Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2020 at 22:23:01 (UTC).

Enzo Life Sciences Inc. v. Abbott Laboratories et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2012 Enzo Life Sciences Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:12-CV-00274

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Counter Claimants and Counter Defendants

Enzo Life Sciences Inc.

Luminex Corporation

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Abbott Molecular Inc.

Abbott Laboratories

Intervenor Defendant, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant

Luminex Corporation

Defendants, Counter Claimants and Counter Defendants

Abbott Molecular Inc.

Abbott Laboratories

Enzo Life Sciences Inc.

Luminex Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Claimant, Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Michael P. Stadnick

Lauren M. Nowierski

Lindsey E. Miller

Jennifer Przybylski

Danielle A. Shultz

Jordan N. Malz

Andrew G. Heinz

Peter C. Magic

Stanley J. Panikowski

Aleine Michelle Cohen

Attorney at Department of Justice

820 N. French Street, 6Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Erica Pascal

Denise Seastone Kraft

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1201 N. Market Street, Suite 2100

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Megan C. Haney

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

John C. Phillips, Jr.

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

Bindu Ann George Palapura

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Michael A. Pearson, Jr.

Elizabeth J. Thompson

Stefan M. Miller

Amanda J. Hollis

Melinda K. Lackey

Counter Claimant, Counter Defendant and Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Stanley J. Panikowski

Aleine Michelle Cohen

Attorney at Department of Justice

820 N. French Street, 6Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Erica Pascal

Denise Seastone Kraft

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1201 N. Market Street, Suite 2100

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Bindu Ann George Palapura

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Michael P. Stadnick

Lauren M. Nowierski

Stanley J. Panikowski

Aleine Michelle Cohen

Attorney at Department of Justice

820 N. French Street, 6Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Erica Pascal

Denise Seastone Kraft

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1201 N. Market Street, Suite 2100

Wilmington, DE 19801

31 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#484

(#484) MANDATE of USCA as to #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. (ntl) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#483

(#483) ORDER of USCA as to #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. Decision of USCA: the petition for panel rehearing is denied; the petition for rehearing en banc is denied. (ntl) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#482

(#482) OPINION of USCA as to #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. (ntl) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#481

(#481) ORDER of USCA as to #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. Decision of USCA: Opinion issued under seal on 6/20/19 is unsealed. (ntl) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#480

(#480) JUDGMENT of USCA as to #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. Decision of USCA: AFFIRMED. (ntl) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#478

(#478) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,992,180 B1; 7,064,197 B1; 8,097,405 B1. (etg) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

#477

(#477) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. TRANSCRIPT NOT NEEDED (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/28/2017)

#475

Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (lmm) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David Ellis Moore on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Molecular Inc. (Moore, David) (Entered: 06/07/2012)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Horwitz on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Molecular Inc. (Horwitz, Richard) (Entered: 06/07/2012)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to August 6, 2012 - filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/06/2012)

#4

SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Desmarais, Michael P. Stadnick, Xiao Li, and Joseph C. Akalski of Desmarais LLP filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/7/12. (ntl) (Entered: 06/07/2012)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,992,180 B1. (lih) (Entered: 03/07/2012)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (lih) (Entered: 03/07/2012)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Molecular Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1033780.) - filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lih) (Entered: 03/07/2012)

#269

(#479) NOTICE of Agreement to Remove Confidentiality Designations to Certain Materials Filed Under Seal by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

1,155 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#484) MANDATE of USCA as to #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. (ntl) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#483) ORDER of USCA as to #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. Decision of USCA: the petition for panel rehearing is denied; the petition for rehearing en banc is denied. (ntl) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#482) OPINION of USCA as to #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. (ntl) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#481) ORDER of USCA as to #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. Decision of USCA: Opinion issued under seal on 6/20/19 is unsealed. (ntl) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#480) JUDGMENT of USCA as to #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. Decision of USCA: AFFIRMED. (ntl) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#479) NOTICE of Agreement to Remove Confidentiality Designations to Certain Materials Filed Under Seal by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#478) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,992,180 B1; 7,064,197 B1; 8,097,405 B1. (etg) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#477) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. TRANSCRIPT NOT NEEDED (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#476) NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. USCA Case Number 17-2545. (ntl) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #475 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (lmm) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
566 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David Ellis Moore on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Molecular Inc. (Moore, David) (Entered: 06/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Horwitz on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Molecular Inc. (Horwitz, Richard) (Entered: 06/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Desmarais, Michael P. Stadnick, Xiao Li, and Joseph C. Akalski of Desmarais LLP filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/7/12. (ntl) (Entered: 06/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to August 6, 2012 - filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/06/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Desmarais, Michael P. Stadnick, Xiao Li, and Joseph C. Akalski of Desmarais LLP - filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/06/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00274-LPS, 1:12-cv-00275-LPS, 1:12-cv-00276-LPS(rjb) (Entered: 03/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,992,180 B1. (lih) (Entered: 03/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • No Summons Issued (lih) (Entered: 03/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (lih) (Entered: 03/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Molecular Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1033780.) - filed by Enzo Life Sciences Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lih) (Entered: 03/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Luminex Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Abbott Molecular, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Enzo Life Sciences Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Abbott Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant