This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/18/2022 at 06:30:18 (UTC).

HOWARD v. RAYMARK INDUSTRIES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2012 HOWARD filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against RAYMARK INDUSTRIES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Roger W Titus. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:12-CV-01631

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roger W Titus

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Severn J. Howard

Karen Cannon

Defendant

The Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Amato, IV

Defendant Attorneys

John Andrew Singer

Michelle Noorani

Warren N Weaver

 

Court Documents

39 #1

*Restricted*

39 #39

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#38

(#38) STIPULATION Rule 10.4(a) Stipulation by THE FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (NOORANI, MICHELLE) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 1/26/2011 (md). (Entered: 01/25/2011)

#37

(#37) Copy of Conditional Remand Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that all claims in the actions on this order except the severed damages claims be remanded to their respective transferor courts. (See Paper # 7607 in 01-md-875). (tjd) (Entered: 01/20/2011)

#36

(#36) ORDER THAT THIS COURT FINDS THAT THIS CASE IS PREPARED FOR TRIAL WITHOUT DELAY ONCE ON THE TRANSFEROR COURTS DOCKET. THE REMAINING DEFENDANTS IN THIS CASE TO PROCEED TO TRIAL ARE LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A" ATTACHED. BANKRUPT DEFENDANTS, AGAINST WHICH PROCEEDINGS ARE STAYED ARE LISTED IN EXHIBIT "B" ATTACHED. THAT THIS COURT SUGGESTS THAT THIS CASE SHOULD BE REMANDED TO THE U.S.D.C. OF M.D. FOR RESOLUTION OF ALL MATTERS PENDING WITHIN THIS CASE EXCEPT PUNITIVE DAMAGES. ALTERNATIVELY, PARTIES IN THIS CASE HAVE 7 DAYS WITHIN WHICH TO CONSENT TO A TRIAL BEFORE AN ARTICLE III. IF CONSENT IS GRANTED, A TRIAL WILL BE SCHEDULED WITHIN 60 DAYS, AND THE SUGGESTION OF REMAND WILL BE VACATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/3/2011. 1/4/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Main Document 36 replaced on 1/5/2011) (tjd, ). (Entered: 01/04/2011)

#35

(#35) ORDER THAT WAGNER ELECTRIC CORPORATION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/3/2011. 1/3/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 01/03/2011)

#34

(#34) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR CO.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES IS DENEID AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THIS ISSUE WILL NOT BE HEARD AT THE STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERNCE ON 12/7/2010. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/1/2010.12/8/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 12/08/2010)

31 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

31 #31

Main Document

5 #5

Exhibit 3

5 #4

Exhibit 2

5 #2

Proposed Order

5 #1

Proposed Rule

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ALICE S. JOHNSTON on behalf of CHRYSLER CORPORATION (JOHNSTON, ALICE) (Entered: 03/18/2009)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL (jy, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)

#2

(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (jy, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)

#1

(#1) TRANSFER ORDER NO. 39 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. DISTRICT OF MARYLAND, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (jy, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/04/2012
View Court Documents

Docket(#39) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:07-cv-64559. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/04/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2011
View Court Documents

Docket(#38) STIPULATION Rule 10.4(a) Stipulation by THE FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (NOORANI, MICHELLE) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 1/26/2011 (md). (Entered: 01/25/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2011
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) Copy of Conditional Remand Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that all claims in the actions on this order except the severed damages claims be remanded to their respective transferor courts. (See Paper # 7607 in 01-md-875). (tjd) (Entered: 01/20/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2011
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) ORDER THAT THIS COURT FINDS THAT THIS CASE IS PREPARED FOR TRIAL WITHOUT DELAY ONCE ON THE TRANSFEROR COURTS DOCKET. THE REMAINING DEFENDANTS IN THIS CASE TO PROCEED TO TRIAL ARE LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A" ATTACHED. BANKRUPT DEFENDANTS, AGAINST WHICH PROCEEDINGS ARE STAYED ARE LISTED IN EXHIBIT "B" ATTACHED. THAT THIS COURT SUGGESTS THAT THIS CASE SHOULD BE REMANDED TO THE U.S.D.C. OF M.D. FOR RESOLUTION OF ALL MATTERS PENDING WITHIN THIS CASE EXCEPT PUNITIVE DAMAGES. ALTERNATIVELY, PARTIES IN THIS CASE HAVE 7 DAYS WITHIN WHICH TO CONSENT TO A TRIAL BEFORE AN ARTICLE III. IF CONSENT IS GRANTED, A TRIAL WILL BE SCHEDULED WITHIN 60 DAYS, AND THE SUGGESTION OF REMAND WILL BE VACATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/3/2011. 1/4/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Main Document 36 replaced on 1/5/2011) (tjd, ). (Entered: 01/04/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2011
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) ORDER THAT WAGNER ELECTRIC CORPORATION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/3/2011. 1/3/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 01/03/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2010
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR CO.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES IS DENEID AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THIS ISSUE WILL NOT BE HEARD AT THE STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERNCE ON 12/7/2010. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/1/2010.12/8/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 12/08/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2010
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Strike by Ford Motor Co. filed by KAREN CANNON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11/8/10 letter to counsel, #2 Exhibit 11/10 letter o counsel)(AMATO, JOHN) (Entered: 12/06/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2010
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Punitive Damages filed by THE FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(WEAVER, WARREN) (Entered: 11/29/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2010
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) MOTION to Strike filed by THE FORD MOTOR COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(WEAVER, WARREN) (Entered: 11/29/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2010
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) ORDER THAT HEARINGS ON ALL PENDING OPPOSED MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, DECEMBER 7TH, 2010 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, JAMES A. BYRNE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/17/2010. 11/18/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
06/19/2009
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by PAMELA THOMAS BROACHE on behalf of BORG-WARNER CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(BROACHE, PAMELA) (Entered: 06/19/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2009
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by PAMELA THOMAS BROACHE on behalf of BORG-WARNER CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(BROACHE, PAMELA) (Entered: 05/28/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2009
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance and Entry of Appearance by F. FORD LOKER, JR on behalf of ABEX CORPORATION, Certificate of Service. (LOKER, F.) Modified on 5/28/2009 (ac, ). (Entered: 05/27/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2009
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER THAT THIS CASE WILL BE REQUIRED TO HOLD A DISCOVERY PLANNING CONFERENCE, AND SUBMIT TO THE COURT A DISCOVERY PLAN BY JUNE 22, 2009; FURTHER, THIS DISCOVERY PLAN SHALL ADHERE TO THE FORMAT OF THE DISCOVERY PLAN TEMPLATE, ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT "B"; THE COURT HAS SET PRESUMPTIVE DEADLINES OF 120 DAYS FOR COMPLETING DISCOVERY, AND 30 DAYS FOR EACH ADDITIONAL STEP OF TRIAL PREPARATION; IF THE PARTIES FAIL TO SUBMIT A DISCOVERY PLAN TO THE COURT BY JUNE 21, 2009, A SCHEDULING ORDER WILL BE ENTERED BY THE COURT IMPOSING THE PRESUMPTIVE DEADLINES IN THE CASE; IF THE PARTIES WISH TO DEVIATE FROM THE PRESUMPTIVE DEADLINES, PARTIES MUST SUBMIT A STIPULATION MODIFYING THE DEADLINES, ETC., THE AGREED UPON DISCOVERY PLAN MUST BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN THE EDPA; IN THE EVENT THAT THE CASE DOES NOT HAVE AN INDIVIDUAL EDPA CIVIL ACTION NUMBER, THE DISCOVERY PLAN MUST BE FILED ELECTRONICALLY ON THE ORIGINAL DOCKET IN THE TRANSFEROR DISTRICT COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/27/09. 4/30/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sc, ) (Entered: 04/30/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2009
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER THAT A HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 12A, IN THE CASES LISTED IN ATTACHED "EXHIBIT A", WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, APRIL 21, 2009 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/9/2009. 4/10/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (amas) (Entered: 04/10/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2009
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for Issuance of Rule to Show Cause filed by CHRYSLER CORPORATION, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Rule, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(JOHNSTON, ALICE) Modified on 3/23/2009 (ac, ). (Entered: 03/20/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2009
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ALICE S. JOHNSTON on behalf of CHRYSLER CORPORATION (JOHNSTON, ALICE) (Entered: 03/18/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2007
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL (jy, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2007
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (jy, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2007
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER NO. 39 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. DISTRICT OF MARYLAND, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (jy, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less