Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2018 at 17:15:11 (UTC).

Krys et al v. Sugrue et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2008 Krys filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Sugrue. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jed S. Rakoff. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:08-CV-03065

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jed S. Rakoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kenneth M Krys

Christopher Stride

The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd.

Defendants

Christopher Pettit

Ingram Micro, Inc.

Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P

David V. Harkings

Coast Asset Management, LLC

William T. Pigott

Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC

Santo Maggio

Bawag P.S.K.

Joseph Collins

Ernst & Young U.S. LLP

Mayer Brown LLP

Thomas H. Lee

Mitchell Karlan

EMF Financial Products LLC

Brian Owens

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hank E Pearson

Attorney at Beus Gilbert PLLC

701 North 44Th Street

Phoenix, AZ 85008

Derrick J. Stomberg

Attorney at Beus Gilbert, P.L.L.C.

4800 North Scottsdale Road, Suite 6000

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Timothy Joseph. Paris

Attorney at Beus Gilbert PLLC

701 North 44Th Street

Phoenix, AZ 85008

Thomas A. Connelly

Attorney at Beus Gilbert PLLC

701 North 44Th Street

Phoenix, AZ 85008

Lowell Richard Williams

Attorney at Beus Gilbert PLLC

701 North 44Th Street

Phoenix, AZ 85008

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald M. Lepinskas

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP (Chicago)

203 North Lasalle, Suite 1900

Chicago, IL 60601

Juliet M. Sarkessian

Attorney at Dechert LLP (PA)

2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Micah E. Marcus

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (IL)

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Annika Marie Goldman

Attorney at Cooley LLP (NY)

1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Daniel Mark Hibshoosh

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Jonathan Paul Bach

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Elizabeth Heering Hickey

Attorney at Latham & Watkins, L.L.P.

One Newark Center

Newark, NJ 07101

Thomas George Ward

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP (DC)

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Mitchell Alan Karlan

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Other Attorneys

Kenneth Yeatts Turnbull

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP (DC)

1152 15Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Linda T. Coberly

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (IL)

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Yelena Shreyberg

Attorney at Dechert, LLP (NYC)

1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-6797

Bradley E. Lerman

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (IL)

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Reed S. Oslan

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (IL)

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Gates Salyers Hurand

Attorney at Commodity Futures Trading Commission(NYC)

140 Broadway, 19Th Flr.

New York, NY 10005

57 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#982

(#982) MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #975 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. USCA Case Number 14-3446(L). Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 08/23/2016. (nd) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

#981

(#981) CORRECTED ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #975 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis USCA Case Number 14-3446(L). The parties have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal with prejudice, without costs or without attorneys' fees, as to Appellees Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, as successor-by-merger to Banc of America Securities LLC, and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, f/k/a Credit Suisse First Boston LLC. The stipulation is hereby so ordered. The appeal shall proceed with respect to the tworemaining appellees. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 06/16/2016. (nd) (Entered: 06/16/2016)

#980

(#980) ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #975 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. USCA Case Number 14-3446(L). The parties have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal with prejudice, without costs or without attorneys' fees, as to Appellees Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, as successor-by-merger to Banc of America Securities LLC, and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, f/k/a Credit Suisse First Boston LLC. The stipulation is hereby so ordered. The appeal shall proceed with respect to the remaining appellee. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 06/15/2016. (nd) (Entered: 06/15/2016)

#979

(#979) ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #975 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. USCA Case Number 14-3446(L), 14-3480(Con). The parties have filed a stipulation pursuant to FRAP 42(b), withdrawing this appeal with prejudice as to Defendants-Appellees Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., THL Managers V LLC, Thomas H. Lee Advisors LLC, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V, L.P., THL Equity Advisors V, LLC,Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, The 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, Thomas H. Lee, David V. Harkins, Scott L. Jaeckel, and Scott A. Schoenthe (collectively, the "THL Appellees"). The stipulation is hereby so ordered. The appeal shall proceed with respect to the remaining appellees. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 11/18/2015. (nd) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

978 #10

Exhibit B

978 #8

Exhibit D

978 #6

Exhibit B

#977

(#977) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADD DOCUMENT TO DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET: THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY AGREED that the attached electronic communication dated May 3, 2010, from Daniel Capra to Helen B. Kim with the following two attachments: As set forth herein. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/10/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ama) (Entered: 12/11/2014)

#975

(#979) ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #975 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. USCA Case Number 14-3446(L), 14-3480(Con). The parties have filed a stipulation pursuant to FRAP 42(b), withdrawing this appeal with prejudice as to Defendants-Appellees Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., THL Managers V LLC, Thomas H. Lee Advisors LLC, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V, L.P., THL Equity Advisors V, LLC,Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, The 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, Thomas H. Lee, David V. Harkins, Scott L. Jaeckel, and Scott A. Schoenthe (collectively, the "THL Appellees"). The stipulation is hereby so ordered. The appeal shall proceed with respect to the remaining appellees. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 11/18/2015. (nd) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

#4

(#6) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION to refer Counts XXIV, XXV and XXVII to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York.. Document filed by Bawag P.S.K., Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft. (Jacoby, Nicolle) (Entered: 04/02/2008)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft.(rdz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2008: #1 PDF) (rdz). (Entered: 03/27/2008)

1 #7

Supplement

1 #6

Supplement

1 #5

Supplement

1 #4

Supplement

1 #3

Supplement

1 #2

Supplement

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 600653-08. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 645910).Document filed by Christopher Stride, Christopher Sugrue, Mark Kavanagh, Brian Owens, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler, Ernst & Young U.S. LLP, Mayer Brown LLP, Joseph Collins, Edward S. Best, Paul Koury, Phillip R. Bennett, Robert C. Trosten, Tone Grant, Santo Maggio, Thomas Hackl, Dennis Klejna, Bawag P.S.K., Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Bank Of America Securities LLC, Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, THL Managers V. LLC, THL Equity Advisors V.L.P, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P, Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, Thomas H. Lee, David V. Harkings, Scott L. Jaeckel, Scott A. Schoen, William T. Pigott, Liberty Corner Capital Strategies, LLC, EMF Financial Products LLC, EMF Core Fund LTD, Delta Flyer Fund LLC, Eric M. Flanagan, Ingram Micro, Inc., CIM Ventures, Inc, Beckenham Trading Co. Inc, Andrew Krieger, Coast Asset Management LP, CS Land Management LLC, Christopher Pettit, Refco Group Holdings Inc., Refco Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement)(rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2008)

2,213 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#982) MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #975 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. USCA Case Number 14-3446(L). Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 08/23/2016. (nd) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#981) CORRECTED ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #975 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis USCA Case Number 14-3446(L). The parties have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal with prejudice, without costs or without attorneys' fees, as to Appellees Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, as successor-by-merger to Banc of America Securities LLC, and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, f/k/a Credit Suisse First Boston LLC. The stipulation is hereby so ordered. The appeal shall proceed with respect to the tworemaining appellees. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 06/16/2016. (nd) (Entered: 06/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#980) ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #975 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. USCA Case Number 14-3446(L). The parties have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal with prejudice, without costs or without attorneys' fees, as to Appellees Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, as successor-by-merger to Banc of America Securities LLC, and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, f/k/a Credit Suisse First Boston LLC. The stipulation is hereby so ordered. The appeal shall proceed with respect to the remaining appellee. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 06/15/2016. (nd) (Entered: 06/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#979) ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #975 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. USCA Case Number 14-3446(L), 14-3480(Con). The parties have filed a stipulation pursuant to FRAP 42(b), withdrawing this appeal with prejudice as to Defendants-Appellees Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., THL Managers V LLC, Thomas H. Lee Advisors LLC, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V, L.P., THL Equity Advisors V, LLC,Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, The 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, Thomas H. Lee, David V. Harkins, Scott L. Jaeckel, and Scott A. Schoenthe (collectively, the "THL Appellees"). The stipulation is hereby so ordered. The appeal shall proceed with respect to the remaining appellees. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 11/18/2015. (nd) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • First Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Supplemental Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #978 Stipulation and Order, #977 Stipulation and Order, #976 Order, USCA Case Number 14-3446, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#978) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADD DOCUMENTS TO DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET: THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY AGREED that the following documents (attached hereto as Exhibits A-D) shall be included in the District Court's docket and the record on appeal: As set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/15/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ama) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2015: #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D) (ama). (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/14/2015. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 04/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#977) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADD DOCUMENT TO DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET: THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY AGREED that the attached electronic communication dated May 3, 2010, from Daniel Capra to Helen B. Kim with the following two attachments: As set forth herein. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/10/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ama) (Entered: 12/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 12/10/2014. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 12/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#976) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the CM/ECF and/or Docketing Clerk shall removeDechert LLP and attorney Nicolle L. Jacoby, as well as former Dechert attorneys Joel H. Levitin, Juliet M. Sarkessian, and Brian Howard Brick from the docket as representing the following defendants (1) Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC; (2) THL Managers V. LLC; (3) THL Equity Advisors V. L.P.; (4) Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P.; (5) Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership; (6) 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust; (7) Thomas H. Lee; (8) David V. Harkins; (9) Scott L. Jaeckel; (10) Scott A. Schoen; (11) Christopher Sugrue; (12) Mark Ramler; (13) Santo Maggio; (14) JPMorgan Chase & Co.; (15) Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FKA Credit Suisse First Boston LLC; (16) Bank of America Securities LLC; (17) EMF Financial Products; (18) EMF Core Fund; (19) Delta Flyer Fund, LLC and (20) Eric M. Flanagan. The appearance by Dechert LLP as counsel for BAWAG is unaffected by this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/03/2014) (ama) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,052 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Molton on behalf of Kenneth M. Krys, Christopher Stride(as Assignees of Clams assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, Arnhold & S. Bleichroeder Advisers LLC et al), James P. Sinclair, Kenneth M Krys, Christopher Stride(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al) (Molton, David) (Entered: 04/04/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Bawag P.S.K., Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft. (Jacoby, Nicolle) (Entered: 04/02/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION to refer Counts XXIV, XXV and XXVII to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York.. Document filed by Bawag P.S.K., Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft. (Jacoby, Nicolle) (Entered: 04/02/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Brian H. Brick in Support re: #4 MOTION to refer Counts XXIV, XXV and XXVII to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York.. Document filed by Bawag P.S.K., Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C PT 1, #4 Exhibit C PT 2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E PT 1, #7 Exhibit E PT 2, #8 Exhibit E PT3, #9 Exhibit E PT 4, #10 Exhibit E PT 5, #11 Exhibit E PT 6, #12 Exhibit F, #13 Exhibit G)(Jacoby, Nicolle) (Entered: 04/02/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to refer Counts XXIV, XXV and XXVII to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York. Document filed by Bawag P.S.K., Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft.(Jacoby, Nicolle) (Entered: 04/02/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: Plaintiffs' claim against BAWAG in the above-captioned actions are largely based upon a number of the same of substantially similar factual allegations involving Refco and its affiliates (and their subsequent bankruptcy) as alleged in a number of other related actions pending in this court. The action also involves many of the same parties to those other Refco-related actions. That this action be filed as related to 05cv8626. Document filed by Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft.(rdz) (Entered: 03/28/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft.(rdz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2008: #1 PDF) (rdz). (Entered: 03/27/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • Case Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Gerald E. Lynch as possibly Related to 05cv8626. (rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 600653-08. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 645910).Document filed by Christopher Stride, Christopher Sugrue, Mark Kavanagh, Brian Owens, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler, Ernst & Young U.S. LLP, Mayer Brown LLP, Joseph Collins, Edward S. Best, Paul Koury, Phillip R. Bennett, Robert C. Trosten, Tone Grant, Santo Maggio, Thomas Hackl, Dennis Klejna, Bawag P.S.K., Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Bank Of America Securities LLC, Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, THL Managers V. LLC, THL Equity Advisors V.L.P, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P, Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, Thomas H. Lee, David V. Harkings, Scott L. Jaeckel, Scott A. Schoen, William T. Pigott, Liberty Corner Capital Strategies, LLC, EMF Financial Products LLC, EMF Core Fund LTD, Delta Flyer Fund LLC, Eric M. Flanagan, Ingram Micro, Inc., CIM Ventures, Inc, Beckenham Trading Co. Inc, Andrew Krieger, Coast Asset Management LP, CS Land Management LLC, Christopher Pettit, Refco Group Holdings Inc., Refco Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement)(rdz) (Entered: 03/27/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAYER BROWN, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where . Harbour is a litigant

Latest cases where Ernst & Young is a litigant

Latest cases where GIBSON DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP is a litigant