Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2019 at 00:44:58 (UTC).

IN RE: Brican America LLC Equipment Lease Litigation

Case Summary

On 08/12/2010 IN RE Brican America LLC Equipment Lease Litigation was filed as a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Seitz and Andrea M. Simonton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:10-MD-02183

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patricia A. Seitz

Referral Judge

Andrea M. Simonton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Counter Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

Philippe Morisseau

Amir Khoshnevis

Marc Flesher

Miguel Pulido

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Edward Busch

OD Steven Wigdor

Benjamin Gamm

James L. Carazola, D.M.D., P.A.

Chanbo Sim

Signature Smiles, PC

John Sherer

Consolidated Defendant

Jean Francois Vincens

3Rd Party Defendants and Counter Defendants

Dr. Sean Rankin

Dr. Joan Dreher

Philippe Morisseau

Dr. Eric S Smith

Dr. Randal Smith

Amir Khoshnevis

Dr. Reza Birjandi

Dr. Sandra Barker

Marc Flesher

Miguel Pulido

Dr. David Weigle

Dr. Charles F Pike

908 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Consolidated Plaintiff, Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

David H. Charlip

Attorney at Charlip Law Group, LLC

11900 Biscayne Blvd., Suite 200

Miami, FL 33181

Ronald Pendl Gossett

Building I, 4700 Sheridan Street

Hollywood, FL 33021

Robert Alan Selig

Attorney at Law Office of Robert A. Selig, P.A.

350 Camino Gardens Blvd, Suite 301

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Rowan Keenan

Attorney at Keenan, Ciccitto & Associates

376 E. Main Street

Collegeville, PA 19426

Consolidated Defendant Attorney

Alan Samuel Fine

Attorney at Alan S. Fine, P.A.

255 Aragon Avenue, 2Nd Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Other Attorneys

Harvey D. Rogers

Courthouse Plaza, Suite 500, 28 W Flagler Street

Miami, FL 33130-1891

Ryan J. Larsen

Attorney at Katten Muchen Rosenman LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90035

John Russell Kelso

Attorney at Levey Filler Rodriguez Kelso & De Bianchi LLP

1688 Meridian Avenue, Suite 902

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Jeffrey Filipovits

2900 Chamblee Tucker Road, Park Ridge 85, Building One

Alanta, GA 30341

Jeff Tomberg

Attorney at Tomberg & Halper, LLC

626 Se 4Th Street, Po Box 1426

Boynton Beach, FL 33425

Nicholas S. Shantar

Attorney at Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory and Natsis

1900 Main Street, 5Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614-7321

Mendy Halberstam

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

One Biscayne Tower, Two South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 3500

Miami, FL 33131

Michael I. Verde

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

575 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022-2585

Robert L. Switkes

Attorney at Robert L. Switkes & Associates, P.A.

407 Lincoln Road, Penthouse Se

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Catherine Magdalena Rodriguez

1688 Meridian Avenue, Suite 900

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Scott A. Resnik

Attorney at Katten, Muchin & Rosenman, LLP

575 Madison Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Keith A. McKenna

Attorney at MCKENNA MCLLWAIN LLP

96 Park Street

Montclair, NJ 07042

Regina Franco-Murphey

Attorney at Rosen Switkes & Entin PL

407 Lincoln Road, Penthouse Se

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Patrick M. Northen

Attorney at Dilworth Paxson LLP

1500 Market Street, Suite 3500 East

Philadelphia, PA 19102-2101

Elior Daniel Shiloh

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 220

Florham Park, NJ 07932

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#719

(#719) ORDER Granting in part #707 Motion for Appellate Fees. ORDERED that the Blauzvern Appellants' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Newman Appellees' Application for Attorney's Fees [jointly filed at DE-707] are GRANTED in part: 1. The Blauzvern Appellees are awarded $118,650.00 in appellate attorneys fees and $1,503.93 in appellate expenses. 2. The Wigdor Appellees are awarded $52,583.75 in appellate attorneys' fees and $1,234.59 in appellate expenses. **See Order for full details** Signed by Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 8/10/2017. (gp) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

#718

(#718) TRANSCRIPT of Fee Hearing held on 7-18-2017 before Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz, 1-40 pages, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5294 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2017. (gbx) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

#717

(#717) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2017 re #707 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5294 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (dgj) (Entered: 07/18/2017)

#716

(#716) NOTICE of Compliance with Directive Regarding Necessity of Hearing by Donald Newman re 713 Order,, (Charlip, David) (Entered: 07/17/2017)

#715

(#715) NOTICE of Compliance with Directive Regarding Necessity of Hearing by NCMIC and PSFS 3 re 713 Order,, (Rodriguez, Catherine) (Entered: 07/17/2017)

#714

(#714) NOTICE of Compliance with DE 713 by Dr. Peter Blauzvern re 713 Order,, (Gossett, Ronald) (Entered: 07/17/2017)

#712

(#712) NOTICE of Compliance addressing issue contained in Order DE 709 by Peter M. Blauzvern DDS PC re #709 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Gossett, Ronald) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

#710

(#710) Unopposed MOTION to Continue re #709 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, by Donald Newman. Responses due by 6/22/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Charlip, David) (Entered: 06/08/2017)

#709

(#710) Unopposed MOTION to Continue re #709 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, by Donald Newman. Responses due by 6/22/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Charlip, David) (Entered: 06/08/2017)

#707

(#711) ORDER Granting #710 Motion to Continue. Re: #707 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing reset for 7/18/2017 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz. Signed by Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 6/14/2017. (gp) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

#9

(#9) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern District of Georgia, Case Number 1:10-1807 Stuart Tasman, et al. v. Brican America, Inc., et al., with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 09/13/2010)

8 #1

Panel Service List

#8

(#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case, to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL Case No. 10-MD-2183 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to Judge Patricia A. Seitz. (Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman of the Panel) (Attachments: #1 Panel Service List) (gp) (Entered: 09/13/2010)

#4

(#4) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of New Jersey, Case Number 2:10-1173 Dr. Frank Derienzo v. Brican America, LLC, et al., with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 08/16/2010)

#3

(#3) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Central District of California, Case Number 8:10-453 Vijay Patel, et al. v. NCMIC Finance Corp., et al., with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 08/16/2010)

#2

(#2) Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (gp) (Entered: 08/13/2010)

1 #1

Panel Service List

#1

(#1) TRANSFER ORDER (Dated 08/12/2010) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL Case No. 10-MD-2183 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to Judge Patricia A. Seitz. (Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman of the Panel) (Attachments: #1 Panel Service List) (gp) (Entered: 08/13/2010)

1,436 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#719) ORDER Granting in part #707 Motion for Appellate Fees. ORDERED that the Blauzvern Appellants' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Newman Appellees' Application for Attorney's Fees [jointly filed at DE-707] are GRANTED in part: 1. The Blauzvern Appellees are awarded $118,650.00 in appellate attorneys fees and $1,503.93 in appellate expenses. 2. The Wigdor Appellees are awarded $52,583.75 in appellate attorneys' fees and $1,234.59 in appellate expenses. **See Order for full details** Signed by Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 8/10/2017. (gp) (Entered: 08/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#718) TRANSCRIPT of Fee Hearing held on 7-18-2017 before Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz, 1-40 pages, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5294 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2017. (gbx) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#717) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2017 re #707 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5294 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (dgj) (Entered: 07/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#716) NOTICE of Compliance with Directive Regarding Necessity of Hearing by Donald Newman re 713 Order,, (Charlip, David) (Entered: 07/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#715) NOTICE of Compliance with Directive Regarding Necessity of Hearing by NCMIC and PSFS 3 re 713 Order,, (Rodriguez, Catherine) (Entered: 07/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#714) NOTICE of Compliance with DE 713 by Dr. Peter Blauzvern re 713 Order,, (Gossett, Ronald) (Entered: 07/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • (#713) ORDER The Court has not heard from the parties as to whether they have been able to resolve the appellate attorneys' fees issue in this matter. Given the Plaintiffs' recent filing [DE-712] and the Defendants' lack of response, it appears that the only issue remaining for determination is the appropriate amount of fees to award. A hearing is not required for such a determination. Consequently, the Court asks that the parties notify it by noon on July 17, 2017 whether they feel that the July 18, 2017 Attorneys' Fee hearing is still necessary. Signed by Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 7/13/2017. (cbn) (Entered: 07/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#712) NOTICE of Compliance addressing issue contained in Order DE 709 by Peter M. Blauzvern DDS PC re #709 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Gossett, Ronald) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#711) ORDER Granting #710 Motion to Continue. Re: #707 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing reset for 7/18/2017 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz. Signed by Senior Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 6/14/2017. (gp) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#710) Unopposed MOTION to Continue re #709 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, by Donald Newman. Responses due by 6/22/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Charlip, David) (Entered: 06/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
717 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2010
  • (#10) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from New Jersey; Case Number 2:10-cv-01173. Electronic file consisting of documents 1-14. Assigned Case No. 1:10-cv-22973-PAS on 8/18/2010. In Re: MDL Conditional Transfer Order at DE # (1 in 1:10-md-02183-PAS). See Docket Sheet at DE # (15 in 1:10-cv-22973-PAS). (gp) (Entered: 09/14/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern District of Georgia, Case Number 1:10-1807 Stuart Tasman, et al. v. Brican America, Inc., et al., with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 09/13/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case, to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL Case No. 10-MD-2183 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to Judge Patricia A. Seitz. (Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman of the Panel) (Attachments: #1 Panel Service List) (gp) (Entered: 09/13/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • (#7) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from California Central; Case Number 8:10-cv-00453. Electronic file consisting of documents numbered 1-28. Assigned Case # 1:10-cv-22959-PAS on 8/17/2010. re: SDFL MDL Conditional Transfer Order at DE # (1 in 1:10-md-02183-PAS). See Docket Sheet at DE # (29 in 1:10-cv-22959-PAS). (gp) (Entered: 09/13/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • (#6) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida; Case No. 1:10-cv-21608-PAS. Original file with documents 1-47. re: SDFL MDL Case No. 1:10-md-02183. (gp) (Entered: 09/07/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • (#5) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida; Case No. 1:10-cv-20782-PAS. Original file with documents 1-56. re: SDFL MDL Case No. 1:10-md-02183. (gp) (Entered: 08/27/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of New Jersey, Case Number 2:10-1173 Dr. Frank Derienzo v. Brican America, LLC, et al., with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 08/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Central District of California, Case Number 8:10-453 Vijay Patel, et al. v. NCMIC Finance Corp., et al., with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 08/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (gp) (Entered: 08/13/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRANSFER ORDER (Dated 08/12/2010) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL Case No. 10-MD-2183 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to Judge Patricia A. Seitz. (Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman of the Panel) (Attachments: #1 Panel Service List) (gp) (Entered: 08/13/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan J. Larsen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick M. Northen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harvey D. Rogers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elior Daniel Shiloh