This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 19:20:18 (UTC).

CARTER et al v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2011 CARTER filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Denise K. laRue. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:11-CV-01286

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Denise K. laRue

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARRY HORN

ROGER CARTER

DANIEL PONGRATZ

MARGUERITE CARTER

LAURA PONGRATZ

MARTHA HORN

Defendants

DONAN ENGINEERING COMPANY, INC.

KEELER WEBB ASSOCIATES, INC.

AMERICAN STRUCTUREPOINT CONSULTING, INC. doing business as STRUCTUREPOINT

WILLIAM NORMAN

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph N. Williams

Attorney at RILEY WILLIAMS & PIATT, LLC

301 Massachusetts Avenue, Suite 300

Indianapolis, IN 46204

John Mark McKinzie

Attorney at RILEY BENNETT & EGLOFF LLP

141 East Washington Street, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

James Piatt

Attorney at RILEY WILLIAMS & PIATT, LLC

301 Massachusetts Avenue, Suite 300

Indianapolis, IN 46204

William N. Riley

Attorney at RILEY WILLIAMS & PIATT, LLC

301 Massachusetts Avenue, Suite 300

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Paul Bishop

Attorney at COHEN GARELICK & GLAZIER

8888 Keystone Crossing Boulevard, Suite 800

Indianapolis, IN 46240

M. Edward Krause, III

Attorney at COHEN GARELICK & GLAZIER

8888 Keystone Crossing, Suite 800

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Michael P. Maxwell, Jr.

Attorney at CLARK QUINN MOSES SCOTT & GRAHN LLP

One Indiana Square, Suite 2200

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Nicholas Christo Nizamoff

Attorney at STUART & BRANIGIN

8888 Keystone Crossing, Suite 1401

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Joseph E. Ezzie

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

Capitol Square, Suite 2100, 65 East State Street

Columbus, OH 43215-4260

Mark Allen Johnson

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

Capitol Square, Suite 2100, 65 East State Street

Columbus, OH 43215-4260

Rand L. McClellan

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

Capitol Square, Suite 2100, 65 East State Street

Columbus, OH 43215-4260

Tara Stapleton Lutes

Attorney at CANTRELL STRENSKI & MEHRINGER, LLP

150 West Market Street, Suite 800

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Dennis F. Cantrell

Attorney at CANTRELL, STRENSKI & MEHRINGER, LLP

150 West Market Street, Suite 800

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#49

#48

#47

#46

45 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#45

44 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of Joseph Williams

23 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Remand

#23

#2

1 #7

-Exh F- Deposition of Joseph Radcliff

1 #6

State Court Record - Exh E- Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment for State

1 #5

State Court Record Petition for Court Appointed Appraisal Process

1 #4

- Exh C - Declaration of Karl Benz; and State Farm's Form Homeowners'

1 #3

State Court Record - Exh B- Chronological Case Summary

1 #2

State Court Record - Exh A- Complaint

1 #1

State Court Record - Exh A- Summons

#1

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Letter acknowledging receipt of file by Hamilton Superior Court (PG) (Entered: 02/17/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #23 Motion to Remand. This action shall be remanded forthwith to the Hamilton Superior Court and, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/8/2012. (PG) (Entered: 02/08/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time in which to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (See Order) Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 1/4/2012. (TMA) (Entered: 01/05/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Submission of Proposed Order, re #45 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead, filed by Defendant DONAN ENGINEERING COMPANY, INC.. (Bishop, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead, filed by Defendant DONAN ENGINEERING COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Strike #41 Reply in Support of Motion or in the Alternative, Motion to File Sur-Reply Instanter, filed by Plaintiffs MARGUERITE CARTER, ROGER CARTER, LARRY HORN, MARTHA HORN, DANIEL PONGRATZ, LAURA PONGRATZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Joseph Williams)(Williams, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION to Strike #41 Reply in Support of Motion or in the Alternative, Motion to File Sur-Reply Instanter, filed by Defendant STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McClellan, Rand) (Entered: 11/18/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/16/2011. (PG) (Entered: 11/17/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) REPLY in Support of Motion re #23 MOTION to Remand, filed by Plaintiffs MARGUERITE CARTER, ROGER CARTER, LARRY HORN, MARTHA HORN, DANIEL PONGRATZ, LAURA PONGRATZ. (Williams, Joseph) (Entered: 11/14/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION Request for Oral Argument on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, filed by Defendant STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (McClellan, Rand) (Entered: 11/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Attorney(s) RAND L. MCCLELLAN to Appear pro hac vice., filed by Defendant STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JKS) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION of JOSEPH E. EZZIE re #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (JKS) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) JOSEPH E. EZZIE to Appear pro hac vice., filed by Defendant STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JKS) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (JKS) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JKS) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Stapleton Lutes on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (JKS) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis F. Cantrell on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (JKS) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RECEIPT #IP026124 in the amount of $ 350.00 for Filing Fee. (JKS) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET, filed by Defendant STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (JKS) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, against MARGUERITE CARTER, ROGER CARTER, LARRY HORN, MARTHA HORN, DANIEL PONGRATZ, LAURA PONGRATZ. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record - Exh A- Summons, #2 State Court Record - Exh A- Complaint, #3 State Court Record - Exh B- Chronological Case Summary, #4 - Exh C - Declaration of Karl Benz; and State Farm's Form Homeowners' policy, #5 State Court Record Petition for Court Appointed Appraisal Process, #6 State Court Record - Exh E- Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment for State Farm and Against Tom and Julie Moll, #7 -Exh F- Deposition of Joseph Radcliff)(JKS) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Donan Engineering Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph E Ezzie

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Allen Johnson