This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2019 at 15:22:33 (UTC).

Fraley et al v. Facebook, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2011 Fraley filed an Other lawsuit against Facebook, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Seeborg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:11-CV-01726

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Tait

Lucy Funes

Instagram, LLC

James H Duval

Angel Fraley

Defendant

Facebook, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Patty Ward

J. N. D.

Sheila L Shane

Jonathan Bobak

John Garza

Judy Reidel

Matina Battaglia

H. L. S.

Alec Greenhouse

Thomas L. Cox, Jr.

Dallas, TX 75214

3Rd Party Defendant and Plaintiff

Instagram, LLC

Intervenors

C.M.D.

T.A.B.

A.D.Y.

Interested Party

Jennifer Deachin

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Stephen Arns

Attorney at The Arns Law Firm

515 Folsom Street, Third Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Steven Richard Weinmann

Attorney at Law Office of Steven R. Weinmann

P.O. Box 371297

Montara, CA 94037

William Richard Restis

Attorney at The Restis Law Firm, P.C.

550 W. C Street, Suite 1760

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Dean Brown

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California St. Flr 5

San Francisco, CA 94111-5800

S. Ashlie Beringer

Attorney at Facebook

1601 Willow Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Candace A Jackman

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California St., Fifth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Not Classified By Court and Intervenor Attorneys

Martha Bronson

Attorney at Bronson & Associates

15 West 8Th Street, Suite A

Tracy, CA 95376

Mark John Tamblyn

Attorney at Wexler Wallace LLP

455 Capitol Mall, Suite 231

Sacramento, CA 95814

Aaron Michael Zigler

Attorney at Korein Tillery - St. Louis

505 N. 7Th Street, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63101

Scott L. Nelson

Attorney at Public Citizen Litigation Group

1600 20Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20009

Jay Adam Rorty

Attorney at Law Offices of Jay Rorty

501 Mission Street Ste. 10

Santa Cruz, CA 95060

Antony Stuart

Attorney at Stuart Law Firm

801 So. Grand Avenue, 11Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-4613

Interested Party Attorney

Alan J Sherwood

Attorney at Law Office of of Alan J. Sherwood

26755 Contessa St

Hayward, CA 94545

Other Attorneys

Christopher Andress Bandas

Attorney at Bandas Law Firm, P.C.

500 N. Shoreline, Ste. 1020

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Joseph Darrell Palmer

Attorney at Law Offices of Darrell Palmer PC

2244 Faraday Avenue, Suite 121

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Roman Melnik

Attorney at Goldberg, Lowenstein and Weatherwax

11400 Olympic Boulevard, Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90046

Christina McClurg Riehl

Attorney at Department of Justice

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Robert Charles Fellmeth

Attorney at Children's Advocacy Institute

5998 Alcala Park

San Diego, CA 92110

Janine Renee Menhennet

Attorney at Cohelan Khoury & Singer

605 C Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92101

Theodore Harold Frank

Attorney at Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute

1629 K St Nw, Suite 300, Washington

Washington, DC 20006

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#464

#463

462 #1

Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of Stipulation to Distribute Declined

#462

#461

#460

#389

#375

#373

4 #4

Standing Orders for San Jose Division Judges

4 #3

Standing Orders for San Jose Division Judges

4 #2

U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal Settlement Conference Procedures

4 #1

Standing Order for Civil Practice in Cases Assigned for All Purposes to Magistr

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

1,159 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#464) Statement of Robert S. Arns Final Fee Calculation by James H Duval, Susan Mainzer, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 5/9/2017) (Entered: 05/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#463) STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #462 to Distribute Declined Cy Pres Funds to Other Cy Pres Recipients Pro Rata. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/16/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017) (Entered: 02/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#462) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Distribute Declined Cy Pres Funds to Other Cy Pres Recipients Pro Rata filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of Stipulation to Distribute Declined Cy Pres Funds to Other Cy Pres Recipients Pro Rata)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/15/2017) (Entered: 02/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#461) U.S. Supreme Court Notice that the petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 2/16/16 and placed on the docket 5/18/16 as No. 15-1404. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2016) (Entered: 12/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#460) CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016) (Entered: 10/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#459) MANDATE of USCA as to #389 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas L. Cox, Jr., #373 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jonathan Bobak, Alec Greenhouse, Zachary Cochran, Wendy Lally, #372 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Carome, Ann Marie Leonard, Margaret Becker, John Samuel Schachter, Kim N. Parsons, #364 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jo Batman, #376 Notice of Appeal filed by H. L. S., Sheila L Shane, #375 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael S. Depot (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016) (Entered: 10/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#458) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Robert Stephen Arns (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 3/1/2016) (Entered: 03/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#457) ORDER of USCA as to #389 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas L. Cox, Jr., #373 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jonathan Bobak, Alec Greenhouse, Zachary Cochran, Wendy Lally, #372 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Carome, Ann Marie Leonard, Margaret Becker, John Samuel Schachter, Kim N. Parsons, #364 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jo Batman, #376 Notice of Appeal filed by H. L. S., Sheila L Shane, #375 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael S. Depot (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#456) CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#455) MANDATE of USCA as to #445 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sam Kazman. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
455 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 6/28/2011 Case Management Conference Vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011) (Entered: 04/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James H Duval(a minor by and through ), James Duval(as uardian Ad Litem, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Angel Fraley, Russell Tait, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2011) (Entered: 04/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by James H Duval(a minor by and through ), James Duval(as uardian Ad Litem, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Angel Fraley, Russell Tait, William Tait, Paul Wang. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2011) (Entered: 04/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a)) by Facebook, Inc. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/13/2011) Modified on 4/13/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/13/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action To the United States District Court from Santa Clara Superior Court. Filed by Facebook, Inc. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/11/2011) Text modified on 4/12/2011 Incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011) (Entered: 04/08/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Civil Practice in Cases Assigned for All Purposes to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal, #2 U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal Settlement Conference Procedures, #3 Standing Orders for San Jose Division Judges, #4 Standing Orders for San Jose Division Judges)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011) (Entered: 04/08/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel for Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011) (Entered: 04/08/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Facebook, Inc (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011) (Entered: 04/08/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (See Attachments to Notice of Removal for First Amended Class Action Complaint). (NO PROCESS); jury demand; from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 111CV196193. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611009443). Filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011) (Entered: 04/08/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.D.Y. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.M.D. is a litigant

Latest cases where Instagram, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant