This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2019 at 13:24:02 (UTC).

MetroPCS Wireless Inc v. AU Optronics Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2015 MetroPCS Wireless Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against AU Optronics Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara M.G. Lynn. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:10-CV-02576

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M.G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MetroPCS Wireless Inc

Defendants

Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd

Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation

Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc

Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.

AU Optronics Corporation America

Chi Mei Corporation

Sanyo CE Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.

Epson Electronics America Inc

Sharp Corporation

Toshiba Corporation

CMO Japan Co Ltd

Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc

Tatung Company of America Inc

Sharp Electronics Corporation

HannStar Display Corporation

Epson Imaging Devices Corporation

Toshiba America Information Systems Inc

Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd

Special Master

Martin Quinn

San Francisco, CA 94111

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mike McKool

Attorney at McKool Smith PC

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Melissa B Felder

5301 Wisconsin Ave Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20015

Defendant Attorneys

Jacob P Alpren

Attorney at Farmer Brownstein Jaeger LLP

235 Montgomery St, Suite 835

San Francisco, CA 94104

David C Brownstein

Attorney at Farmer Brownstein Jaeger LLP

235 Montgomery St, Suite 835

San Francisco, CA 94104

Samantha Harper Knox

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

1600 El Camino Real

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Christopher B Hockett

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

1600 El Camino Real

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Matthew Adams McGee

Attorney at Haynes & Boone LLP

2323 Victory Ave, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75219

Farschad Farzan

Attorney at Nossaman LLP

50 California Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Alan R Vickery

Attorney at Sedgwick LLP

1717 Main St, Suite 5400

Dallas, TX 75201

Natasha A Saggar Sheth

Attorney at Nossaman LLP

50 California Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Carl Blumenstein

Attorney at Nossaman LLP

50 California Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

John M Grenfell

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw PittmanLLP

Post Office Box 2824

San Francisco, CA 94126

Jason Sheffield Angell

Attorney at Freitas Angell & Weinberg LLP

350 Marine Parkway, Sutie 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Jason M Bussey

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Barlett LLP

2475 Hanover St

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Jerry Chen

Attorney at TechKnowledge Law Group LLP

100 Marine Parkway, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

James Glenn Kreissman

Attorney at Simpson Thatcher & Bartlett LLP

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Robert E. Freitas

Attorney at Freitas Angell & Weinberg LLP

350 Marine Parkway, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Other Attorneys

Michael Edward Mumford

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

1900 East Ninth St., Suite 3200

Cleveland, OH 44114

Tracy Lynn Cole

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza, 11Th Floor

New York, NY 10111

Kent Michael Roger

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

39 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#294

#293

#291

#290

#289

288 #1

Proposed Order

#288

#278

#277

#8

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

505 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#294) ORDER: The Court finds that the following cases involve common questions of law and fact and should be consolidated under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a): No. 3:11-cv-2948-M Compucom Systems, Inc. v. AU Optronics Corporation et al. No. 3:10-cv-02576-M MetroPCS Wireless Inc. v. AU Optronics Corporation et al. The consolidated action will use No. 3:11-cv-2948-M as the lead case. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/14/2015) (bdb) (Entered: 05/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#293) ORDER: The above-referenced matter is transferred to the docket of the Honorable Barbara M.G. Lynn for possible consolidation. All future pleadings shall be filed under case No. 3:10-CV-2576-M. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/12/2015) (ctf) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#292) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #288 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason M. Bussey. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/10/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#291) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Optoelectronics Japan Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Optoelectronics USA, Inc. for Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (McNeil, Barry) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#290) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CMO Japan Co Ltd identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Optoelectronics Japan Co., Ltd. for CMO Japan Co Ltd. (McNeil, Barry) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#289) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Corporation for Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation. (McNeil, Barry) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#288) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jason M. Bussey (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6717597) filed by HannStar Display Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Griffith, Casey) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#287) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #278 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Ewart. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#286) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #277 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael R. Scott. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#285) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #275 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Alan Nedeau. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
285 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, Waiver of Service, and [Proposed] Order by Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/25/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action MetroPCS Wireless Inc. v. AU Optronics Corp., etal from the Northern District of Texas. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:10-cv-02576. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-11). Case transferred to San Francisco Division of Northern District of California. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 2/9/2011) (mcr) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] (Entered: 02/17/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Philip J. Iovieno (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 46403) filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (mcr) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] (Entered: 01/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney William A Isaacson (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 46403) filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (mcr) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] (Entered: 01/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Anne M Nardacci (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 46403) filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (mcr) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] (Entered: 01/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Magistrate Judge Stickney preliminarily assigned. File to Judge Godbey. (axm) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] (Entered: 12/20/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate MetroPCS, Inc. for MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.. (LeClair, Lewis) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] (Entered: 12/17/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.. Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the #Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 0539-3631860) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (LeClair, Lewis) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] (Entered: 12/17/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. is a litigant