This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 18:40:43 (UTC).

General Motors LLC v. Carpenter Co. et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2012 General Motors LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Carpenter Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary (MDL2196). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:12-PF-10027

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary (MDL2196)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

General Motors LLC

Defendants

FFP Holdings, LLC

Carpenter Co.

E.R. Carpenter, L.P.

Carpenter Holdings, Inc.

Domfoam International Inc

Valle Foam Industries (1995) Inc

Flexible Foam Products, Inc.

Flexible Foam Products LLC

Ohio Decorative Products Inc.

Foamex Innovations Inc

Future Foam Inc

Hickory Springs Manufacturing Co.

Inoac USA Inc.

Inoac Corp.

Crest Foam Industries, Inc.

Leggett & Platt Inc.

Mohawk Industries Inc.

Otto Bock Polyurethane Technologies, Inc.

Plastomer Corp.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel A. Sasse

Attorney at Crowell & Moring - Irvine

20Th Floor, 3 Park Plaza

Irvine, CA 92614

Chahira Solh

Attorney at Crowell & Moring - Irvine

20Th Floor, 3 Park Plaza

Irvine, CA 92614

Jesse J. Kirchner

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Kathryn D. Kirmayer

Attorney at Crowell & Moring

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Kent A. Gardiner

Attorney at Crowell & Morning

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2505

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley R. Love

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Caitlin S. Schroeder

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Christopher J. Bayh

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

David M. Mustard

Attorney at Kos & Associates

203 West Wayne Street

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Deborah Pollack-Milgate

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kathleen M. Anderson

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

888 South Harrison Street

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Kendall Millard

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Larry A. Mackey

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Michael D. Mustard

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

888 South Harrison Street

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Rachel K. Steinhofer

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

600 One Summit Square

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Bethany G. Lukitsch

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Howard Feller

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

James H. Walsh

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Adam S. Paris

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell - Los Angeles

1888 Century Park, E

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Brian Kint

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Cozen O'Connor

1900 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

46 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#90

(#90) Order The Plaintiff in this case has resolved all claims against all Defendants. Therefore, this case is now closed. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/19/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

#89

(#89) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against the Woodbridge Defendants. Related document #88 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/19/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

88 #1

Proposed Order of Dismissal, With Prejudice, of General Motors LLCs Claims Again

88 #88

Main Document

#87

(#87) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Future Foam, Inc. Related document #86 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 10/7/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

86 #1

Proposed Order of Dismissal, With Prejudice, of General Motors LLCs Claims Again

86 #86

Main Document

84 #1

Proposed Order re Staying Action as to Defendant Future Foam, Inc.

84 #84

Main Document

8 #8

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of Ohio for MDL 2196 (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/28/2012)

#6

(#6) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-12) to Northern District of Ohio for MDL # 2196. (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/28/2012)

#5

(#5) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-12) for MDL # 2196. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/27/2012)

4 #1

Exhibit 1 - Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DTyl) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/08/2012)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company for General Motors LLC. (Kirchner, Jesse) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/07/2012)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-3801923 - Fee: $ 350. County Where Action Arose: Wayne - [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Northern District of Ohio, United States District Court, 10-MD-2196, Judge Jack Zouhary] (Kirchner, Jesse) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/07/2012)

142 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Order The Plaintiff in this case has resolved all claims against all Defendants. Therefore, this case is now closed. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/19/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against the Woodbridge Defendants. Related document #88 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/19/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal, With Prejudice, of Plaintiff General Motors LLCs Claims Against the Woodbridge Defendants filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal, With Prejudice, of General Motors LLCs Claims Against the Woodbridge Defendants)(Solh, Chahira) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Future Foam, Inc. Related document #86 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 10/7/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Proposed Stipulation for Dismissal, With Prejudice, of Plaintiff General Motors LLCs Claims Against Defendant Future Foam, Inc. filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal, With Prejudice, of General Motors LLCs Claims Against Defendant Future Foam, Inc.)(Solh, Chahira) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Order Re: Staying Action as to Defendant Future Foam, Inc. Related document #84 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 9/15/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Proposed Stipulation re Staying Action as to Defendant Future Foam, Inc. filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Staying Action as to Defendant Future Foam, Inc.)(Solh, Chahira) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Mohawk Industries, Inc. Related document #81 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 9/2/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Order dismissing, with prejudice, of Plaintiff's claims against FFP Holdings, LLC. Related document #80 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 9/2/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Proposed Stipulation for Dismissal, With Prejudice, of General Motors LLCs Claims Against Defendant Mohawk Industries, Inc. filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal, With Prejudice, of General Motors LLCs Claims Against Defendant Mohawk Industries, Inc.)(Solh, Chahira) (Entered: 09/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance by Chahira Solh, Daniel A. Sasse, Kent A. Gardiner, Kathryn D. Kirmayer filed on behalf of General Motors LLC. (S,R) (Entered: 11/30/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Michigan Eastern. Case number 2:12-cv-14967. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/29/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of Ohio for MDL 2196 (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-12) to Northern District of Ohio for MDL # 2196. (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-12) for MDL # 2196. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/27/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by General Motors LLC of Filing in the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation of Plaintiff General Motors LLCs Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action) (Kirchner, Jesse) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DTyl) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/08/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DTyl) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/08/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company for General Motors LLC. (Kirchner, Jesse) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-3801923 - Fee: $ 350. County Where Action Arose: Wayne - [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Northern District of Ohio, United States District Court, 10-MD-2196, Judge Jack Zouhary] (Kirchner, Jesse) [Transferred from mied on 11/29/2012.] (Entered: 11/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carpenter Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Domfoam International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where E.R. CARPENTER COMPANY INC is a litigant