Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2019 at 07:22:47 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas v. Richard Paniagua et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2011 Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Richard Paniagua. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:11-CV-09409

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Defendants and Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Providers

The Kraft Group

David C. De Sieyes, as Trustee of the Trust under an Agreement dated December 13, 1976 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley, David C. De Sieyes, and United States Trust Compan

GBL Alpha Edge Common Trst FD & Trust Company

Daniel S. Gregory

Madge A. L. Macneil Trust

Local 134 Pension Plan No. 5 S&P 500 Fund

John Doe, as Trustee of Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund

Investors Bank & Trust Co

John Doe, as trustee of JHT New Income Trust

Onebeacon Insurance Company, as Administrator of Onebeacon Insurance Pension Plan

Spindle Limited partnership Balanced Advisory

Margaret R. Coniglio, as Trustee of the Trust by Margaret R Coniglio u/a dtd

The Trust under an Agreement dated December 19, 1977 between Virginia S. Risley, as settlor, and William H. Risley and United States Trust Company of New York, as Trustees

RE State St. Bank & Trust Co.

John Doe as Owner of C. Boynton Index 500 Portfolio

David C De Sieyes

Cambridge Appleton Trust Co.

Fiduciary Trust Company International

C. Boynton Index 500 Portfolio

JFH II Spectrum Income Fund

227 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Alexander R. Bilus

Attorney at Dechert LLP

2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Other Attorneys

Stephen Michael Baldini

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP (NYC)

One Bryant Park

New York, NY 10036

Andrew Zane Schwartz

Attorney at Foley Hoag LLP

Seaport West, 155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210-2600

Jason Lurie Goldsmith

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP (NYC)

One Bryant Park

New York, NY 10036

Garrett J. Bradley

Attorney at Thornton & Naumes, LLP

100 Summer Street, 30Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Lesley M. Varghese

Attorney at Nixon & Peabody, LLP

100 Summer Street

Boston, MA 02110

Douglas K. Mansfield

Attorney at Casner & Edwards, LLP

2Nd Floor, 303 Congress Street

Boston, MA 02210

Hal Neier

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

John P. Dennis

Attorney at Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

75 Federal Street, 7Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Katherine Scully

Attorney at Akin Gump Hauer & Feld LLP

One Bryant Park

New York, NY 10036

David Mitchell Zensky

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld ( 1 Battery Pk.)

One Bryant Park

New York, NY 10036

Jennifer E. Greaney

Attorney at Sally & Fitch

225 Franklin Street

Boston, MA 02110-2804

Michael T. Grant

Attorney at Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP - MA

111 Huntington Avenue.

Boston, MA 02199

James Philip Chou

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP (NYC)

One Bryant Park

New York, NY 10036

Robert A. Skinner

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP (MA)

800 Boylston St

Boston, MA 02199

Mary C. Dunn

30 Exchange Terrace

Providence, RI 02903

Jonah M. Fecteau

Attorney at Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210-2604

David J. Fine

Attorney at Dangel & Fine, LLP

10 Derne Street, P.O. Box 9505

Boston, MA 02114-9505

Justin J. Wolosz

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199-3600

Andrew T. Imbriglio

Attorney at Casner & Edwards, LLP

303 Congress Street, 2Nd Floor

Boston, MA 02210

69 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Mansfield on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Mansfield, Douglas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/03/2011)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as all defendants . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew) Modified on 6/6/2011 (Duong, Diep). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/03/2011)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of John T. Morrier re #3 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit A to the Complaint Under Seal (ex parte) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2011)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of John T. Morrier re #3 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit A to the Complaint Under Seal (ex parte) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2011)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2011)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-3435079 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Morrier, John) Modified on 6/6/2011 (Duong, Diep). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2011)

#7779

(#378) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [6047 in 12-cv-2652-DLC] MOTION for Nicholas M. Kelley to Withdraw as Attorney For Defendant W.L. Putnam Prize Fund. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Nicolas M. Kelley terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/28/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#7771

(#377) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7770 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC) Letter filed by Marc S. Kirschner. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 5/15/2020.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#6025

(#376) MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:11-cv-04522-DLC; granting (7746) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Evan Robert Schnittman terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al. (jca) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#7747

(#375) DECLARATION of Evan Schnittman in Support re: (296 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 233 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03753-DLC, 201 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 122 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 303 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 61 in 1:13-cv-03750-DLC, 6019 in 1:12-cv-02652-DLC, 159 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 405 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 259 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 7746 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 230 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 298 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 374 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03738-DLC, 121 in 1:12-cv-06055-DLC, 194 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 282 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 211 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 175 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03752-DLC, 259 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 166 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 342 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03747-DLC, 246 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03739-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-03737-DLC, 130 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 149 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 120 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 855 in 1:12-cv-00064-DLC, 286 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 678 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 134 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 66 in 1:13-cv-03744-DLC, 61 in 1:13-cv-03743-DLC, 897 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 114 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 208 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 61 in 1:13-cv-03741-DLC, 162 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03748-DLC, 141 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 225 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 120 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 63 in 1:13-cv-03742-DLC, 290 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03749-DLC, 220 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 63 in 1:13-cv-03746-DLC, 298 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 218 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 264 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 186 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03751-DLC, 159 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 129 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 465 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 261 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 163 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 140 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 190 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03745-DLC, 125 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 152 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 386 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03740-DLC, 187 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03736-DLC) MOTION for Evan Schnittman to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant St. Barnabas Hospital & Braker Memorial Home Employees Custody.. Document filed by ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#7746

(#374) MOTION for Evan Schnittman to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant St. Barnabas Hospital & Braker Memorial Home Employees Custody. Document filed by ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#6005

(#373) ORDER: A pretrial conference is scheduled for January 14, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street. The Court has received requests from counsel to participate in the conference by telephone. Accordingly, it is herebyORDERED that any party wishing to be heard at the conference must appear in person. Parties wishing only to listen to the conference by telephone may do so by calling (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 7185839. Overflow seating will be available in Courtroom 12B. Parties may order a transcript of the conference by contacting Southern District Reporters. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#5998

(#372) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Robert Schnittman on behalf of ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#5948

(#371) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (5945 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 7649 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 370 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS) Notice of Substitution of Attorney filed by Onebeacon Insurance Company et al. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Alan Joseph Stone added. Attorney Jack Yoskowitz and Julia Claire Spivack terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/7/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS(anc) Modified on 11/9/2018 (anc). (Entered: 11/08/2018)

471 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#378) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [6047 in 12-cv-2652-DLC] MOTION for Nicholas M. Kelley to Withdraw as Attorney For Defendant W.L. Putnam Prize Fund. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Nicolas M. Kelley terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/28/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#377) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7770 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC) Letter filed by Marc S. Kirschner. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 5/15/2020.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Richard J. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ma) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#376) MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:11-cv-04522-DLC; granting (7746) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Evan Robert Schnittman terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al. (jca) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#375) DECLARATION of Evan Schnittman in Support re: (296 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 233 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03753-DLC, 201 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 122 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 303 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 61 in 1:13-cv-03750-DLC, 6019 in 1:12-cv-02652-DLC, 159 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 405 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 259 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 7746 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 230 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 298 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 374 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03738-DLC, 121 in 1:12-cv-06055-DLC, 194 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 282 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 211 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 175 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03752-DLC, 259 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 166 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 342 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03747-DLC, 246 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03739-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-03737-DLC, 130 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 149 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 120 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 855 in 1:12-cv-00064-DLC, 286 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 678 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 134 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 66 in 1:13-cv-03744-DLC, 61 in 1:13-cv-03743-DLC, 897 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 114 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 208 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 61 in 1:13-cv-03741-DLC, 162 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03748-DLC, 141 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 225 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 120 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 63 in 1:13-cv-03742-DLC, 290 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03749-DLC, 220 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 63 in 1:13-cv-03746-DLC, 298 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 218 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 264 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 186 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03751-DLC, 159 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 129 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 465 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 261 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 163 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 140 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 190 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03745-DLC, 125 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 152 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 386 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03740-DLC, 187 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03736-DLC) MOTION for Evan Schnittman to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant St. Barnabas Hospital & Braker Memorial Home Employees Custody.. Document filed by ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#374) MOTION for Evan Schnittman to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant St. Barnabas Hospital & Braker Memorial Home Employees Custody. Document filed by ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Pretrial Conference held on 1/14/2019. (Court Reporter Kristen Carannante) Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#373) ORDER: A pretrial conference is scheduled for January 14, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street. The Court has received requests from counsel to participate in the conference by telephone. Accordingly, it is herebyORDERED that any party wishing to be heard at the conference must appear in person. Parties wishing only to listen to the conference by telephone may do so by calling (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 7185839. Overflow seating will be available in Courtroom 12B. Parties may order a transcript of the conference by contacting Southern District Reporters. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#372) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Robert Schnittman on behalf of ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#371) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (5945 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 7649 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 370 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS) Notice of Substitution of Attorney filed by Onebeacon Insurance Company et al. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Alan Joseph Stone added. Attorney Jack Yoskowitz and Julia Claire Spivack terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/7/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS(anc) Modified on 11/9/2018 (anc). (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
383 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Stay Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of October 31, 2011, or Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, or Further Order of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware or This Court by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brewer, Donna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 07/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel H. Golden, David M. Zensky, Stephen M. Baldini, James P. Chou, Angeline Lam Koo, and Jason L. Goldsmith Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-3459319 by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #6 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Brewer, Donna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/17/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Marie Brewer on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company (Brewer, Donna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/08/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Mansfield on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Mansfield, Douglas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as all defendants . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew) Modified on 6/6/2011 (Duong, Diep). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Abaid, Kimberly) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of John T. Morrier re #3 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit A to the Complaint Under Seal (ex parte) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit A to the Complaint Under Seal (ex parte) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morrier, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-3435079 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Morrier, John) Modified on 6/6/2011 (Duong, Diep). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/22/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fiduciary Trust Company International is a litigant

Latest cases where INVESTORS BANK N A is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN COLONIAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Mitchell Zensky