This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2021 at 02:03:18 (UTC).

Edmondson v. AZ Petition Partners, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2011 Edmondson filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against AZ Petition Partners, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David L. Bunning and J. Gregory Wehrman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:11-CV-00314

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Bunning

Referral Judge

J. Gregory Wehrman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garry L. Edmondson

Defendants

AZ Petition Partners, L.L.C.

Andrew W. Chavez

John Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Scott Nordloh

Attorney at Kenton County Attorney

1840 Simon Kenton Way, Room 4200

Covington, KY 41011

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin Gerald Dusing

Attorney at The Law Offices of Benjamin G. Dusing, PLLC

809 Wright Summit Parkway, Suite 120

Fort Wright, KY 41011

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Exhibit Waivers of Service of Summons for AZ Petition Partners, LLC and Andrew D

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Case Assignment

1 #5

Exhibit -State Suit against Kenton Co. Clerk

1 #4

Exhibit -Affidavit of Dr. Thon

1 #3

Exhibit -Affidavit of Dr. Jackson

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Defts AZ Petition Partners, LLC and Andrew Chavez's Motion to Dismiss #6 is GRANTED; 2) Pltf's claims brought pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 1961 et seq. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 3) The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant #11 is hereby DENIED AS MOOT; 4) This case is STRICKEN from the active docket of the Court; 5) This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/22/2012.(ECO)cc: COR Modified bold on 8/23/2012 (ECO). (Entered: 08/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: 1) The Oral Argument on the MOTION to Dismiss #6 currently scheduled for 8/22/2012 at 1:00 PM is cancelled, and the Court will adjudicate the pending Motion on the written memoranda alone. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/13/2012.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 08/13/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of J. Gregory Wehrman for review: re #11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AZ Petition Partners, L.L.C., Andrew W. Chavez (ECO) (Entered: 08/08/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AZ Petition Partners, L.L.C., Andrew W. Chavez Motions referred to J. Gregory Wehrman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dusing, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/07/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Oral argument on the motion to dismiss #6 is scheduled for August 22, 2012 at 1:00 p.m. in Covington. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 07/28/2012.(TJZ)cc: COR (Entered: 07/30/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Benjamin Gerald Dusing (Dusing, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/13/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by AZ Petition Partners, L.L.C., Andrew W. Chavez (KRS) (Entered: 01/06/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by AZ Petition Partners, L.L.C., Andrew W. Chavez filed by AZ Petition Partners, L.L.C., Andrew W. Chavez. (Dusing, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/05/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by AZ Petition Partners, L.L.C., Andrew W. Chavez filed by Garry L. Edmondson. (Nordloh, Christopher) (Entered: 12/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by AZ Petition Partners, L.L.C., Andrew W. Chavez (Dusing, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF BENJAMIN G. DUSING by AZ Petition Partners, L.L.C.. (Dusing, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/30/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Garry L. Edmondson. AZ Petition Partners, L.L.C. waiver sent on 10/24/2011, answer due 12/23/2011; Andrew W. Chavez waiver sent on 10/24/2011, answer due 12/23/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waivers of Service of Summons for AZ Petition Partners, LLC and Andrew D. Chavez)(Nordloh, Christopher) (Entered: 11/09/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • DocketConflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 10/21/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to Magistrate Judge J. Gregory Wehrman to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Case will revert back to the undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. Subject to the provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/or confer in an attempt to resolve disputes between themselves, w/out judicial intervention; (2) If parties are unable to resolve such disputes informally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference with Magistrate Judge; (3) If, and only if, parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court. Written motions regarding discovery shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 10/21/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE J. Gregory Wehrman chosen by random selection to handle matters that may be referred in this case. (ECO) (Entered: 10/21/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL RICO COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND ( Filing fee $350; receipt number 2172710), filed by Garry L. Edmondson. (No Process Requested). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit-Identification Document containing forged signatures, #3 Exhibit-Affidavit of Dr. Jackson, #4 Exhibit-Affidavit of Dr. Thon, #5 Exhibit-State Suit against Kenton Co. Clerk, #6 Case Assignment)(ECO) (Entered: 10/21/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Scott Nordloh