This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2021 at 20:20:30 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/21/2011 Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:11-CV-03425

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendants

Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC

Bass Pro, Inc.

Tracker Marine Retail, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexandra Navarre-Davis

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

1555 Poydras Street, Ste 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Andrew Burke Kingsley

Attorney at Equal Employment Oportunity Commission

500 Poydras St, Suite 809

New Orleans, LA 70130

Connie Wilhite Gatlin

Attorney at EEOC

1919 Smith St., 6Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Robert D Rose

Attorney at US EEOC

33 Whitehall Street, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Konrad Batog

Attorney at U S EEOC

33 Whitehall St, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Tanya L. Goldman

Attorney at U.S. EEOC

10 S. Howard St, 3Rd Floor

Baltimore, MD 21201

Timothy M Bowne

Attorney at EEOC

1919 Smith Street, 6Th Fl

Houston, TX 77002

Rodolfo Lucio Sustaita

Attorney at EEOC

1919 Smith St Fl 6Th, 6Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Gregory T. Juge

Attorney at U.S. EEOC

Hale Boggs Building, 500 Poydras Street, Suite 809

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

William Robert Burns

Attorney at King And Spalding LLP

1100 Louisiana, Ste 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Jona J McCormick

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

Barry A Hartstein

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

321 North Clark Street, Suite 1000

Chicago, IL 60654

Carolyn Cain Burch

1180 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Lovita T. Tandy

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree St

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Samuel M Matchett

Attorney at King Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree St

Atlanta, GA 30309

Rebecca Cole Moore

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

191 Peachtree St

Atlanta, GA 30303

Michael W Johnston

1180 Peachtree St

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#380

379 #1

Proposed Order

#379

#378

#377

376 #1

Proposed Order proposed Consent Decree

#376

375 #1

Proposed Order

#375

9 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

1,500 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#380) ORDER Extending Selected Dates in Consent Decree. Re: #379 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#379) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Selected Dates in Consent Decree by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bowne, Timothy) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#378) CONSENT DECREE granting #376 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: proposed Consent Decree. Case terminated on July 25th, 2017. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (rosaldana, 4) (Entered: 07/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#377) ORDER granting #375 Plaintiff EEOC'S Unopposed Motion to Amend. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (rosaldana, 4) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#376) Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: proposed Consent Decree by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed Consent Decree)(Bowne, Timothy) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#375) Unopposed MOTION to Amend #171 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bowne, Timothy) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#374) ORDER for Barry A. Hartstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 07/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#373) RESPONSE in Opposition to #368 MOTION for Interlocutory Appeal as to #331 Memorandum and Order, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Bowne, Timothy) (Entered: 05/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#372) RESPONSE to #364 Document , filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Bowne, Timothy) (Entered: 05/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#371) Letter to Judge Ellison containing information responsive to one of the Court's questions at the 03/23/17 hearing by Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC, Tracker Marine Retail, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Table - List of Charges)(Johnston, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
378 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Konrad Batog to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2011. (Bowne, Timothy) (Entered: 11/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint( Motion Docket Date 12/12/2011.), Joint MOTION Set Briefing Schedule by Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnston, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert D. Rose.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 10/18/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Robert D. Rose to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/4/2011. (Bowne, Timothy) (Entered: 10/14/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed.(Bowne, Timothy) (Entered: 09/28/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregory T. Juge.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas, ) (Entered: 09/28/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Gregory T. Juge to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/17/2011. (Bowne, Timothy) (Entered: 09/26/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice Regarding Initial Conference.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(mfoley) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/30/2011 at 02:30 PM in Room 3716 before Judge Keith P Ellison.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(mfoley) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Bowne, Timothy) (Entered: 09/21/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bass Pro, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bass Pro Outdoor World LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Tracker Marine LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy M Bowne