Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2019 at 22:35:06 (UTC).

In Re: DRD Towing Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 In Re DRD Towing Company, Inc was filed as a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Ivan L.R. Lemelle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:08-CV-04261

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Laurin Maritime AB

Claimants

Steve Adams

Randy White, Sr.

Dedrick T. Lebeau

Fabian F. Zeringue

Sterling C. Anderson

Robert Jackson

Dorian Sippio

Erica L. Boudreaux

Frankcard Goodjoint, Sr.

Linda C. Davis

Guatam Rumar Sau

Crayton A. Martin

Enos Jones

Dwayne V. Burrell

Kenneth Black

Stephen Marshall Gabarick

Marco Hunt

Regional Broussard

Wendell Bailey

247 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

David B. Lawton

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP (New Orleans)

365 Canal St., Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

Hugh Ramsay Straub

Attorney at Hugh Ramsay Straub, Attorney at Law

7919 Jeannette Place

New Orleans, LA 70118-4069

Claimant Attorneys

Darryl James Becnel

Attorney at Becnel Law Firm, LLC (Reserve)

Post Office Drawer H

Reserve, LA 70084

Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.

Attorney at Becnel Law Firm, LLC (Reserve)

Post Office Drawer H

Reserve, LA 70084

Kevin Patrick Klibert

Attorney at Becnel Law Firm, LLC (Reserve)

Post Office Drawer H

Reserve, LA 70084

Camilo Kossy Salas, III

Attorney at Salas & Co., LC

650 Poydras St., Suite 1660

New Orleans, LA 70130

Other Attorneys

Wilton Ellwood Bland, III

Attorney at Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett, LLC

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4250

New Orleans, LA 70139

Joshua L. Rubenstein

Attorney at Blake Jones Law Firm, LLC

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4100

New Orleans, LA 70139

Matthew F. Popp

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons (New Orleans)

650 Poydras St., Suite 2105

New Orleans, LA 70130

William P. Wynne

Attorney at Jones Walker (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Robert Taylor Lemon, II

Attorney at Jones Walker (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jacques P. DeGruy

Attorney at Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2250

New Orleans, LA 70163

Clarence William Emory

101 Louise Drive

Mandeville, LA 70448

Patrick E. Costello

Attorney at Miller Hahn, PLLC

365 Canal St., Suite 2

New Orleans, LA 70130

Elizabeth M. Gaudin

Attorney at Gaudin & Gaudin

1088 Fourth Street

Gretna, LA 70053

John F. Emmett

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons (New Orleans)

650 Poydras St., Suite 2105

New Orleans, LA 70130

Glenn Gill Goodier

Attorney at Jones Walker (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Eraka W. DeLarge

Attorney at City Attorney's Office (New Orleans)

1300 Perdido Street, Suite 7E05

New Orleans, LA 70112

Lance Michael Sannino

Attorney at Jones Walker (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

David Christopher Whitmore

Attorney at Blake Jones Law Firm, LLC

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4100

New Orleans, LA 70139

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 2/3/2014; Ordered that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. USCA judge name: JOLLY, SOUTHWICK, HAYNES. (lag, ) (Entered: 03/10/2014)

#24

(#24) JUDGMENT entered in favor of Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited, Laurin Maritime (America) Inc., Laurin Maritime AB, Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited against D.R.D. Towing Company, L.L.C. and the MV Mel Oliver, and D.R.D. and the MV Mel Oliver are liable to and shall pay respective stipulated recoverable damages, plus interest and costs, as set forth in record document number 1368 . All claims by D.R.D. against TINTOMARA interests and ACL are dismissed; All claims by D.R.D. for the benefit of limitation of liability are rejected and dismissed; All claims by TINTOMARA interests against ACL and all claims by ACL against TINTOMARA interests are dismissed; and All claims by John Bavaret are rejected and dismissed. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Reference: 08-4023, 08-4046, 08-4261, 08-4600)(ijg, ) (Entered: 09/29/2012)

#23

(#23) USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 9/1/11 as to #16 Notice of Appeal, #15 Notice of Appeal, #14 Notice of Appeal. ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed in part and dismissed in part. USCA judge name: Higginbotham, Owen and Haynes. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1373). (mmv, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)

#22

(#22) Appeal Record Returned (original exhibits and/or non-electronic documents) from U.S. Court of Appeals: #13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #12 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1372). (mmv, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF APPEAL by DRD Towing Company, Inc.. (gec, ) (Entered: 08/21/2009)

#15

(#23) USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 9/1/11 as to #16 Notice of Appeal, #15 Notice of Appeal, #14 Notice of Appeal. ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed in part and dismissed in part. USCA judge name: Higginbotham, Owen and Haynes. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1373). (mmv, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)

#14

(#23) USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 9/1/11 as to #16 Notice of Appeal, #15 Notice of Appeal, #14 Notice of Appeal. ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed in part and dismissed in part. USCA judge name: Higginbotham, Owen and Haynes. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1373). (mmv, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)

#13

(#17) ORDER of USCA dismissing #12 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, by Clerk. (lag, ) (Entered: 10/26/2009)

#12

(#17) ORDER of USCA dismissing #12 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, by Clerk. (lag, ) (Entered: 10/26/2009)

#7

(#7) Legal NOTICE of advertisement. (car, ) (Entered: 10/17/2008)

#6

(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby for all further proceedings. Judge Eldon E. Fallon, Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/10/08.(dno, ) (Entered: 09/15/2008)

#5

(#5) CLAIM AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint in Limitation of D.R.D. Towing Co., Inc. by American Commercial Lines LLC.(Goodier, Glenn) (Entered: 09/15/2008)

4 #1

Notice to Claimants

#4

(#4) ORDER approving Ad Interim Stipulation, directing issuance of notice, and restraining prosecution of claims; Notice to file claims on or before 12/1/08. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/26/08. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants)(dno, ) (Entered: 08/29/2008)

#3

(#3) AD INTERIM STIPULATION by DRD Towing Company, Inc. (dno, ) (Entered: 08/29/2008)

#2

(#2) STIPULATION for costs by DRD Towing Company, Inc. (dno, ) (Entered: 08/29/2008)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Claim by David Elliot LeBlanc.(Whitmore, David) (Entered: 11/07/2008)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 2/3/2014; Ordered that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. USCA judge name: JOLLY, SOUTHWICK, HAYNES. (lag, ) (Entered: 03/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) JUDGMENT entered in favor of Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited, Laurin Maritime (America) Inc., Laurin Maritime AB, Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited against D.R.D. Towing Company, L.L.C. and the MV Mel Oliver, and D.R.D. and the MV Mel Oliver are liable to and shall pay respective stipulated recoverable damages, plus interest and costs, as set forth in record document number 1368 . All claims by D.R.D. against TINTOMARA interests and ACL are dismissed; All claims by D.R.D. for the benefit of limitation of liability are rejected and dismissed; All claims by TINTOMARA interests against ACL and all claims by ACL against TINTOMARA interests are dismissed; and All claims by John Bavaret are rejected and dismissed. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Reference: 08-4023, 08-4046, 08-4261, 08-4600)(ijg, ) (Entered: 09/29/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 9/1/11 as to #16 Notice of Appeal, #15 Notice of Appeal, #14 Notice of Appeal. ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed in part and dismissed in part. USCA judge name: Higginbotham, Owen and Haynes. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1373). (mmv, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Appeal Record Returned (original exhibits and/or non-electronic documents) from U.S. Court of Appeals: #13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #12 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1372). (mmv, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 9/1/11 as to #12 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed in part and dismissed in part. USCA judge name: Higginbotham, Owen and Haynes. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1371). (mmv, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 1/21/2011 as to #18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court is reversed and the cause is remanded for further proceedings; USCA judge name: KING, STEWART, OWEN. (lag, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MEMORANDUM of USCA - the court has granted appellant's motions to reinstate these appeals re: #13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited, Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited, Laurin Maritime AB, #12 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by American Commercial Lines LLC (plh, ) (Entered: 04/15/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by American Commercial Lines, Inc. (from Master Case, CA 08-4007, doc. no. 852). (lag, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER of USCA dismissing #12 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, by Clerk. (lag, ) (Entered: 10/26/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE OF APPEAL by DRD Towing Company, Inc.. (gec, ) (Entered: 08/21/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER - Create association to 2:08-cv-04007-LMA-KWR as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk.(car, ) (Entered: 11/13/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Claim by David Elliot LeBlanc.(Whitmore, David) (Entered: 11/07/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Legal NOTICE of advertisement. (car, ) (Entered: 10/17/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Legal NOTICE of advertisement. (car, ) (Entered: 10/17/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby for all further proceedings. Judge Eldon E. Fallon, Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/10/08.(dno, ) (Entered: 09/15/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLAIM AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint in Limitation of D.R.D. Towing Co., Inc. by American Commercial Lines LLC.(Goodier, Glenn) (Entered: 09/15/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER approving Ad Interim Stipulation, directing issuance of notice, and restraining prosecution of claims; Notice to file claims on or before 12/1/08. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/26/08. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants)(dno, ) (Entered: 08/29/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AD INTERIM STIPULATION by DRD Towing Company, Inc. (dno, ) (Entered: 08/29/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STIPULATION for costs by DRD Towing Company, Inc. (dno, ) (Entered: 08/29/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT-IN-LIMITATION (Filing fee $ 350) filed by DRD Towing Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dno, ) (Entered: 08/29/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua L. Rubenstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew F. Popp

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William P. Wynne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilton Ellwood Bland, III