Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/04/2019 at 02:57:10 (UTC).

Low v. Trump University, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2010 Low filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Trump University, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gonzalo P. Curiel and William V. Gallo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:10-CV-00940

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gonzalo P. Curiel

Referral Judge

William V. Gallo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Ed Oberkrom

Patricia Murphy

Tarla Makaeff

John Brown

Brandon Keller

Sonny Low

J.R. Everett

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Trump University, LLC

Donald J Trump

DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive

Trump Entrepreneur Initiative

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jason A Forge

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diegp, CA 92101

Maureen E. Mueller

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Patrick J Coughlin

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Paula R. Brown

Attorney at Blood Hurst & O'Reardon, LLP

501 West Broadway, Suite 1490

San Diego, CA 92101

Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Brian E. Cochran

Attorney at Robbins, Gelle,r Rudman & Dowd, LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Aaron M. Olsen

Attorney at Haeggquist & Eck, LLP

225 Broadway, Suite 2050

San Diego, CA 92101

Amber Lee Eck

Attorney at Haeggquist & Eck, LLP

225 Broadway, Suite 2050

San Diego, CA 92101

Xavier Jay Alvarez

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Alreen Haeggquist

Attorney at Haeggquist & Eck, LLP

225 Broadway, Suite 2050

San Diego, CA 92101

Helen Irene Zeldes

Attorney at Coast Law Group LLP

1140 South Coast Hwy 101

Encinitas, CA 92024

Jeffrey J. Stein

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David Lee Kirman

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, 7Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Stephen F Yunker

Attorney at Yunker and Schneider

655 West Broadway, Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

Nancy L. Stagg

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

12255 El Camino Real, Suite 250

San Diego, CA 92130

Wallace Moore Allan

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

400 South Hope Street, Suite 1050

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

Daniel M. Petrocelli

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jeffrey L. Goldman

Attorney at Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

270 Madison Ave.

New York, NY 10016

David Keith Schneider

Attorney at Yunker and Schneider

655 West Broadway, Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

David Marroso

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#638

(#638) ORDER Granting Joint #637 Motion to Permit Consummation of the Class Action Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/9/18. (dlg) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#637

(#637) Joint MOTION to Permit Consummation of the Class Action Settlement Agreement re #619 Judgment,, #618 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#636

(#636) MANDATE of USCA affirming the decision of the USDC as to #621 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (akr) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

#635

RESTRICTED

#633

(#633) NOTICE OF POSTING OF APPEAL BOND by Sherri B. Simpson re #632 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order re Appeal Bond)(Friedman, Gary) QC email missing certificate of service (dlg). (Entered: 06/23/2017)

#632

(#632) ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #624 Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond. Simpson is directed to post an appeal bond of $500 to cover taxable costs within seven days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/19/17. (dlg) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

#621

(#631) REPLY to Response to Motion re #624 MOTION for Appeal Bond re #621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 16-18 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/14/2017)

#618

(#637) Joint MOTION to Permit Consummation of the Class Action Settlement Agreement re #619 Judgment,, #618 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#619

(#637) Joint MOTION to Permit Consummation of the Class Action Settlement Agreement re #619 Judgment,, #618 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES, Trump University, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 13039.), filed by Tarla Makaeef.(mtb) (av1). (Entered: 05/03/2010)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to DOES, Trump University, LLC. (jah) (Entered: 05/03/2010)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Amber L. Eck by Plaintiff Tarla Makaeef. (jah) (Entered: 05/03/2010)

4 #2

Proof of Service

4 #1

Exhibits A-F

#4

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Counterclaim. Counter defendant Tarla Makaeff shall have until 6/30/2010 to file a response to the Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/14/2010. (jah) (jrl). (Entered: 06/14/2010)

5 #4

Proof of Service

5 #3

Declaration of Michael Sexton

5 #2

Exhibit 1

1,311 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#638) ORDER Granting Joint #637 Motion to Permit Consummation of the Class Action Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/9/18. (dlg) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#637) Joint MOTION to Permit Consummation of the Class Action Settlement Agreement re #619 Judgment,, #618 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#636) MANDATE of USCA affirming the decision of the USDC as to #621 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (akr) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#635) Payment Received from Sherri B. Simpson in the amount of $ $500.00. Receipt number CAS092233 (Re #632 and #633 ) (dlg) (Entered: 06/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#634) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherri B. Simpson re #633 Notice (Other) (Friedman, Gary) (dlg). (Entered: 06/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#633) NOTICE OF POSTING OF APPEAL BOND by Sherri B. Simpson re #632 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order re Appeal Bond)(Friedman, Gary) QC email missing certificate of service (dlg). (Entered: 06/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#632) ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #624 Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond. Simpson is directed to post an appeal bond of $500 to cover taxable costs within seven days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/19/17. (dlg) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#631) REPLY to Response to Motion re #624 MOTION for Appeal Bond re #621 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit 16-18 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#630) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Helen I. Zeldes by John Brown, J.R. Everett, Sonny Low (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Eck, Amber) (dlg). (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#629) NOTICE of Change of Address by Helen Irene Zeldes (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Zeldes, Helen) (dlg). (Entered: 06/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
574 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES, Trump University, LLC, filed by Tarla Makaeff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Eck, Amber). Modified on 6/17/2010 - Added "First" to text (jah). (Entered: 06/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Counterclaim. Counter defendant Tarla Makaeff shall have until 6/30/2010 to file a response to the Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/14/2010. (jah) (jrl). (Entered: 06/14/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 Counterclaim by Tarla Makaeff. (Eck, Amber). Modified on 6/10/2010 - Edited motion event (jah). (Entered: 06/09/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula M. Roach on behalf of Tarla Makaeff (Roach, Paula). (jah). (Entered: 06/03/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel L Jensen on behalf of Tarla Makaeff (Jensen, Rachel). (jah). (Entered: 06/03/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(6), 9(b), and 8(a)(2) by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Michael Sexton, #4 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). (jah). (Entered: 05/26/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Trial Demand against Tarla Makaeff, filed by Trump University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F, #2 Proof of Service)(Schneider, David). Modified on 5/27/2010 - Edited to add jury demand (jah). (Entered: 05/26/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Amber L. Eck by Plaintiff Tarla Makaeef. (jah) (Entered: 05/03/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to DOES, Trump University, LLC. (jah) (Entered: 05/03/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES, Trump University, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 13039.), filed by Tarla Makaeef.(mtb) (av1). (Entered: 05/03/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trump University, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amber L. Eck