Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/28/2019 at 18:33:13 (UTC).

In re: 650 Fifth Avenue and Related Properties

Case Summary

On 12/17/2008 In re 650 Fifth Avenue and Related Properties was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Loretta A. Preska. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:08-CV-10934

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Loretta A. Preska

 

Party Details

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Tova Ettinger

Elena Rozenman

Claimants, Intervenor Defendants and Interested Parties

Estate of Peter J. Morgera, deceased

Gregg Salzman

Babak Bayani

John E. Adams

Gary Heiser

Shawn M. Wood

Khoshkish Family Members

william r higgins

Katie L. Marthaler

Thomas Morgera

Jessica F. Lester

Bridget Brooks

William Adams

650 Fifth Avenue Company

Paul D. Fennig

Michael Morgera

Marie R. Campbell

Defendants, Intervenor Defendants, Interested Parties and Claimants

All Right, Title And Interest In 4836 Marconi Avenue

650 Fifth Avenue Company

155 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant and Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Joseph Tolchin

Attorney at The Berkman Law Office, LLC

111 Livingston Street, Suite 1928

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Peter R. Kolker

Attorney at Zuckerman, Spaeder, Goldstein

1800 M Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Aitan D. Goelman

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

1800 M Street, N.W

Washington, DC 20036

Claimant, Consolidated Plaintiff and Interested Party Attorneys

Richard Marc Kremen

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP (MD)

6225 Smith Avenue

Baltimore, MD 21209

Robert Joseph Tolchin

Attorney at The Berkman Law Office, LLC

111 Livingston Street, Suite 1928

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Daniel Seth Ruzumna

Attorney at Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

John Gleeson

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Claimant, Defendant and Interested Party Attorneys

Daniel Seth Ruzumna

Attorney at Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

John Gleeson

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Muhammad Usman Faridi

Attorney at Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Other Attorneys

Jason Harris Cowley

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office, SDNY

One St. Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

John Peter Cronan

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office, SDNY (St Andw's)

One St. Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Peter I Livingston

Attorney at Rose & Livingston

275 Madison Ave., Suite 500

New York, NY 10016

Michael Dennis Lockard

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, SDNY

One Saint Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Deborah Beth Koplovitz

Attorney at Rosen Livingston & Cholst LLP

275 Madison Avenue, Suite 500

New York, NY 10016

Ralph Paul Dupont

Attorney at The Dupont Law Firm, LLP

1177 High Ridge Road

Stamford, CT 06905

Scott Christopher Speier

11300 Rockville Pike, Suite 112

Rockville, NY 20852

Liviu Vogel

Attorney at Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman BroudyLLP

292 Madison Ave, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Robert M. Foote

Attorney at Foote, Meyers, Mielke, Flowers & Solano

10 W State Street, Suite 200

Geneva, IL 60134

James McCoy

Attorney at Mellon & Webster, P.C

87 N. Broad Street

Doylestown, PA 18901

Anand Sithian

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office For The Southern District of New

One St. Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Douglas James McNamara

Attorney at Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C.,

1100 New York Avenue, N.W.,, West Tower

Washington, DC 20005-3964

Sharon Cohen Levin

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP (NYC)

7 World Trade Center

New York, NY 10007

70 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1125

No Description Available

#865

No Description Available

#828

No Description Available

#512

No Description Available

#286

No Description Available

#228

No Description Available

#206

No Description Available

#163

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#1142

No Description Available

#2025

No Description Available

#1992

No Description Available

1418 #1

Proposed Order

#1294

No Description Available

1287 #12

Exhibit L Part 1

1287 #6

Exhibit F

#242

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

3,676 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2113) ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Daniel S. Ruzumna dated 12/5/2018 re: the Fifth Avenue Company will request the Trustee's permission to make a payment from its accounts in the amount of $17,314. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/11/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2112) ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kathleen A. Roberts dated 9/6/2018 re: Request that the Court approve payment of the fees. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/10/2018) (jca) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Katherine B. Forrest is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • (#2111) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2110) ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Kathleen A. Roberts dated 6/19/2018 re: request that the Court approve payment of the fees incurred by me as Court-appointed Monitor. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/19/2018) (ne) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2108) ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Michael Lockard dated 5/8/2018 re: request to file Thirty-First Quarterly Monitor's Report under seal. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered. Filed under seal. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/18/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2109) MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (2105 in case 8cv10934) Letter, filed by 650 Fifth Avenue Company, Alavi Foundation. ENDORSEMENT: With no objection from the Government, the relief requested in the letter at ECF #2104 is granted. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/20/2018) (ap) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-10934-KBF et al. (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2107) MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #2105 Letter, filed by 650 Fifth Avenue Company, Alavi Foundation. ENDORSEMENT: With no objection from the Government, the relief requested in the letter at ECF #2104 is granted. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/20/2018) (ap) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2106) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (2104 in 1:08-cv-10934-KBF) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Daniel S. Ruzumna dated 4/19/2018 re: Request for the Court to unseal certain documents filed under seal for the purposes of the Joint Appendix in the appeal. Document filed by 650 Fifth Avenue Company, Alavi Foundation. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered. Does the Government have a position? (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/20/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-10934-KBF et al., as per Chambers. (rjm) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2105) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Daniel S. Ruzumna dated April 19, 2018 re: previously-sealed documents. Document filed by Alavi Foundation, 650 Fifth Avenue Company, Alavi Foundation, Alavi Foundation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-10934-KBF et al.(Ruzumna, Daniel) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2,263 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by letter to Court. Document filed by Assa Corp. (Livingston, Peter) Modified on 1/22/2009 (db). (Entered: 01/21/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter I Livingston on behalf of Assa Corp. (Livingston, Peter) (Entered: 01/21/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLAIM FOR SHARES IN CORPORATION. Document filed by Assa Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Verification)(Livingston, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Assa Corp..(Livingston, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Peter Cronan on behalf of United States of America (Cronan, John) (Entered: 01/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) POST-COMPLAINT PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C 983 (j)(1)...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/17/08) (tro) (Entered: 12/18/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • Case Designated ECF. (tro) (Entered: 12/18/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton is so designated. (tro) (Entered: 12/18/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to All funds formerly on deposit at Citibank, N.A.(New York, New York, in Account Number 888165552, in the name of ASSA Corporation and all funds traceable thereto), All funds formerly on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Baton Rouge, Louisiana, in Account Number 2724409590, in the name of ASSA Corporation, and all funds traceable thereto), All funds formerly on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Baton Rouge, Louisiana, in Account Number 725700280, in the name of ASSA Corporation, and all funds traceable thereto), All Right, Title, and Interest of ASSA Corporation, ASSA Company Limited, Bank Melli Iran in 650 Fifth Avenue Company, All funds formerly on deposit at Citibank, N.A.(New York, New York, in Account Number 78429712, in the name of ASSA Corporation and all funds traceable thereto). (tro) (Entered: 12/18/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All funds formerly on deposit at Citibank, N.A.(New York, New York, in Account Number 888165552, in the name of ASSA Corporation and all funds traceable thereto), All funds formerly on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Baton Rouge, Louisiana, in Account Number 2724409590, in the name of ASSA Corporation, and all funds traceable thereto), All funds formerly on deposit at JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Baton Rouge, Louisiana, in Account Number 725700280, in the name of ASSA Corporation, and all funds traceable thereto), All Right, Title, and Interest of ASSA Corporation, ASSA Company Limited, Bank Melli Iran in 650 Fifth Avenue Company, All funds formerly on deposit at Citibank, N.A.(New York, New York, in Account Number 78429712, in the name of ASSA Corporation and all funds traceable thereto). Document filed by United States of America.(tro) (Entered: 12/18/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where All Right, Title And Interest In 4836 Marconi Avenue is a litigant

Latest cases where 650 Fifth Avenue Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharon Cohen Levin