, Constance Alexander and Lorie Bason terminated. (shb) (Entered: 05/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 253 ENUMERATED PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. This Court now ORDERS that Motion to Reinstate is DENIED as to the two hundred and fifty-three (253) Movant Plaintiffs specifically enumerated in the above-entitled actions ("Enumerated Plaintiffs"). The claims of the Enumerated Plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 05/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE AS TO 12 ENUMERATED PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. This Court now ORDERS that the Motion to Dismiss isGRANTED as to the twelve (12) Plaintiffs specifically enumerated in the above entitled actions ("Enumerated Plaintiffs"). The claims of the Enumerated Plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Carol Butler, Delores McCoy, Ronald Medford, Carole Ott, and Louise Steegman terminated. (shb) (Entered: 04/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Carlos Gierbolini,Valerie Pritchett, Roel Reyes, Arnolia Scott, Karen Sens, and Gary haleyterminated. (shb) (Entered: 04/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) AGREED ORDER OF REINSTATEMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. this Court now ORDERS that the Motion to Reinstate is GRANTED as to the fifteen (15) Movant Plaintiffsspecifically enumerated in the above-entitled actions ("Enumerated Plaintiffs").The claims of these Enumerated Plaintiffs are hereby REINSTATED. The Court'sprevious order of dismissal is vacated as to these Enumerated Plaintiffs only, and their claims will proceed without regard to any statute of limitations, repose or other time bar which did not otherwise exist as of the date of their dismissal. Reinstated parties Mary Burnett, Douglas Dukes, Yvonne Gilman, Jamie Sims, Gloria Smith, Kathy Venters. (shb) (Entered: 04/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) ORDER OF MARCH 17, 2014 ON MOTION TO DISMISS 58 ENUMERATED PLAINTIFFS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (See order for details) Patricia Blanks, Carol Butler, Lois Grgurich, Mary Humpfrey, Jula Jennings, Delores Jean McCoy, Ronald Medford, Carole Ott, Valerie Pritchett, Rebecca Reid, Roel Reyes, Arnolia Scott, Karen Sens, Louise Steegman, Mary Winn, Mary Barnes and Donna Bell terminated. (shb) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) ORDER OF JANUARY 27, 2014 ON MOTION TO REINSTATE DISMISSED PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Reinstated parties: Rebecca Albright, Sheila Albritton, Constance Alexander, Linda Anderson, Gail Andrews, Rita Ardoin, Barbara Baggett, William Barnum, Murry Barrett, Lorie Bason, Steven Beach, Lovie Benford, Anthony Blair, Sherri Brewton, Brenda Broshears, Mary Brownie, Mary Burnett, Patsy Burtchett, Johnnie Byers, Linda Byrd, George Canada,Vicky Cardenas, Florence Carpenter, Michaela Carter, William Cooper, Linda Cosina, Julien Crowe, Richard Cupstid, Linda Currington, Mandy Davis, Pheba Davison, Shelly Davison, Manuel Diaz, Geraldine Dorris, Douglas Dukes, Lillian Dungy, Portia Dykes-Wright, Gladys Edwards, Mary Emmanuel, Antonia Estes, Sandra Flores, Barbara Foster, Betty Freeman, JoAnn Freeman, Yvonne Gilman, Catherine Hilliard, Patricia Hollingsworth, Pearline Hubbard, Cedric Keermann, George Kobesto, Mark Koenig, Stella Lanphere, Joyce Ann Lewis, Michael Louis, Regina Lowe, Phyllis Margaret Luna, Cheryl Manning, Boyd Mason, Pamela Mason, Linda McCully, Annie McGee, Patricia McGhar, Ed Memmer, Marie Miller, Debora Moore-Swift, Wendy Nail, Ralph Navarro, Brenda Norris, Cheryl Owens, Barbara Payton, Marvin Redford, Latonya Rhodes, Gwendolyn Richardson, Richard RoseJanie Rucker, Debra Sharp, Carlene Elizabeth Beasley- Shine, Shirley Simmons, Jamie Sims, Gloria Smith, Saundra Steed, Jackie Stringer, Lucy Tadlock, Lynda Tanner, Joyce Teamer-Johnson, John Thompson, Peggy Toombs, Gerald Trosclair, Mark Turley, Myrtle Lee Veasey, Kathy Venters, Cora Veres, Geneva Walker, Alfrieda Warren, Joystine Williams, Beulah Wilson, Theodore Wilson. (shb) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Revised Proposed) Order of January 27, 2014 on Motion to Reinstate Dismissed Plaintiffs' Claims re Order,,,,, #61 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Caption, #2 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Amy) (Entered: 03/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' causes of action for negligent misrepresentation, deceit by concealment, and violation of Unfair Competition Law, MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' allegations re design defect, failure to warn, negligent misrepresentation, concealment and claims for injunctive relief and disgorgement of profits filed by Defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Motion set for hearing on 7/23/2012 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit)(Steimle, William) (Entered: 06/20/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Notice of Removal, Declaration of Steimle, Notice of Related Cases, Notice of Pendency, Notice of Interested Parties, Disclosure Statement, Demand for Jury Trial, served on 6/11/12. (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of WILLIAM E. STEIMLE in support of Notice of Removal, #1 filed by Defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS OR PROCEEDINGS filed by defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES filed by defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Related Case(s): NONE (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP identifying Other Affiliate Astra USA Inc., Other Affiliate Astra U.S. Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Zeneca Inc., Other Affiliate AstraZeneca AB for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, identifying Other Affiliate Astra USA Inc., Other Affiliate Astra U.S. Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Zeneca Inc., Other Affiliate AstraZeneca AB for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (esa) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • DocketCOPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Pamela Mason et al, upon Defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP served on 5/10/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Beatrice Casarez, CT Corporation System, in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) (Entered: 06/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Superior Court of CA, Los Angeles County, case number BC485369 with CONFORMED copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge George H. King, discovery to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg; (Filing fee $ 350 PAID ); filed by defendant AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2012: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CV-18) (jp). (Entered: 06/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Farley Jay Neuman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan Ritsu Nishikawa

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pavan L. Rosati

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy K. Fisher