Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/27/2015 at 01:01:50 (UTC).

In Re Wellpoint, Inc., Out-of-Network " UCR" Rates Litigation

Case Summary

On 08/20/2009 In Re Wellpoint, Inc , Out-of-Network UCR Rates Litigation was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick F. Mumm and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:09-ML-02074

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Medical Association

American Podiatric Medical Association

H. Bernard

California Chiropractic Association

California Medical Association

California Psychological Association

Connecticut State Medical Society

Mary Cooper

M.D. Stephen D Henry

S. Higashi

D.C. Stephanie Higashi

Hooman M. Melamed, M.D., Inc.

J.B.W.

Medical Association of Georgia

M.D. Hooman Melamed

North Carolina Medical Society

North Peninsula Surgical Center, L.P.

K. O'Brien

V. O'Brien

Michael Pariser

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher M Burke

Attorney at Scott & Scott LLP

4771 Cromwell Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90027

Robert J Axelrod

Attorney at Axelrod & Dean LLP

830 Third Avenue Fl 5

New York, NY 10022

Shehnaz M Bhujwala

Attorney at Boucher, LLP

21600 Oxnard Street, Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Raymond Paul Boucher

Attorney at Boucher, LLP

21600 Oxnard Street, Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

William Tucker Brown

Attorney at Whatley Kallas LLP

2001 Park Place North Suite 1000

Birmingham, AL 35203

Michael C Eyerly

Attorney at Kiesel Boucher Larson LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Martha J Fessenden

Attorney at Doffermyre Shields Canfield & Knowles, LLC

1355 Peachtree Street Ne Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309-3238

Andrew S Friedman

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman and Balint PC

2325 East Camelback Road

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Artin Gholian

Attorney at Kabeteck Kellner LLP

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Joshua H Haffner

Attorney at Kabateck Brown Kellner LLP

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

D Brian Hufford

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

399 Park Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Brian S Kabateck

Attorney at Kabateck Kellner LLP

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Edith M Kallas

Attorney at Whatley Kallas LLP

1180 Avenue Of The Americas 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Richard L Kellner

Attorney at Kabateck Brown Kellner LLP

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Amanda F Lawrence

Attorney at Scott and Scott LLP

156 South Main Street

Colchester, CT 06415

Ilze C Thielmann

Attorney at Whatley Kallas LLP

1180 Avenue Of The Americas 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Maria L Weitz

Attorney at Boucher, LLP

21600 Oxnard Street, Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Joe R Whatley, Jr

Attorney at Whatley Kallas LLP

1180 Avenue Of The Americas, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Helen E Zukin

Attorney at Kiesel Boucher & Larson LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90211-2910

Laurence J Hasson

Attorney at Whatley Drake & Kallas LLC

1540 Broadway 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

62 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#598

(#598) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Reschedule Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Briefing MOTION for Order for Setting Deadlines for Merits Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Proceedings # 594 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: CV events/misc filings/selecting brief.: Document and docket text must match, this document was e-filed as a motion.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so.(Please see attached document for further details.) (dgon) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

#599

(#599) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: MOTION to Reschedule Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Briefing, etc. # 594 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. The document is accepted as filed. Hearing date terminated. (wm) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

#600

(#600) ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR MERITS EXPERT REPORTS, MERITS EXPERT DISCOVERY, AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re MOTION to Reschedule Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Briefing MOTION for Order for Setting Deadlines for Merits Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Proceedings # 594 : Having considered the proposed schedules submitted by the parties regarding deadlines for merits expert reports, merits expert discovery, and summary judgment briefing and in order to facilitate an orderly process for summary judgment briefing consistent with prior Case Management Orders agreed upon by the parties and entered by the Court in this case, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs' merits expert reports shall be served by June 15, 2015; 2. Depositions of Plaintiffs' merits experts shall be completed by July 15, 2015; 3. The WellPoint Defendants' responsive expert reports shall be served by August 14, 2015; 4. Depositions of the WellPoint Defendants' merits experts shall be completed by September 14, 2015; 5. Any motion for summary judgment shall be no longer than 65 pages and shall be filed by October 29, 2015; 6. Any opposition to a summary judgment motion shall be no more than 70 pages and shall be filed by January 12, 2016; 7. Any reply in support of summary judgment shall be no more than 40 pages and shall be filed by February 26, 2016. (bm) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

594 #5

Proof of Service

594 #4

Proposed Order

594 #3

Exhibit B

594 #2

Exhibit A

594 #1

Declaration of Miranda Berge

#594

(#594) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Reschedule Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Briefing , MOTION for Order for Setting Deadlines for Merits Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Proceedings filed by Defendants WellPoint, Wellpoint Health Networks, Inc., Wellpoint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Miranda Berge, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Proof of Service)(Maddigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

#1

(#1) CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation received creating Master Docket MDL 2:09-ml-2074-PSG (CTx), In Re: Wellpoint, Inc., Out-of-Network "UCR" Rates Litigation. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Consolidating Cases: CV 09-1886; CV 09-2039; CV 09-2488 and CV 09-6079. (ghap) (Entered: 08/21/2009)

#2

(#3) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Case Management Order Governing MDL Proceedings re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, # 2 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Case Management Order Governing MDL Proceedings)(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 10/21/2009)

3 #2

Proposed Order [Proposed] Case Management Order Governing MDL Proceedings

#3

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Wellpoint, Inc., Out-of-Network "UCR" Rates Litigation, re Notice of Lodging, # 3 and [Proposed] Case Management Order Governing MDL Proceedings served on October 23, 2009. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 10/23/2009)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Wellpoint, Inc., Out-of-Network "UCR" Rates Litigation, re Notice of Lodging, # 3 and [Proposed] Case Management Order Governing MDL Proceedings served on October 23, 2009. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 10/23/2009)

#5

(#5) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. & INGENIX, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b) (6) FILED 06-25-09 (DOC. 21); DEFENDANTS WELLPOINT, INC. & BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b) (6) FILED 06-25-09 (DOC. 23); REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (DOC. 24) DEFENDANTS UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. & INGENIX, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b) (6) FILED 09-18-09 (DOC. 68) held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that on the Courts own motion, the above-referenced motions set for hearing on Monday, November 2, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. are hereby continued to Monday, November 9, 2009 at 3:30 p.m. (bm) (Entered: 10/28/2009)

#6

(#6) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12 (b) (6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 56 FILED 09-19-09 (DOC. 14) held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that on the Court's own motion, the above-referenced motion set for hearing on Monday, November 2, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby continued to Monday, November 9, 2009 at 3:30 p.m. (bm) (Entered: 10/28/2009)

#7

(#7) PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding Confidential Information (See document for further details) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ir) (Entered: 10/30/2009)

#8

(#8) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Governing MDL Proceedings by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: This Case Management Order shall apply to the above-captioned cases and any future cases that are subsequently filed before this Court or transferred to this Court. A single consolidated complaint shall be filed to govern all of the above captioned cases. All orders, pleadings, motions, and other documents filed in these proceedings shall bear the caption contained in this Order. Plaintiffs shall file and serve any Consolidated Amended Complaint no later than November 2, 2009. (See document for further details). (mg) (Entered: 11/02/2009)

916 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#600) ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR MERITS EXPERT REPORTS, MERITS EXPERT DISCOVERY, AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re MOTION to Reschedule Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Briefing MOTION for Order for Setting Deadlines for Merits Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Proceedings # 594 : Having considered the proposed schedules submitted by the parties regarding deadlines for merits expert reports, merits expert discovery, and summary judgment briefing and in order to facilitate an orderly process for summary judgment briefing consistent with prior Case Management Orders agreed upon by the parties and entered by the Court in this case, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs' merits expert reports shall be served by June 15, 2015; 2. Depositions of Plaintiffs' merits experts shall be completed by July 15, 2015; 3. The WellPoint Defendants' responsive expert reports shall be served by August 14, 2015; 4. Depositions of the WellPoint Defendants' merits experts shall be completed by September 14, 2015; 5. Any motion for summary judgment shall be no longer than 65 pages and shall be filed by October 29, 2015; 6. Any opposition to a summary judgment motion shall be no more than 70 pages and shall be filed by January 12, 2016; 7. Any reply in support of summary judgment shall be no more than 40 pages and shall be filed by February 26, 2016. (bm) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#599) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: MOTION to Reschedule Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Briefing, etc. # 594 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. The document is accepted as filed. Hearing date terminated. (wm) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#598) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Reschedule Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Briefing MOTION for Order for Setting Deadlines for Merits Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Proceedings # 594 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: CV events/misc filings/selecting brief.: Document and docket text must match, this document was e-filed as a motion.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so.(Please see attached document for further details.) (dgon) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#597) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document # 593 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: CV events/misc filings/selecting brief. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (Please see attached document for further details.) (dgon) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#596) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Briefs in Support of Proposed Schedule # 593 , # 594 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below The correct event is: Miscellaneous Filings-Brief (non-motion non-appeal). Other: Docket entry text does not match caption of attached document # 594 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#595) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment and Merits Experts re Miscellaneous Document # 593 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment and Merits Experts)(Boucher, Raymond) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#594) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Reschedule Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Briefing , MOTION for Order for Setting Deadlines for Merits Expert Reports, Expert Discovery and Summary Judgment Proceedings filed by Defendants WellPoint, Wellpoint Health Networks, Inc., Wellpoint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Miranda Berge, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Proof of Service)(Maddigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#593) Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment and Merits Experts (Boucher, Raymond) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#592) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, # 591 . (Please see attached document for details.) (dgon) (Entered: 03/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#591) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Submission of Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment Proceedings filed by Defendants WellPoint, Wellpoint Health Networks, Inc., Wellpoint, Inc., Wellpoint, Inc., Out-of-Network "UCR" Rates Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Second Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Submission of Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment Proceedings)(Maddigan, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
529 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by In Re: Wellpoint, Inc., Out-of-Network "UCR" Rates Litigation of First Consolidated Amended Complaint. (Boucher, Raymond) (Entered: 11/02/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER GOVERNING MDL PROCEEDINGS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: This Case Management Order shall apply to the above-captioned cases and any future cases that are subsequently filed before this Court or transferred to this Court. A single consolidated complaint shall be filed to govern all of the above-captioned cases. All orders, pleadings, motions, and other documents filed in these proceedings shall bear the caption contained in this Order. Plaintiffs shall file and serve any Consolidated Amended Complaint no later than November 2, 2009. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 11/02/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Governing MDL Proceedings by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: This Case Management Order shall apply to the above-captioned cases and any future cases that are subsequently filed before this Court or transferred to this Court. A single consolidated complaint shall be filed to govern all of the above captioned cases. All orders, pleadings, motions, and other documents filed in these proceedings shall bear the caption contained in this Order. Plaintiffs shall file and serve any Consolidated Amended Complaint no later than November 2, 2009. (See document for further details). (mg) (Entered: 11/02/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding Confidential Information (See document for further details) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ir) (Entered: 10/30/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12 (b) (6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 56 FILED 09-19-09 (DOC. 14) held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that on the Court's own motion, the above-referenced motion set for hearing on Monday, November 2, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby continued to Monday, November 9, 2009 at 3:30 p.m. (bm) (Entered: 10/28/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. & INGENIX, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b) (6) FILED 06-25-09 (DOC. 21); DEFENDANTS WELLPOINT, INC. & BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b) (6) FILED 06-25-09 (DOC. 23); REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (DOC. 24) DEFENDANTS UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. & INGENIX, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b) (6) FILED 09-18-09 (DOC. 68) held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that on the Courts own motion, the above-referenced motions set for hearing on Monday, November 2, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. are hereby continued to Monday, November 9, 2009 at 3:30 p.m. (bm) (Entered: 10/28/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Wellpoint, Inc., Out-of-Network "UCR" Rates Litigation, re Notice of Lodging, # 3 and [Proposed] Case Management Order Governing MDL Proceedings served on October 23, 2009. (Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 10/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Case Management Order Governing MDL Proceedings re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, # 2 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Case Management Order Governing MDL Proceedings)(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 10/21/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Proceedings: Setting Status Conference. Please be advised that on the Court's own motion, a Status Conference is hereby set for 11/9/2009 at 03:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Parties shall submit a proposed case management order 14 days before the status conference. The proposed case management order shall be filed under the MDL case: MDL 09-2074-PSG. Parties are reminded that mandatory chambers copies of all electronically filed documents must be delivered directly to Chambers the following business day before Noon. Furthermore, all copies shall include the E-Filed Header and/or the Notice of Electronic Filing. Failure to comply may result in monetary sanctions. (mg) (Entered: 10/01/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation received creating Master Docket MDL 2:09-ml-2074-PSG (CTx), In Re: Wellpoint, Inc., Out-of-Network "UCR" Rates Litigation. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Consolidating Cases: CV 09-1886; CV 09-2039; CV 09-2488 and CV 09-6079. (ghap) (Entered: 08/21/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where North Peninsula Surgical Center, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where California Medical Association is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CHIROPRACTIC ASSOCIATION is a litigant