This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2019 at 21:47:20 (UTC).

In Re: MF Global Holdings Ltd. Investment Litigation

Case Summary

On 04/23/2012 In Re MF Global Holdings Ltd Investment Litigation was filed as a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor Marrero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:12-MD-02338

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor Marrero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniel M Pierce

Joseph Niciforo

Jerome Vrabel

City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement and Palisade Strategic Master Fund (Cayman) Limited

Paul Hamann

Lake Forest, IL 60045

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Robert A. Daly, Jr.

Juan P. Arvelo

PS Energy Group Inc

Thomas G. Moran

Petitioners

Augustus International Master Fund, L.P.

Union Asset Management Holding AG

Defendants

Thomas F. Connolly

Michael G. Stockman

Frederick R. Demler

Richard W Moore

Martin J. Glynn

Bradley Abelow

Rick D. Leesley

Consolidated Defendant

Lebenthal & Co., LLC

95 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward T. Joyce

Attorney at Edward T. Joyce & Associates

11 S. La Salle Street, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60603

Christina H. C. Sharp

Attorney at Girard Sharp LLP

601 California Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94108

Petitioner Attorney

Darren J. Robbins

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP (SANDIEGO)

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas A. Arena

Attorney at Milbank LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Sean Miles Murphy

Attorney at Milbank LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Lisamarie Frances Collins

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo PC

666 Third Avenue, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Craig Louis Siegel

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Other Attorneys

Steven Peter Winter

Attorney at Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Lee S Richards, III

Attorney at Richards Kibbe & Orbe LLP (NYC)

200 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10281-1003

Brett Gerald Canna

Attorney at Robinson McDonald & Canna LLP

61 Broadway, Suite 1415

New York, NY 10006

Neil Stephen Binder

Attorney at Binder & Schwartz LLP

366 Madison Avenue, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Stephen William Tountas

Attorney at Bleichmar Fonti Tountas & Auld LLP

7 Times Square, 27Th Fl

New York, NY 10036

Salvatore Jo Graziano

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Hannah Elizabeth Ross

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Laura Steinberg

Attorney at Sullivan & Worcester LLP (MA)

One Post Office Square

Boston, MA 02109

James P. Cusick

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP (NYC)

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Jeffrey R. Krinsk

Attorney at Finkelstein & Krinsk, LLP

501 West Broadway, Suite 1250

San Diego, CA 92101

Andrew J. Levander

Attorney at Dechert, LLP (NYC)

1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-6797

Sean K. O'Dowd

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

107 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#173

#172

#171

#170

163 #1

Exhibit A (Proposed Order)

#163

#148

#120

#111

#6

#5

#4

3 #3

Exhibit C

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

#2

#1

237 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#173) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER withdrawing (1115) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/3/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF (anc) (Entered: 03/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#172) NOTICE of Voluntary Withdrawal of Fee Motion with Prejudice re: #163 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator. (Rue, Jane) (Entered: 03/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#171) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, Customer Class Counsel are not entitled to additional attorneys fees under the JPMorgan Settlement, the Net Equity Settlement Assignment, or the CME Settlement. Furthermore, the Allocation Agreement describes the amount of the common fund from which Customer Class Counsel's fees shall be paid. The Plan Administrator shall promptly release $1,537,521.33 as reimbursement for Customer Class Counsel's litigation expenses to Customer Class Counsel as outlined in Paragraph 8 of the Global Settlement. Finally, within seven days, Customer Class Counsel shall file publicly a copy of the November 2, 2016 Letter of Merrill G. Davidoff and Andrew J. Entwistle as required by footnote 15 of this Memorandum and Order. A conference will be held on February 16, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 18-D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. (As further set forth in this Memorandum and Order.) ( Status Conference set for 2/16/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/2/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF Copies Sent By Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 02/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#170) CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DISPOSITION ON MOTION re (1115 in 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF) MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion by Customer Counsel for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, with Proposed Order as Exhibit A. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/6/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(kgo) (Entered: 01/06/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#169) ORDER granting #148 Motion of Jeffrey C. Jarvis to Withdraw as Attorney. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis)(Text Only Order) (Francis, James) (Entered: 12/23/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#168) ORDER denying as moot #120 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis)(Text Only Order) (Francis, James) (Entered: 12/23/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#167) ORDER denying as moot #111 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis)(Text Only Order) (Francis, James) (Entered: 12/23/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#166) FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Customer Class Action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Settlement Fund, as defined and provided for in the Settlement Agreement, is approved. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(kgo) (Entered: 10/18/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#165) FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Litigation Trust Action is dismissed with prejudice. The Settlement Agreement is approved, solely with respect to the settlement of the Litigation Trust Action, and without prejudice to approval of other settlements or compromises contained therein, including, without limitation, the Settlement Fund established thereby. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/30/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02338-VM, 1:11-cv-07866-VM-JCF(ama) (Entered: 09/30/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#164) JUDGMENT AND FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Sapere Action is dismissed with prejudice. 2. The Settlement Agreement, solely with respect to the settlement of the Sapere Action, and without prejudice to approval of other settlements or compromises contained therein, is approved. 3. In the event that the Settlement Agreement terminates according to its terms prior to the Effective Date (as defined in the Settlement Agreement), this Judgment and Order of Dismissal shall be rendered null and void and shall be vacated. 4. Without affecting the finality of this Judgment in any way, the Court retains continuing jurisdiction over: (i) the administration and consummation of the Settlement as to the Sapere Action and (ii) the entry of orders relating to matters addressed in the Settlement Agreement as co settlement of the Sapere Action. 5. There is no just reason for delay in the entry of this Judgment and immediate entry by the Clerk of Court is expressly directed pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/30/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 09/30/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
179 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF MDL ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER... that the stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as CTO-1, filed on 4/27/2012, is LIFTED and the action is transferred to the S.D.N.Y. for the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable Victor Marrero. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/15/2012) (sjo) (Entered: 05/16/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-03589-VM, 1:12-md-02338-VM (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo) (Entered: 05/10/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-03588-VM, 1:12-md-02338-VM (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10-31-2012) (sjo) (Entered: 05/10/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-1) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Illinois and Montana, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/7/2012) (sjo) (Entered: 05/07/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM OF LAW Brief In Further Support Of The Consensus Leadership Groups Motion Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. 23(G) To Be Appointed As Interim Class Counsel And In Response To The Supplemental Brief Submitted By Counsel For Plaintiffs Davide Accomazzo And Robert E. Calle Gracey. Document filed by Paradigm Global Fund I Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Entwistle, Andrew) (Entered: 04/27/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo) (Entered: 04/24/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketCASES ORIGINATING FROM THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: 1:11-cv-07866 (VM), 1:11-cv-09114 (VM). (sjo) (Entered: 04/24/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sjo) (Entered: 04/24/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (sjo) (Entered: 04/24/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of New York, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/23/2012) (sjo) (Entered: 04/24/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Augustus International Master Fund, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lebenthal & Co., LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Asset Management Holding AG is a litigant