Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2021 at 03:16:50 (UTC).

Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust v. Dennis J FitzSimons, et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2012 Marc S Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Dennis J FitzSimons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard J. Sullivan and Denise L. Cote. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:12-CV-02652

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Richard J. Sullivan

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Defendants

UD VS RISLEY CJ DE SIEYES ETAL

ANDREW T SZMULANSKI

Robert Chase

ORDER OF FELICIAN SISTERS CS NT OF ST FRANCIS

ADIA INVESTMENT SERIES

Large Cap Index Fund, A Series of SEI Institutional Investments Trust

WATER AND POWER EMPLOYEES' RET DISAB & DEATH BENEFIT INS PLAN

KENNETH R. POSNER AND ARLENE L. POSNER

Ruthellyn Musil 401(K) Savings Plan

MILLER FAMILY TRUST UAD

Jeffrey W. Babcock

THE SHERRY P. BRODER IRA A/K/A SHERRY P. BRODER U/A DTD

Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC

HORIZON GOLDEN PARTNERS L P

Crane Asset Management LLC

CA Public EE Retrmnt Sys

The DFA Investment Trust Company, DFA Investment Dimensions Group, Inc., The Alliance Bernstein Portfolios, Frank W. Denius, Donald M. Hinman Jr., Lewis Tatman and Willilam F. Warchol,

STINEHART LIVING TRUST UA DTD

Marlene F Slade Rollover IRA, National Financial Services LLC/Fidelity Management Trust Co, Custodian

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

HENRY CARSON JACKSON TRUST U/W IRREVOCABLE MANAGEMENT TRUST UA TRUST A-2

8,108 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mark A. Neubauer

Attorney at Carlton Fields, LLP

2000 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 530 North Tower

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4707

Other Attorneys

Robert John Malionek

Attorney at Latham & Watkins ,LLP

885 Third Avenue, Suite 1000

New York, NY 10022

Thomas H. McLain

Attorney at Fisher & Sauls, P.A.

100 Second Avenue South, Suite 701

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

Jane Dall Wilson

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Nicole Deborde

Attorney at Deborde Lawfirm

712 Main Street, Suite 2400

Houston, TX 77002

Charles Robert Pergue

Attorney at Cary Kane LLP

1350 Broadway, Suite 1400

New York, NY 10018

Jennifer L. Maleski

Attorney at Dilworth Paxson LLP

Asa Robison Danes

Attorney at Seeger Weiss LLP (NY2)

One Williams Street

New York, NY 10004

Andrew Garry Gordon

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP (NYC)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Rachel Brothman Kane

Attorney at Cooley LLP (NY)

1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Melinda K Burton

Attorney at Faruki Ireland & Cox P.L.L.

500 Courthouse Plaza, S.W., 10 North Ludlow Street

Dayton, OH 45402

Nikolay V Vydashenko

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins L.L.P.

666 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10103

Steven Hesser Leech

Attorney at Gozdecki, Del Giudice, Americus & Farkas, LLP

1 E. Wacker Dr., Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60601

Robert Louis Weiser

Attorney at City of Cincinnati

801 Plum Street Suite 214

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Wendy Hope Zoberman

Attorney at Berman Devalerio Pease Tabacco Burt & Pucillo

222 Lakeview Avenue, Suite 900

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Jeffrey David Eaton

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP (Chicago)

6600 Sears Tower

Chicago, IL 60606

David Bruce Anderson

Attorney at Marion's Inn

1611 Telegraph Ave, Suite 707

Oakland, CA 94612

Irene Eun Han

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Philip Michael Musolino

Attorney at Musolino and Dessel

1615 L St., Nw Suite 440

Washington, DC 20036

Hannah Berkowitz

Attorney at Murphy & McMonigle PC

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

969 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#6422

(#6422) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (8244) MOTION for Victor S. Elias to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Victor S. Elias is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in the actions captioned above and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Victor Santiago Elias terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/15/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 1:12-cv-00554-DLC, 1:12-cv-02652-DLC (jca) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#8243

(#6421) MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting (8242) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Adam G. Gutbezahl terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/6/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 1:12-cv-02652-DLC (va) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#8241

(#6420) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel W. Sternman on behalf of RIEF Trading LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, RIEF RMP LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 1:12-cv-02652-DLC.(Sternman, Joel) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

8240 #2

Text of Proposed Order

8240 #1

Exhibit A

#8240

(#6419) MOTION for Jeff J. Friedman to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by COGENT INVESTMENT STRATEGIES, LLC, RIEF RMP LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, RIEF Trading LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, STEVEN RAPKIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al..(Friedman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#6418

(#6418) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (8238) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kristin C. Foster is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in these actions, that such withdrawal is effective immediately, and that Ms. Foster be removed from the Court's CM/ECF electronic notification list for these proceedings. SO ORDERED. Attorney Kristin C. Foster terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/27/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 1:12-cv-02652-DLC (jca) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#6417

(#6417) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting #6416 MOTION for Brian Borchard to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Brian Borchard is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in these actions and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. SO ORDERED. Attorney Brian Borchard terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/26/2020) (jca) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

6416 #1

Proposed Order

4 #20

Letter

4 #19

Exhibiit A

4 #18

Amended Complaint

4 #17

Affidavit of Service

4 #6

Affidavit of Service

4 #5

Proposed Form of Order

4 #4

Notice

4 #3

Motion

#1

(#1) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF MDL ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER... that the stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as CTO-1, filed on 12/28/2011, is LIFTED and the action is transferred to the S.D.N.Y. for the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable William H. Pauley. (Signed by MDL Panel on 3/20/2012) (sjo) (Entered: 04/11/2012)

8,608 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6422) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (8244) MOTION for Victor S. Elias to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Victor S. Elias is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in the actions captioned above and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Victor Santiago Elias terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/15/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 1:12-cv-00554-DLC, 1:12-cv-02652-DLC (jca) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6421) MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting (8242) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Adam G. Gutbezahl terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/6/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 1:12-cv-02652-DLC (va) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6420) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel W. Sternman on behalf of RIEF Trading LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, RIEF RMP LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 1:12-cv-02652-DLC.(Sternman, Joel) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6419) MOTION for Jeff J. Friedman to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by COGENT INVESTMENT STRATEGIES, LLC, RIEF RMP LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, RIEF Trading LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, STEVEN RAPKIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al..(Friedman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6418) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (8238) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kristin C. Foster is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in these actions, that such withdrawal is effective immediately, and that Ms. Foster be removed from the Court's CM/ECF electronic notification list for these proceedings. SO ORDERED. Attorney Kristin C. Foster terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/27/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 1:12-cv-02652-DLC (jca) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6417) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting #6416 MOTION for Brian Borchard to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Brian Borchard is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in these actions and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. SO ORDERED. Attorney Brian Borchard terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/26/2020) (jca) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6416) MOTION for Brian Borchard to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Cantigny Foundation, Robert R. McCormick Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 1:12-cv-00064-DLC, 1:12-cv-00555-DLC, 1:12-cv-02652-DLC.(Balassa, Gabor) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6415) SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to John Oldendorf on December 11, 2019 . Document filed by DOROTHY P O'DONNELL REVOCABLE U/A DTD 04/25/1983.(Asmus, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6414) AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sumitomo Mitsui Trust Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. for Trust & Custody Services Bank, Ltd.. Document filed by Trust & Custody Services Bank, Ltd...(Stern, Jordan) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6413) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #6410 MOTION for Alan Salpeter, Sheldon Solow, Jason Ben and Therese King Nohos to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Daniel Kazan. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Sheldon L. Solow; Jason Jerod Ben and Alan N. Salpeter terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/4/2020) (jca) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6,796 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MDL TRANSFER IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and documents numbered 113-121 rom the United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Delaware. Case Number: 10-ap-54010 (KJC), MDL Number: 2296 (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit B3, #4 Exhibit C4, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Notice of Hearing, #7 Affidavit/Declaration, #8 Affidavit/Declaration, #9 Objection, #10 Affidavit/Declaration, #11 Response, #12 Exhibit 1, #13 Certificate of Service, #14 Objection, #15 Proposed Form of Order, #16 Certificate of Service, #17 Exhibit A part 14, #18 Exhibit A part 25, #19 Exhibit A part 36, #20 Exhibit A part 47, #21 Exhibit A part 58, #22 Exhibit A part 6, #23 Limited Objection, #24 Exhibit 1, #25 Exhibit 12, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 34) (sjo) (Entered: 04/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MDL TRANSFER IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and documents numbered 86-112 from the United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Delaware. Case Number: 10-ap-54010 (KJC), MDL Number: 2296, (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice, #2 Order, #3 Order, #4 Order, #5 Order, #6 Summons, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Summons, #9 Certificate of Service, #10 Summons, #11 Certificate of Service, #12 Summons, #13 Certificate of Service, #14 Summons, #15 Certificate of Service, #16 Summons, #17 Certificate of Service, #18 Summons, #19 Certificate of Service, #20 Notice of Appearance, #21 Pro Hac Vice, #22 Order, #23 Pro Hac Vice, #24 Pro Hac Vice, #25 Pro Hac Vice, #26 Order, #27 Order, #28 Order, #29 Summons, #30 Certificate of Service, #31 Summons, #32 Certificate of Service, #33 Summons, #34 Certificate of Service, #35 Summons, #36 Order, #37 Amended Notice of Apeearance) (sjo) (Entered: 04/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MDL TRANSFER IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and documents numbered 62-85 from the United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Delaware. Case Number: 10-ap-54010 (KJC), MDL Number: 2296, (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice, #2 Pro Hac Vice, #3 Notice of Service, #4 Order, #5 Order, #6 Notice of Service, #7 Notice of Service, #8 Motion, #9 Notice of Service, #10 Notice of Service, #11 Notice of Service, #12 Order, #13 Notice of Service, #14 Notice of Service, #15 Notice of Service, #16 Motion, #17 Exhibit 1, #18 Certificate of Service, #19 Order, #20 Notice of Service, #21 Notice of Appearance, #22 Pro Hac Vice, #23 Order, #24 Pro Hac Vice, #25 Pro Hac Vice) (sjo) (Entered: 04/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MDL TRANSFER IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and documents numbered 61 Exhibit A1-A10 from the United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Delaware. Case Number: 10-ap-54010 (KJC), MDL Number: 2296, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit A3, #4 Exhibit A4, #5 Exhibit A5, #6 Exhibit A6, #7 Exhibit A7, #8 Exhibit A8, #9 Exhibit A9, #10 Exhibit A10) (sjo) Modified on 4/24/2012 (sjo). (Entered: 04/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MDL TRANSFER IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and documents numbered 61 from the United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Delaware. Case Number: 10-ap-54010 (KJC), MDL Number: 2296, (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint) (sjo) (Entered: 04/20/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MDL TRANSFER IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and documents numbered 55-60 from the United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Delaware. Case Number: 10-ap-54010 (KJC), MDL Number: 2296, (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Service, #5 Exhibit A2, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Notice of Service, #8 Notice of Service, #9 Notice of Service, #10 Notice of Service, #11 Notice of Service) (sjo) (Entered: 04/20/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MDL TRANSFER IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and documents numbered 41-43,45-53 from the United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Delaware. Case Number: 10-ap-54010 (KJC), MDL Number: 2296 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service, #2 Notice of Service, #3 Notice of Service, #4 Notice of Service, #5 Notice of Service, #6 Notice of Service, #7 Notice of Service, #8 Notice of Service, #9 Notice of Service, #10 Notice of Service, #11 Notice of Service, #12 Exhibit A, #13 Notice of Service, #14 Exhibit A2, #15 Exhibit B) (sjo) (Entered: 04/20/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MDL TRANSFER IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and documents numbered 15-40 from the United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Delaware. Case Number: 10-ap-54010 (KJC), MDL Number: 2296, (Attachments: #1 Objection, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Notice of Service, #4 Notice of Service, #5 Notice of Service, #6 Notice of Service, #7 Notice of Service, #8 Notice of Service, #9 Notice of Service, #10 Notice of Service, #11 Notice of Service, #12 Notice of Service, #13 Notice of Service, #14 Notice of Service, #15 Notice of Service, #16 Notice of Service, #17 Notice of Service, #18 Notice of Service, #19 Notice of Service, #20 Notice of Service, #21 Notice of Service, #22 Notice of Service, #23 Notice of Service, #24 Notice of Service, #25 Notice of Service, #26 Notice of Service, #27 Notice of Service) (sjo) (Entered: 04/19/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MDL TRANSFER IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and documents numbered 1-14, 44 from the United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Delaware. Case Number: 10-ap-54010 (KJC), MDL Number: 2296, (Attachments: #1 Redacted Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Motion, #4 Notice, #5 Proposed Form of Order, #6 Affidavit of Service, #7 Notice of Service, #8 Notice of Service, #9 Notice of Service, #10 Notice of Service, #11 Order, #12 Objection, #13 Affidavit of Service, #14 Objection, #15 Certificate of Service, #16 Affidavit/Declaration, #17 Affidavit of Service, #18 Amended Complaint, #19 Exhibit A, #20 Letter) (sjo) (Entered: 04/19/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF MDL ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER... that the stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as CTO-1, filed on 12/28/2011, is LIFTED and the action is transferred to the S.D.N.Y. for the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable William H. Pauley. (Signed by MDL Panel on 3/20/2012) (sjo) (Entered: 04/11/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Robert Pergue