This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2021 at 02:08:49 (UTC).

Millennium Laboratories, Inc. v. American Clinical Solutions, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2011 Millennium Laboratories, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American Clinical Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charlene Edwards Honeywell and David A. Baker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:11-CV-01299

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

Referral Judge

David A. Baker

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Millennium Laboratories, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

American Clinical Solutions, LLC

Physician Administrative Solutions, LLC

Brian Artze

Brandi Malavet

Joseph King

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

William D. Nussbaum

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 13Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Christopher T. Pickens

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

Park Place Ii - 9Th Floor, 7930 Jones Branch Dr

Mclean, VA 22102

Michael D. Porter

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - TNE

Suite 301, 1110 Market St

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Richard E. Mitchell

Attorney at GrayRobinson, PA

301 E Pine St - Ste 1400, Po Box 3068

Orlando, FL 32802-3068

Adam K. Levin

555 13Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Jeremy B. Stein

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 13Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Bruce B. Blackwell

Attorney at King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA

25 E. Pine St

Orlando, FL 32801

Taylor Flanagan Ford

Attorney at King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA

25 E. Pine St

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Samual A Miller

Attorney at Akerman Senterfitt

420 S Orange Ave - Ste 1200, Po Box 231

Orlando, FL 32801

Virginia B. Townes

Attorney at Losey PLLC

1420 Edgewater Drive

Orlando, FL 32804

Brandon Wayne Banks

Attorney at Walsh Banks Law

105 E. Robinson Street, Suite 303

Orlando, FL 32801

Harold E. Morlan, II

Attorney at Walsh Law Group

P.O. Box 2271

Orlando, FL 32802

David A. Meek, II

Attorney at Losey PLLC

1420 Edgewater Drive

Orlando, FL 32804

Robert J. Stovash

Attorney at Stovash, Case & Tingley, PA

220 N Rosalind Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

Scott A. Livingston

Attorney at CPLS, PA

Suite 445, 201 E Pine St

Orlando, FL 32801

Tara Suzanne Pellegrino

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Broad and Cassel

1 N Clematis St Ste 500

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-5537

Denis L. Durkin

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Suite 2300, 200 S Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801-3432

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#163

#162

#161

#160

#159

#158

#157

#156

#148

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A & B

#1

278 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#163) ORDER granting #162 Plaintiff Millennium Laboratories, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Physician Administrative Solutions, LLC. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/29/2012. (BGS) (Entered: 08/29/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#162) Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Physician Administrative Solutions, LLC pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) by Millennium Laboratories, Inc.. (Blackwell, Bruce) (Entered: 08/29/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#161) ORDER: To properly dismiss this action, Plaintiff must either submit a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared in this case or file a motion for the Court to consider Plaintiff's request to dismiss the complaint. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/29/2012. (BGS) (Entered: 08/29/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#160) Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Physician Administrative Solutions, LLC by Millennium Laboratories, Inc.. (Blackwell, Bruce) (Entered: 08/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#159) ORDER granting #158 Millennium Laboratories, Inc. and American Clinical Solutions LLC's Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. The claims and counterclaims between Millennium Laboratories, Inc. and American Clinical solutions LLC, ONLY, are dismissed, with prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk is directed to terminate the pending motions at docket entries 119, 127, and 128 as they pertain to the claims and counterclaims between Millennium Laboratories, Inc. and American Clinical Solutions LLC. The Clerk is further directed to terminate American Clinical Solutions as a party to this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/28/2012. (BGS) (Entered: 08/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#158) STIPULATION of Dismissal and Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by American Clinical Solutions, LLC, Millennium Laboratories, Inc.. (Ford, Taylor) *Modified text/event on 8/28/2012 (MAA). (Entered: 08/27/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#157) NOTICE of compliance re #148 Order by American Clinical Solutions, LLC (Morlan, Harold) (Entered: 08/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#156) NOTICE of compliance re #148 Order by Millennium Laboratories, Inc. (Ford, Taylor) (Entered: 08/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#155) ENDORSED ORDER granting #154 Motion to extend time. The parties shall have up to and including September 11, 2012 to file motions in limine. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/10/2012. (BGS) (Entered: 08/10/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) Joint MOTION to extend time to September 11, 2012 for filing of motions in limine and to amend #63 Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order by American Clinical Solutions, LLC, Millennium Laboratories, Inc., Physician Administrative Solutions, LLC. (Ford, Taylor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. (Entered: 08/09/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
173 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of service executed on 08/05/11 by Millennium Laboratories, Inc. as to Brian Artze, Physician Administrative Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Richard) (Entered: 08/19/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of service executed on 8/8/11 by Millennium Laboratories, Inc. as to American Clinical Solutions, LLC. (PML) (Entered: 08/19/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Millennium Laboratories, Inc.. (Mitchell, Richard) (Entered: 08/18/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Millennium Laboratories, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Mitchell, Richard) (Entered: 08/18/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of service executed on 8/5/11 by Millennium Laboratories, Inc. as to Brandi Malavet. (PML) (Entered: 08/15/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of service executed on 8/8/11 by Millennium Laboratories, Inc. as to Joseph King. (PML) (Entered: 08/15/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The response shall be filed within (14)days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/8/2011. (NBL) copies e-mailed (Entered: 08/08/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2.The response shall be filed within (14) days from the date of the Order.The Case Management Report shall be filed under event code "Motion for Entry of Case Management Report Scheduling Order." Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/8/2011. (NBL) copies e-maile (Entered: 08/08/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons issued as to American Clinical Solutions, LLC, Brian Artze, Joseph King, Brandi Malavet, Physician Administrative Solutions, LLC. (at intake) (IGC) (Entered: 08/05/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Clinical Solutions, LLC, Brian Artze, Joseph King, Brandi Malavet, Physician Administrative Solutions, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ORL9569) filed by Millennium Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B) (Cover Sheet not submitted)(IGC) (Entered: 08/05/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Millennium Laboratories, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN CLINICAL SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEREMY BARUCH STEIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William D. Nussbaum