This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2019 at 17:14:12 (UTC).

Minnesota Made Hockey, Inc. v. Minnesota Hockey, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2010 Minnesota Made Hockey, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Minnesota Hockey, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey J. Keyes and John R. Tunheim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:10-CV-03884

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jeffrey J. Keyes

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

 

Party Details

Defendants

Minnesota Hockey, Inc.

District 6 of Minnesota Amateur Hockey Association

Bloomington Jefferson Hockey Booster Club

New Prague Hockey Association, Inc.

Burnsville Hockey Club

Prior Lake/Savage Hockey Association

Richfield Hockey Auxiliary

Chaska Chanhassen Hockey Association

Minnetonka Youth Hockey Association

Chaska Community Hockey Association

Edina Hockey Association

John Doe

Bloomington Kennedy Hockey Association

Richfield Youth Hockey Association

Prior Lake-Savage Hockey Association

Minnesota District

New Prague Area Hockey Association

Bloomington Jefferson Hockey Association

District

Burnsville Blaze Hockey

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Robert L DeMay

901 South 2Nd Street, #602

Mpls, MN 55415

W Anders Folk

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

300 South 4Th Street, Suite 600

Minneapolis, MN 55415

William L Greene

Stinson Leonard Street Llp, 50 S 6Th St Ste 2600

Mpls, MN 55402

Andrew W Davis

Stinson Leonard Street Llp, 50 South Sixth Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

James M Susag

Attorney at Larkin Hoffman Daly & Lindgren Ltd

7900 Xerxes Ave S Ste 1500

Mpls, MN 55431-1194

Mark R Whitmore

Attorney at Bassford Remele, PA

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

Janine M Loetscher

Attorney at Bassford Remele, PA

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

Jonathan C Marquet

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th St., Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Other Attorneys

Jenna T Burfeind

Attorney at Kalina, Wills, Gisvold & Clark, PLLP

6160 Summit Dr Ste 560

Mpls, MN 55430

Michael Clark Glover

Attorney at Lommen Abdo, P.A.

1000 International Centre, 920 Second Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jason E Engkjer

Attorney at Lommen Abdo, P.A.

1000 International Centre, 920 Second Avenue South

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

84 #2

Civil Notice - appeal

84 #1

Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice

#84

(#84) JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice, #2 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP) (Entered: 10/14/2011)

#83

(#83) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on October 13, 2011. (HAM) (Entered: 10/13/2011)

#82

(#82) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on #80 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and #81 Stipulation of Dismissal by Minnesota Made Hockey, Inc. (Engkjer, Jason) Modified text on 10/13/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 10/12/2011)

#81

(#81) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Bloomington Jefferson Hockey Booster Club, Bloomington Kennedy Hockey Association, Bloomington Youth Hockey Association, Burnsville Hockey Club, Chaska Chanhassen Hockey Association, District 6 of Minnesota Amateur Hockey Association, Eden Prairie Hockey Association, Edina Hockey Association, Brad Hewitt, Minnesota Hockey, Inc., Minnesota Made Hockey, Inc., Minnetonka Youth Hockey Association, New Prague Hockey Association, Inc., Prior Lake/Savage Hockey Association, Richfield Hockey Auxiliary, Shakopee Youth Hockey Association, Waconia Hockey Association, Inc.. (Engkjer, Jason) (Entered: 10/12/2011)

#80

(#80) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs re: ABC Corporation and John Doe. (Engkjer, Jason) Modified text on 10/13/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 10/12/2011)

#79

(#79) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by all parties. (Engkjer, Jason) Modified text on 10/12/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 10/11/2011)

#78

(#78) Minute Entry: Telephone Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 8/30/2011 regarding the status of settlement. (Court Reporter n/a and Tape #n/a) (MMP) (Entered: 08/30/2011)

1 #8

Affidavit of Service by Mail

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Cover Letter

1 #5

Exhibit 4-State Court Proposed Order

1 #4

Exhibit 3-Affidavit in Support of Motion with Exhibits

1 #3

Exhibit 2-Memorandum in Support of Motion

1 #2

Exhibit 1-Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Prior Lake/Savage Hockey Association, District 6 of Minnesota Amateur Hockey Association, Edina Hockey Association, Chaska Chanhassen Hockey Association, New Prague Hockey Association, Inc., Minnetonka Youth Hockey Association, Waconia Hockey Association, Inc., Bloomington Jefferson Hockey Booster Club, Shakopee Youth Hockey Association, Burnsville Hockey Club from District Court of Scott County, State of Minnesota, case number 70-C-10-20811. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4048305) Assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Antitrust List and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit 2-Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 Exhibit 3-Affidavit in Support of Motion with Exhibits, #5 Exhibit 4-State Court Proposed Order, #6 Cover Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Affidavit of Service by Mail) (akl) (Entered: 09/10/2010)

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice, #2 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP) (Entered: 10/14/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on October 13, 2011. (HAM) (Entered: 10/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on #80 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and #81 Stipulation of Dismissal by Minnesota Made Hockey, Inc. (Engkjer, Jason) Modified text on 10/13/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 10/12/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Bloomington Jefferson Hockey Booster Club, Bloomington Kennedy Hockey Association, Bloomington Youth Hockey Association, Burnsville Hockey Club, Chaska Chanhassen Hockey Association, District 6 of Minnesota Amateur Hockey Association, Eden Prairie Hockey Association, Edina Hockey Association, Brad Hewitt, Minnesota Hockey, Inc., Minnesota Made Hockey, Inc., Minnetonka Youth Hockey Association, New Prague Hockey Association, Inc., Prior Lake/Savage Hockey Association, Richfield Hockey Auxiliary, Shakopee Youth Hockey Association, Waconia Hockey Association, Inc.. (Engkjer, Jason) (Entered: 10/12/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs re: ABC Corporation and John Doe. (Engkjer, Jason) Modified text on 10/13/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 10/12/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by all parties. (Engkjer, Jason) Modified text on 10/12/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 10/11/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) Minute Entry: Telephone Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 8/30/2011 regarding the status of settlement. (Court Reporter n/a and Tape #n/a) (MMP) (Entered: 08/30/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) Minute Entry: Settlement Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/26/2011. No settlement reached. TO BE CONTINUED AT A LATER DATE.(Court Reporter N/A) (MMP) (Entered: 07/27/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Resetting of TIME ONLY for Settlement Conference: #75 Settlement Conference set for 7/26/2011 will now begin at 9:00 a.m. in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes.(JEP) (Entered: 07/19/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 7/26/2011 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 06/10/2011. (MMP) (Entered: 06/10/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge John R. Tunheim. (HAM) Modified text on 9/20/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 09/20/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John R. Tunheim: Telephone Conference held on 9/17/2010. Response is due September 27, 2010, Reply is due October 1, 2010, and Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for Tuesday October, 5, 2010 at 9:00am. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (jam) (Entered: 09/17/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • (#8) *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Setting Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/17/2010 at 3:30 PM before Judge John R. Tunheim. (HAM) (Entered: 09/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Minnesota Made Hockey, Inc. re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 Notice (Other), #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Glover, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Bernard M. McBain in SUPPORT OF #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Minnesota Made Hockey, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-M)(Glover, Michael) Modified text on 9/13/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 09/13/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Minnesota Made Hockey, Inc. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate).(Glover, Michael) Modified text on 9/13/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 09/13/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Minnesota Made Hockey, Inc. Date and time of #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Hearing to be determined by the Court. (Glover, Michael) Modified text on 9/13/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 09/13/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Minnesota Made Hockey, Inc.. (Glover, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Minnesota Made Hockey, Inc.. (Glover, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Prior Lake/Savage Hockey Association, District 6 of Minnesota Amateur Hockey Association, Edina Hockey Association, Chaska Chanhassen Hockey Association, New Prague Hockey Association, Inc., Minnetonka Youth Hockey Association, Waconia Hockey Association, Inc., Bloomington Jefferson Hockey Booster Club, Shakopee Youth Hockey Association, Burnsville Hockey Club from District Court of Scott County, State of Minnesota, case number 70-C-10-20811. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4048305) Assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Antitrust List and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit 2-Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 Exhibit 3-Affidavit in Support of Motion with Exhibits, #5 Exhibit 4-State Court Proposed Order, #6 Cover Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Affidavit of Service by Mail) (akl) (Entered: 09/10/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where District Attorney is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Clark Glover